New Mexico District Court
Judge:Kea W Riggs
Referred: Gregory J Fouratt
Case #: 2:24-cv-01170
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Case Filed:Nov 19, 2024
Last checked: Sunday May 18, 2025 3:01 AM MDT
Counter Claimant
J C Services, LLC
Represented By
Timothy B Rode
Hinkle Shanor LLP
contact info
Richard E. Olson
Hinkle Shanor, LLP
contact info
Thomas M. Hnasko
Hinkle Hensley Shanor & Martin LLP
contact info
Counter Claimant
J&J Investments, LLC
Represented By
Timothy B Rode
Hinkle Shanor LLP
contact info
Richard E. Olson
Hinkle Shanor, LLP
contact info
Thomas M. Hnasko
Hinkle Hensley Shanor & Martin LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
National American Insurance Company
Represented By
Sonya R. Burke
Modrall Sperling Roehl Harris & Sisk PA
contact info
Jennifer A. Noya
Modrall Sperling Roehl Harris & Sisk PA
contact info
Defendant
J C Services, LLC
Represented By
Timothy B Rode
Hinkle Shanor LLP
contact info
Richard E. Olson
Hinkle Shanor, LLP
contact info
Thomas M. Hnasko
Hinkle Hensley Shanor & Martin LLP
contact info
Defendant
J&J Investments, LLC
Represented By
Timothy B Rode
Hinkle Shanor LLP
contact info
Richard E. Olson
Hinkle Shanor, LLP
contact info
Thomas M. Hnasko
Hinkle Hensley Shanor & Martin LLP
contact info
Defendant
Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London
Represented By
Lisa M. Wilson
Wilson Elser
contact info
Defendant
Hamilton Insurance DAC
Represented By
Justin Scott Hepworth
Clyde & Co LLP
contact info
Amy M. Samberg
Clyde & Co Us LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
National American Insurance Company
Represented By
Sonya R. Burke
Modrall Sperling Roehl Harris & Sisk PA
contact info
Jennifer A. Noya
Modrall Sperling Roehl Harris & Sisk PA
contact info

GPO Apr 10 2025
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' UNOPPOSED MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE ACTIONS by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. JC Services, LLC v. Hamilton Insurance DAC, 24cv1260 GJF/JHR is hereby consolidated into this case. (am)

Docket last updated: 51 minutes ago
Thursday, May 15, 2025
38 38 6 pgs ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. Telephonic Pre-Settlement Status Conference set for 10/20/2025, at 10:00 AM MDT. The parties shall call the WebEx conference line at (855) 244-8681 and dial access code 2313 888 6328 to connect to the proceedings. When prompted for an Attendee ID number, press #. Client attendance is not required. Settlement Conference set for 11/3/2025, at 9:00 AM MST in a to-be-determined courtroom in Albuquerque, New Mexico. Confidential Position Statements due 10/27/2025, by 3:00 p.m. MDT. (am)
Related: [-]
37 37 3 pgs ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL DEADLINES AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. Discovery due 11/7/2025. Discovery Motions due 11/28/2025. Pretrial Motions due 12/12/2025. (am)
Related: [-]
NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 28. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
36 36 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt: Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference held on 5/14/2025. (am)
Related: [-]
34 34 NOTICE by Hamilton Insurance DAC Notice of Service of Initial Disclosures (Hepworth, Justin)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge Kea W. Riggs as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges. Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Chief Magistrate Jud Gregory B. Wormuth no longer assigned to this case. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
32 32 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London Initial Disclosures (Wilson, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
31 31 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by J C Services, LLC, J&J Investments, LLC (Olson, Richard)
Related: [-]
30 30 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan by National American Insurance Company (Noya, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
29 29 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by National American Insurance Company NAICO's Initial Disclosures (Noya, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), National American Insurance Company voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Chief Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Noya, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
ORDER RESETTING INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. The Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference set for Tuesday, May 13, 2025, is hereby VACATED and RESET for Wednesday, May 14, 2025, at 10:00 a.m. MDT. All other deadlines in the21 Amended Initial Scheduling Order remain in place. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (am)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London by Lisa M. Wilson on behalf of: Janet Tolbert Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP 1601 Elm St., Ste. 2600 Dallas, TX 75201 2146988000 Fax 2146981101 janet.tolbert@wilsonelser.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Wilson, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-9905086 re: # 26 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Wilson, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
25 25 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London re17 Unopposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by J&J Investments, LLC, J C Services, LLC,23 Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss Counts II and III of Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint Related [+] filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London,12 Joint MOTION to Vacate Scheduling Conference filed by National American Insurance Company (Wilson, Lisa)
