Washington Western District Court
Judge:Jamal N Whitehead
Case #: 2:24-cv-01906
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause08:1329 Writ of Mandamus to Adjudicate Visa Petiti
Case Filed:Nov 19, 2024
Last checked: Friday Jan 03, 2025 12:39 AM PST
Defendant
Ur Mendoza Jaddou
Defendant
Danielle Lehman
Defendant
Alejandro Mayorkas
Plaintiff
Laleh Aghevli
Represented By
Danielle Muriel Doyle
Law Office Of Danielle Doyle
contact info
Plaintiff
Rad Hoda
Represented By
Danielle Muriel Doyle
Law Office Of Danielle Doyle
contact info
Plaintiff
Sam Hoda
Represented By
Danielle Muriel Doyle
Law Office Of Danielle Doyle
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
8 8 4 pgs order Order on Stipulated Motion ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Wed 04/02 1:15 PM
ORDER granting Parties'7 Stipulated Motion to Hold Case in Abeyance. The case is held in abeyance until 8/8/2025. The parties shall submit a status update on or before 8/8/2025. Signed by Judge Jamal N Whitehead.(KRA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
7 7 motion Stipulated Motion Thu 03/27 3:27 PM
Stipulated MOTION to Hold Case in Abeyance and [Proposed] Order , filed by All Defendants. Noting Date 3/27/2025, (Lambert, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
6 6 4 pgs order Order on Stipulated Motion ~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Thu 01/30 5:20 PM
ORDER granting Parties'5 Stipulated Motion to Hold Case in Abeyance. The case is held in abeyance until 4/1/2025. The parties shall submit a status update on or before 4/1/2025. Signed by Judge Jamal N Whitehead. (KRA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
5 5 motion Stipulated Motion Wed 01/29 3:41 PM
Stipulated MOTION to Hold Case in Abeyance and [Proposed] Order , filed by All Defendants. Noting Date 1/29/2025, (Lambert, Michelle)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 01/29 3:38 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michelle R. Lambert on behalf of Defendants Danielle Lehman, Alejandro Mayorkas, Ur Mendoza Jaddou. (Lambert, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 29, 2024
3 3 service Affidavit of Service of Summons & Complaint Fri 11/29 5:32 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to Alejandro Mayorkas, Secretary of the United States Department of Homeland Security; Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Director of United States Citizenship and Immigration Services; Danielle Lehman, Acting Director of the San Francisco Asylum Office, US Attorney on 11/26/2024, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Doyle, Danielle)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 11/21 12:32 PM
Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) All Defendants(AVC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 11/21 9:56 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Sam Hoda, Laleh Aghevli, Rad Hoda.(Doyle, Danielle) ( No Fee Required Fee paid, receipt number AWAWDC-8724801) Modified on 11/21/2024 to add receipt number (KB). Modified on 11/21/2024 to remove duplicative language (AVC). (AVC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint,
Att: 2 Summons Office of US Attorney,
Att: 3 Summons DHS Mayorkas,
Att: 4 Summons SFAO Lehman,
Att: 5 Summons USCIS Jaddou
Att: 6 (11/21/2024) Civil Cover Sheet
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 11/21 11:56 AM
Judge Jamal N Whitehead added. (AVC)
Related: [-]