Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Mia Roberts Perez
Case #: 2:24-cv-06186
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Nov 19, 2024
Last checked: Friday Jan 03, 2025 3:28 AM EST
Defendant
First Chicago Insurance Company
6640 S. Cicero Avenue
Bedford Park, IL 60638
Represented By
John Gerard Devlin
Devlin Associates, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Robert Bretschneider
418 Woodland Avenue
Morrisville, PA 19067
Represented By
MARIA K. MCGINTY-FERRIS
Swartz Culleton PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, April 24, 2025
8 8 adr Notice Re: Arbitration Consent of Video Conference Thu 04/24 4:37 PM
Notice Re: Arbitration Consent of Video Conference(MCGINTY-FERRIS, MARIA)
Related: [-]
7 7 adr Notice Re: Arbitration Video Conference Thu 04/24 3:13 PM
Notice Re: Arbitration Video Conference.(rv)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent
Friday, March 07, 2025
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 03/07 11:17 AM
Defendant ANSWER to Complaint together with with Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint by First Chicago Insurance Company.(Devlin, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 31, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 12/31 12:38 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by John Gerard Devlin on behalf of First Chicago Insurance Company (Devlin, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
4 4 service Affidavit of Service Mon 12/02 11:10 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service re: served Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Designation Form upon First Chicago Insurance Company by Certified Mail on 11/27/2024 (MCGINTY-FERRIS, MARIA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
3 3 1 pgs order Order Thu 11/21 4:04 PM
ORDER THAT COUNSEL CONTEMPLATING FILING A MOTION UNDER FRCP 12(b)(6), (e), OR (f), SHALL FIRST CONTACT OPPOSING COUNSEL TO DISCUSS THE SUBSTANCE OF THE CONTEMPLATED MOTION AND TO PROVIDE AN OPPORTUNITY TO CURE ANY ALLEGED PLEADING DEFICIENCIES OR STRIKE CERTAIN MATTER. THIS CONFERENCE SHALL TAKE PLACE AT LEAST SEVEN (7) DAYS BEFORE THE FILING OF THE MOTION. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MIA ROBERTS PEREZ ON 11/21/24. 11/21/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 11/19 4:18 PM
Summons Issued as to First Chicago Insurance Company. Forwarded To: counsel on 11/19/24. (mbh)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney) Tue 11/19 12:07 PM
COMPLAINT against First Chicago Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17890103.), filed by Robert Bretschneider.(MCGINTY-FERRIS, MARIA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Designation Form,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet