New York Southern District Court
Judge:Lewis J Liman
Case #: 1:24-cv-08796
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:501 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Nov 19, 2024
Last checked: Sunday May 18, 2025 5:05 AM EDT
Defendant
Spyscape LTD
Plaintiff
August Image, LLC
Represented By
Daniel Desouza
Desouza Law, PA
contact info
Christine Rosalie Zaffarano
Copycat Legal PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 65 minutes ago
Monday, April 28, 2025
15 15 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 04/28 4:53 PM
ORDER: The Court held an initial pretrial conference on April 28, 2025. Counsel for Plaintiff appeared but no counsel for Defendant appeared. The initial pretrial conference is adjourned to June 20, 2025 at 12 PM. Parties are directed to dial into the Court's teleconference number at 646-453-4442, Conference ID# 358639322, and follow the necessary prompts. The deadline for Plaintiff to file an amended complaint is June 6, 2025. Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 4/28/2025) ( Initial Conference set for 6/20/2025 at 12:00 PM before Judge Lewis J. Liman.) (ks)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 04/28 4:54 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/6/2025. (ks)
Related: [-]
minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Tue 05/06 2:43 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lewis J. Liman: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 4/28/2025 by Telephone Conference. Christine Zaffarano present by telephone for Plaintiff. No counsel appeared on behalf of the Defendant at the conference. Initial conference adjourned. See Order issued by the Court. (mf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
14 14 order Memo Endorsement ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 03/27 12:54 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:13 Letter request to reschedule the initial pretrial conference filed by August Image, LLC. ENDORSEMENT: The initial pretrial conference scheduled for March 28, 2025 is adjourned to April 28, 2025 at 3 PM. SO ORDERED., ( Initial Conference set for 4/28/2025 at 03:00 PM before Judge Lewis J. Liman.) (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 3/27/25) (yv)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
13 13 misc Letter Fri 03/21 3:50 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Christine Zaffarano, Esq. dated 03/21/2025 re: Requesting 21-Day Extension for Pretrial Conference. Document filed by August Image, LLC..(Zaffarano, Christine)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
12 12 order Memo Endorsement ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 02/14 10:00 AM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:11 Letter filed by August Image, LLC. ENDORSEMENT: The initial pretrial conference scheduled for February 28, 2025 is adjourned to March 28, 2025 at 10AM. SO ORDERED. (Initial Conference set for 3/28/2025 at 10:00 AM before Judge Lewis J. Liman.) (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 2/14/2025) (mml)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
11 11 misc Letter Thu 02/13 1:47 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Christine Zaffarano, Esq. dated 02/13/2025 re: Status Update. Document filed by August Image, LLC..(Zaffarano, Christine)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 02/13 8:57 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christine Rosalie Zaffarano on behalf of August Image, LLC..(Zaffarano, Christine)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
9 9 1 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Thu 02/06 5:49 PM
NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 2/28/2025 at 02:00 PM before Judge Lewis J. Liman. Parties are directed to dial into the Court's teleconference number at 646-453-4442, Conference ID# 358639322, and follow the necessary prompts. SO ORDERED (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 2/6/2025) (ks)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 12/06 12:24 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Spyscape LTD served on 12/3/2024, answer due 12/26/2024. Service was accepted by John Doe Refused Name. Document filed by August Image, LLC..(Desouza, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
7 7 misc AO 121 Form Copyright - Case Opening - Submitted Wed 11/20 10:13 AM
AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights..(jgo)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Issued Wed 11/20 10:12 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Spyscape LTD..(jgo)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Wed 11/20 10:10 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis J. Liman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Wed 11/20 10:11 AM
Magistrate Judge Henry J. Ricardo is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Wed 11/20 10:12 AM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
5 5 misc AO 121 Form Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney Tue 11/19 2:25 PM
AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review..(Desouza, Daniel)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 11/19 2:24 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by August Image, LLC..(Desouza, Daniel)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 11/19 2:23 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Spyscape LTD, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by August Image, LLC..(Desouza, Daniel)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 11/19 2:13 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Desouza, Daniel)
Related: [-]
1 1 10 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 11/19 2:11 PM
COMPLAINT against Spyscape LTD. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30206238)Document filed by August Image, LLC..(Desouza, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B