Watkins v. Beamer et al
Oregon District Court | |
Judge: | Jeff Armistead |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-01922 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Nov 18, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Jan 02, 2025 1:39 AM PST |
Defendant
Joe Bugher
|
|
Defendant
Oregon Department of Corrections
|
|
Defendant
Robb Persson
|
|
Defendant
Leland P. Beamer
|
|
Defendant
Warren Roberts
|
|
Defendant
Amber Sundquist
|
|
Plaintiff
James Watkins
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, April 30, 2025 | ||
24 | 24
![]() Notice of Withdrawal and Notice of Attorney Substitution: Thomas F. Armosino is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney Jessica B. Spooner . Filed by on behalf of Warren Roberts. (Armosino, Thomas) |
|
Tuesday, April 08, 2025 | ||
23 | 23
![]() Notice of Association of Attorney of Karen M. O'Kasey appearing on behalf of Joe Bugher . Filed by on behalf of Joe Bugher. (O'Kasey, Karen) |
|
Friday, April 04, 2025 | ||
22 | 22
![]() Notice of Attorney Substitution: Taylor B. Lewis is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney Jessica B. Spooner . Filed by on behalf of Joe Bugher. (Lewis, Taylor) |
|
Thursday, March 27, 2025 | ||
21 | 21
![]() Notice of Attorney Substitution: Jessica B. Spooner is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney Nathan Riemersma . Filed by on behalf of Leland P. Beamer, Joe Bugher, Oregon Department of Corrections, Robb Persson, Warren Roberts, Amber Sundquist. (Spooner, Jessica) |
|
Tuesday, March 11, 2025 | ||
20 | 20
minute
Rule 16 Conference
Tue 03/11 12:49 PM
MINUTES of Proceedings: Telephone Rule 16 Conference held on 3/11/2025 with Magistrate Judge Jeff Armistead presiding. No one joins the call on behalf of plaintiff. Defense counsel informs the court they are in the process of obtaining conflict counsel to represent defendants Warren Roberts and Joe Bugher. The parties proposed schedule is adopted as follows: (1) Fact Discovery is to be completed by 12/15/2025. (2) Dispositive Motions are due by 2/2/2026. if experts are expected, the parties are to provide proposed expert deadlines. Judge Armistead's practice to resolve discovery matters informally is discussed. If the parties have a discovery dispute, they must request a conference with Judge Armistead before moving for an order relating to discovery. To request a conference or Judge Armistead's assistance, the parties should contact Judge Armistead's Courtroom Deputy. If needed, Judge Armistead will schedule a telephonic hearing and require the parties to summarize the dispute in a joint statement. If the parties anticipate that they will need Judge Armistead's assistance in resolving a deposition dispute, they should contact Judge Armistead's Courtroom Deputy to advise her of the upcoming deposition date and time. Written consents to proceed before a Magistrate Judge may be filed at any time, however, the court recommends that consent forms be filed before a dispositive motion is heard. There are no adverse consequences for not consenting. Nathan Riemersma present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter: None. (pjg) |
|
Tuesday, February 18, 2025 | ||
19 | 19
![]() ORDER issued by Judge Armistead: Setting a Telephone Rule 16 Conference for Tuesday, March 11, 2025 at 11:30 AM in Portland before Magistrate Judge Jeff Armistead. The court's conference call information will be provided to the parties by separate sealed entry. Local Rules 16-2(b) and 26-1 require that counsel confer prior to the conference. Rule 16 Conferences are ordinarily held telephonically. At the conference, counsel should be prepared to discuss the status of the case, relevant dates and deadlines, and any other significant issues. The parties should e-mail their proposed schedule to pam_geringer@ord.uscourts.gov, by noon on March 7, 2025. The parties may file written consents to magistrate judge jurisdiction at any time, but the court recommends that consent forms be filed before a dispositive motion (i.e., motion to dismiss, motion for summary judgment) is heard. (The consent form is attached.) For more information regarding the role of magistrate judges and consenting to magistrate judge jurisdiction, see ord.uscourts.gov/consent. (pjg) |
|
Friday, February 14, 2025 | ||
18 | 18
![]() Answer to1 Complaint with Jury Demand . Filed by Amber Sundquist, Robb Persson, Oregon Department of Corrections, Leland P. Beamer, Joe Bugher, Warren Roberts. (Riemersma, Nathan) |
|
Thursday, January 23, 2025 | ||
17 | 17
![]() Civil Cover Sheet regarding Complaint1 . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (LeDuc Montgomery, Alicia) |
|
16 | 16
![]() Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Warren Roberts waiver sent on 11/20/2024. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (LeDuc Montgomery, Alicia) |
|
15 | 15
![]() Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Oregon Department of Corrections waiver sent on 11/20/2024. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (LeDuc Montgomery, Alicia) |
|
14 | 14
![]() Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Robb Persson waiver sent on 11/20/2024. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (LeDuc Montgomery, Alicia) |
|
13 | 13
![]() Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Joe Bugher waiver sent on 11/20/2024. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (LeDuc Montgomery, Alicia) |
|
12 | 12
![]() Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Leland P. Beamer waiver sent on 11/20/2024. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (LeDuc Montgomery, Alicia) |
|
11 | 11
![]() Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Amber Sundquist waiver sent on 11/20/2024. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (LeDuc Montgomery, Alicia) |
|
Tuesday, November 19, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Civil Cover Sheet regarding Complaint1 . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (LeDuc Montgomery, Alicia) |
|
9 | 9
![]() Summons Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (ecp) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
8 | 8
![]() Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Jeff Armistead and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5 . Discovery is to be completed by 3/19/2025. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 4/18/2025. Pretrial Order is due by 4/18/2025. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeff Armistead. (ecp) |
|
Monday, November 18, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Proposed Summons Amber Sundquist Filed by All Plaintiffs. (LeDuc Montgomery, Alicia) |
|
6 | 6
![]() Proposed Summons Joe Bugher Filed by All Plaintiffs. (LeDuc Montgomery, Alicia) |
|
5 | 5
![]() Proposed Summons Robb Persson Filed by All Plaintiffs. (LeDuc Montgomery, Alicia) |
|
4 | 4
![]() Proposed Summons Warren Roberts Filed by All Plaintiffs. (LeDuc Montgomery, Alicia) |
|
3 | 3
![]() Proposed Summons ODOC Filed by All Plaintiffs. (LeDuc Montgomery, Alicia) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Proposed Summons Leland Beamer Filed by All Plaintiffs. (LeDuc Montgomery, Alicia) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $405 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9652124 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by James Watkins against All Defendants. (LeDuc Montgomery, Alicia) |