Oklahoma Eastern District Court
Judge:Gerald L Jackson
Case #: 6:24-cv-00452
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Case Filed:Nov 19, 2024
Case in other court:McIntosh County District Court, CJ-24-00079
Last checked: Friday Jan 03, 2025 2:36 AM CST
Defendant
Calvin D. Cahill
Represented By
Heidi M. Nichols
Fox Rothschild, Llp (okc)
contact info
Robin F. Fields
Fox Rothschild, Llp (okc)
contact info
Defendant
Calyx Energy III, LLC
Represented By
Heidi M. Nichols
Fox Rothschild, Llp (okc)
contact info
Robin F. Fields
Fox Rothschild, Llp (okc)
contact info
Defendant
Riverside Gathering, LLC
Represented By
Heidi M. Nichols
Fox Rothschild, Llp (okc)
contact info
Robin F. Fields
Fox Rothschild, Llp (okc)
contact info
Defendant
Riverside Midstream Partners, LLC
Represented By
Heidi M. Nichols
Fox Rothschild, Llp (okc)
contact info
Robin F. Fields
Fox Rothschild, Llp (okc)
contact info
Defendant
Calyx Energy III Holdings, LLC
Represented By
Heidi M. Nichols
Fox Rothschild, Llp (okc)
contact info
Robin F. Fields
Fox Rothschild, Llp (okc)
contact info
Plaintiff
Longreach Energy 2, LLC
Represented By
Bryan O. Blevins, Jr
Provost Umphrey Law Firm, LLP
contact info
Mark E. Walraven
Graft & Walraven, Pllc (okc)
contact info
Megan L. Maruyama
Graft & Walraven, Pllc (okc)
contact info
Chaille Walraven
Graft & Walraven, Pllc (okc)
contact info
Chad Smith
contact info
Plaintiff
Teresa Garrison Pratt
Represented By
Bryan O. Blevins, Jr
Provost Umphrey Law Firm, LLP
contact info
Mark E. Walraven
Graft & Walraven, Pllc (okc)
contact info
Megan L. Maruyama
Graft & Walraven, Pllc (okc)
contact info
Chaille Walraven
Graft & Walraven, Pllc (okc)
contact info
Chad Smith
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Plaintiff
Royfin Natural Gas, LLC
Terminated: 11/26/2024
Represented By
Bryan O. Blevins, Jr
Provost Umphrey Law Firm, LLP
contact info
Mark E. Walraven
Graft & Walraven, Pllc (okc)
contact info
Chaille Walraven
Graft & Walraven, Pllc (okc)
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Monday, April 28, 2025
38 38 motion Protective Order Stay Mon 04/28 8:43 AM
MOTION for Protective Order and MOTION to Stay Discovery by All Defendants (With attachments) Responses due by 5/12/2025 (Fields, Robin). Added MOTION to Stay on 4/28/2025 (dma, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
37 37 order 02 - Minute Order Directing - Party to Submit Courtesy Copy of Document(s) Tue 03/18 2:30 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Jackson: Counsel for Plaintiffs are hereby directed to provide forthwith for the Court's use a bound manual copy of the pleading and/or exhibits as filed Related [+]
Related: [-] (34 Motion to File First Amended Complaint and Add Defendants). Said manual copies shall be EXACT duplicates of the pleading and/or exhibits AFTER said pleading was filed with the Court, including the case and docket number information at the top of each page, in accordance with this Court's Local Rules and Administrative Guide. Do not reorganize the document or insert other separately docketed items. If copies of sealed items are hereby ordered by the Court, then said copies shall be a separate and complete submission. (pmb, Deputy Clerk
Friday, March 14, 2025
36 36 12 pgs respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 03/14 1:16 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion Related [+] by Longreach Energy 2, LLC, Teresa Garrison Pratt ;(Maruyama, Megan)
Related: [-] 34 MOTION for Leave to File
Monday, March 03, 2025
35 35 23 pgs respm Response to Motion Mon 03/03 4:56 PM
RESPONSE to Motion Related [+] by Calvin D. Cahill, Calyx Energy III Holdings, LLC, Calyx Energy III, LLC, Riverside Gathering, LLC, Riverside Midstream Partners, LLC ;(Fields, Robin)
Related: [-] 34 MOTION for Leave to File
Monday, February 17, 2025
34 34 10 pgs motion Leave to File Document(s) Mon 02/17 1:22 PM
Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Motion to File First Amended Complaint and Add Defendants Related [+] by All Plaintiffs (With attachments) Responses due by 3/3/2025(Blevins, Bryan)
Related: [-] State Court Petition/Complaint
Monday, January 13, 2025
33 33 2 pgs order 05 - Scheduling Order Mon 01/13 12:16 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Jackson setting Scheduling Order dates: Amended Pleadings due by 3/13/2025; Joinder of Parties due by 3/13/2025; Exhibit List due by 4/14/2025; Witness List due by 4/14/2025; Class Certification Discovery due by 1/8/2026.(daw, Chambers)
Related: [-]
32 32 order 09 - MO re Consent to Magistrate Judge by Joint Status Report Mon 01/13 10:45 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Jackson: The parties have expressly indicated in the Joint Status Report signed by an authorized representative of each party in this case that they wish to consent to the jurisdiction of the United States Magistrate Judge assigned to this case. As a result, this case is deemed CONSENTED TO THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE without the necessity for the filing or submission of any other documentation. The United States Magistrate Judge will exercise complete jurisdiction over this case through and including trial and the entry of a final judgment in accordance with 28 U.S.C. § 636(c)(1) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(a). Further, the Telephonic Scheduling Conference set 1/16/2025 at 10:45 AM before Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Jackson is hereby STRICKEN. (pmb, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
