Amy Henson v. AGC Chemical Americas, Inc. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-06598 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1446pl Petition for Removal - Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Nov 18, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Texas Western, 1:24-cv-01306 |
Last checked: Saturday May 17, 2025 5:42 AM EDT |
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC LLC
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
|
|
Defendant
Raytheon Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC Inc
|
|
Defendant
E.I. du Pont de Nemours & Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corp
|
|
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
John Doe Defendants 1-49
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corp
|
|
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
|
|
Defendant
Chemicals Incorporated
Agent Schok K. Moza 12321 Hatcherville
Baytown, TX 77520 |
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086 |
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
100 Park Avenue
Florham Park, NJ 07932 |
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
AGC Inc
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemical Americas, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
3M Company
3M Center
St. Paul, MN 55133 |
|
Plaintiff
Amy Henson
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Monday, December 02, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) |
|
Tuesday, November 19, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Tue 11/19 10:11 AM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Texas Western, 1:24-cv-01306, Amy Henson v. AGC Chemical Americas, Inc. et al, as DSC case 2:24-cv-06598-RMG (jbin) |
|
8 | 8
![]() Case transferred in from District of Texas Western; Case Number 1:24-cv-01306. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Monday, November 18, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
![]() |
|
Monday, October 28, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
![]() |
|
5 | 5
![]() |
|
4 | 4
![]() |
|
3 | 3
![]() |
|
2 | 2
![]() |
|
Friday, October 25, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Case assigned to Judge Docket II - Austin. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (kp) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/19/2024.] | ||
If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin Howell. (kp) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/19/2024.] | ||
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Amy Henson. (kp) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/19/2024.] |