31 31 misc Joint Status Report per Local Rule 16.1 Fri 01/10 4:08 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT by Riverside Midstream Partners, LLC, Riverside Gathering, LLC, Calvin D. Cahill, Calyx Energy III, LLC, Calyx Energy III Holdings, LLC (Nichols, Heidi)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 31, 2024
30 30 11 pgs respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 12/31 2:12 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion Related [+] by Riverside Midstream Partners, LLC, Riverside Gathering, LLC, Calvin D. Cahill, Calyx Energy III, LLC, Calyx Energy III Holdings, LLC ;(Nichols, Heidi)
Related: [-] 21 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
29 29 order 01 - Order Deadlines - Set/Reset Hearing(s) Directing - Parties to File Joint Status Report Tue 12/17 4:15 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT STATUS REPORT by Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Jackson setting Telephonic Scheduling Conference for 1/16/2025 at 10:45 AM before Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Jackson. Counsel should inform Paige Bruce at Paige_Bruce@oked.uscourts.gov by 1/14/2025 at 4:30 p.m. of a number where they may be reached, should it be different from the number of record in the case. Parties are directed to file a Joint Status Report by 1/10/2025.(daw, Chambers)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Scheduling Order,
Att: 2 Consent/Reassignment Form
28 28 respm Response to Motion Tue 12/17 1:08 PM
RESPONSE to Motion Related [+] by Teresa Garrison Pratt, Longreach Energy 2, LLC ;(Blevins, Bryan)
Related: [-] 21 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
27 27 notice Appearance - Attorney Wed 12/04 11:27 AM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Chad Smith on behalf of Teresa Garrison Pratt, Longreach Energy 2, LLC (Smith, Chad)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
26 26 order Ruling on Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion Tue 12/03 4:19 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Jackson granting25 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Deadline. Accordingly, Plaintiffs' Response to21 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is due by 12/17/2024. (daw, Chambers)
Related: [-]
25 25 motion Extension of Time to Respond to Motion Tue 12/03 2:17 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion Related [+] by All Plaintiffs [NOTE: Attorney Bryan O. Blevins, Jr added to All Plaintiffs]. Responses due by 12/17/2024 (Blevins, Bryan) Modified on 12/3/2024 to edit event (dma, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-] 21 MOTION to Dismiss
Monday, December 02, 2024
24 24 2 pgs notice Appearance - Attorney Mon 12/02 12:28 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Megan Maruyama on behalf of Teresa Garrison Pratt, Longreach Energy 2, LLC (Maruyama, Megan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
23 23 service Certificate of Service Wed 11/27 12:52 PM
CERTIFICATE of Service by Riverside Midstream Partners, LLC, Riverside Gathering, LLC, Calvin D. Cahill, Calyx Energy III, LLC, Calyx Energy III Holdings, LLC (Nichols, Heidi)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
22 22 misc Sealed Document Tue 11/26 5:00 PM
SEALED DOCUMENT Related [+] by Riverside Midstream Partners, LLC, Riverside Gathering, LLC, Calvin D. Cahill, Calyx Energy III, LLC, Calyx Energy III Holdings, LLC (Nichols, Heidi)
Related: [-] 21 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim
21 21 motion Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim Tue 11/26 4:55 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim by All Defendants Responses due by 12/10/2024(Nichols, Heidi)
Related: [-]
20 20 order Ruling on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Ruling on Motion for Leave to Seal Document(s) Tue 11/26 4:39 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Jackson: Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document (Docket No.19 ) is hereby GRANTED. Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Docket No.18 ) is hereby STRICKEN, and Defendant is forthwith directed to file the same Motion to Dismiss, containing no alternations, along with Sealed Exhibit 1 together. (rak, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Seal Document(s) - Leave to File Tue 11/26 3:53 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document by All Defendants (With attachments) Responses due by 12/10/2024(Nichols, Heidi)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim Tue 11/26 3:45 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim by All Defendants (With attachments) Responses due by 12/10/2024(Nichols, Heidi)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Disclosure Statement (FRCvP 7.1) Tue 11/26 3:33 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Calvin D. Cahill (Nichols, Heidi)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Disclosure Statement (FRCvP 7.1) Tue 11/26 3:33 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Riverside Gathering, LLC (Nichols, Heidi)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Disclosure Statement (FRCvP 7.1) Tue 11/26 3:32 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Riverside Midstream Partners, LLC (Nichols, Heidi)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Disclosure Statement (FRCvP 7.1) Tue 11/26 3:31 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Calyx Energy III Holdings, LLC (Nichols, Heidi)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Disclosure Statement (FRCvP 7.1) Tue 11/26 3:30 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Calyx Energy III, LLC (Nichols, Heidi)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Jury Demand Tue 11/26 9:44 AM
JURY DEMAND by Teresa Garrison Pratt, Longreach Energy 2, LLC (Walraven, Mark)
Related: [-]
11 11 3 pgs misc Disclosure Statement (FRCvP 7.1) Tue 11/26 9:42 AM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Longreach Energy 2, LLC (Walraven, Chaille)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Dismissal Tue 11/26 9:38 AM
NOTICE of Dismissal, dismissing RoyFin Natural Gas, LLC, Related [+] by Royfin Natural Gas, LLC (Walraven, Mark)
Related: [-] State Court Petition/Complaint
9 9 notice Appearance - Attorney Tue 11/26 9:28 AM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Mark E. Walraven on behalf of Teresa Garrison Pratt, Longreach Energy 2, LLC, Royfin Natural Gas, LLC (Walraven, Mark)
Related: [-]
8 8 2 pgs notice Appearance - Attorney Tue 11/26 9:25 AM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Chaille Walraven on behalf of Teresa Garrison Pratt, Longreach Energy 2, LLC, Royfin Natural Gas, LLC (Walraven, Chaille)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
7 7 notice Appearance - Attorney Tue 11/19 1:45 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Heidi M. Nichols on behalf of Riverside Midstream Partners, LLC, Riverside Gathering, LLC, Calvin D. Cahill, Calyx Energy III, LLC, Calyx Energy III, Holdings, LLC (Nichols, Heidi)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Appearance - Attorney Tue 11/19 1:42 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Robin F. Fields on behalf of Riverside Midstream Partners, LLC, Riverside Gathering, LLC, Calvin D. Cahill, Calyx Energy III, LLC, Calyx Energy III, Holdings, LLC (Fields, Robin)
Related: [-]
5 5 order 02 - Minute Order Directing - Parties to File Disclosure Statements Tue 11/19 1:09 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: Applicable parties are directed to file Disclosure Statements per FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Court's website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(rak, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
4 4 order 02 - Minute Order Directing - Submission of Notice of Consent or DJO in Magistrate Assigned Cases Tue 11/19 1:07 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: The parties are advised that this case has been assigned to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. In accordance with 28 U.S.C., Section 636(c), the Magistrate Judge will exercise complete jurisdiction over all matters in this case including trial should all parties consent to jurisdiction. Consent or election of a District Judge Option may be exercised by completing the Consent Form (Civil Case Originally Assigned to Magistrate Judge) on this Court's website at[LINK:https://www.oked.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms/civil] in accordance with the procedure outlined therein. If a party does not wish to consent to such jurisdiction, they must complete the Reassignment section. Completed forms should be submitted in PDF format to Consents_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov within twenty-one days. (rak, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
3 3 order 02 - Minute Order Directing - New CV Notice of Removal Case Filing Fee Payment Tue 11/19 1:06 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: Defendant is directed to pay the $405 filing fee within 7 days. Failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. (Filing Fee due by 11/26/2024) Related [+] (rak, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-] 2 Notice of Removal
2 2 notice Notice of Removal Tue 11/19 1:05 PM
NOTICE of Removal from McIntosh County District Court, case number CJ-2024-79 by Riverside Midstream Partners, LLC, Riverside Gathering, LLC, Calvin D. Cahill, Calyx Energy III, LLC, Calyx Energy III, Holdings, LLC. (With attachments)(rak, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
1 1 1 pgs misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 11/19 1:00 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by Riverside Midstream Partners, LLC, Riverside Gathering, LLC, Calvin D. Cahill, Calyx Energy III, LLC, Calyx Energy III, Holdings, LLC. (rak, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
misc Filing Fee Paid in Full - CV Tue 11/19 2:02 PM
FILING FEES Paid in Full on 11/19/2024 in the amount of $405, receipt number AOKEDC-2020316 Related [+] by Riverside Midstream Partners, LLC, Riverside Gathering, LLC, Calvin D. Cahill, Calyx Energy III, LLC, Calyx Energy III, Holdings, LLC (Nichols, Heidi)
Related: [-] 2 Notice of Removal,
Monday, July 08, 2024
PETITION filed in State Court against All Defendants by Longreach Energy 2, LLC, Teresa Garrison Pratt, Royfin Natural Gas, LLC. (rak, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]