Related: [-] ply in Support
Friday, April 18, 2025
ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London by Lisa M. Wilson on behalf of: Janet Tolbert Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP 1601 Elm Street, Suite 2600 Dallas, TX 75201 214-698-8000 Fax 214-698-1101 janet.tolbert@wilsonelser.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Wilson, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
23 23 Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss Counts II and III of Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint Related [+] by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London. (Wilson, Lisa) Modified filer on 4/16/2025 (jn)
Related: [-] ply in Support
Monday, April 14, 2025
NOTICE OF CONSENT SUBMISSION DEADLINE: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that the Clerk will reassign this matter to a district judge as the trial judge no later than 21 days from the entry of this notice unless consents from all parties have been filed. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (kls)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
21 21 3 pgs AMENDED INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. A Telephonic Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference is set for May 13, 2025, at 11:00 a.m. MDT. Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan due by May 6, 2025. The parties shall call the WebEx conference line at (855) 244-8681 and dial access code 2313 888 6328 to connect to the proceedings. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than May 2, 2025. (am)
Related: [-]
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt that, in light of the19 Order Granting Motion to Consolidate, the parties shall forthwith file their pleadings and dispositive motion briefing, including any forthcoming reply to Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London's Partial Motion to Dismiss, in the lead case 24cv1170 GBW/GJF). [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (am)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
19 19 3 pgs ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' UNOPPOSED MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE ACTIONS by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. JC Services, LLC v. Hamilton Insurance DAC, 24cv1260 GJF/JHR is hereby consolidated into this case. (am)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
18 18 Joint Status Report by J C Services, LLC, J&J Investments, LLC (Hnasko, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
17 17 Unopposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases by J C Services, LLC, J&J Investments, LLC. (Hnasko, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
ORDER FOR STATUS REPORT by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. The parties having moved to vacate the initial scheduling conference on the ground that they intend to move to consolidate this action with 24cv1260 after the defendants in the latter case were served [ECF 12], and the defendants in 24cv1260 having been served and having answered the complaint, the parties in this case shall file a status report by Friday, April 11, 2025 , notifying the Court if and when they intend to move to consolidate or, alternatively, that the Court should reset the initial scheduling conference. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (am)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
15 15 NOTICE by J C Services, LLC, J&J Investments, LLC (Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel) (Hnasko, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 17, 2025
14 14 NOTICE by J C Services, LLC, J&J Investments, LLC Corporate Disclosure (Olson, Richard)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
13 13 1 pgs ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt GRANTING12 Joint Motion to Vacate Scheduling Conference. (am)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
12 12 Joint MOTION to Vacate Scheduling Conference by National American Insurance Company. (Burke, Sonya)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
11 11 NAICO's ANSWER to7 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, by National American Insurance Company.(Burke, Sonya)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
10 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard E. Olson on behalf of J C Services, LLC, J&J Investments, LLC (Olson, Richard)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
9 9 2 pgs INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. A Telephonic Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference is set for 2/18/2025, at 10:00 a.m. MST. Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan due by 2/11/2025. The parties shall call the WebEx conference line at (855) 244-8681 and dial access code 2313 888 6328 to connect to the proceedings. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 1/6/2025. (am)
Related: [-]
8 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy B Rode on behalf of J C Services, LLC, J&J Investments, LLC (Rode, Timothy)
Related: [-]
7 7 ANSWER to1 Complaint, for Declaratory Relief , COUNTERCLAIM (s) against National American Insurance Company by J&J Investments, LLC, J C Services, LLC. Related document:1 Complaint, filed by National American Insurance Company.(Hnasko, Thomas)
Related: [-]
6 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas M. Hnasko on behalf of All Defendants (Hnasko, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
5 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by National American Insurance Company. J&J Investments, LLC served on 11/25/2024, answer due 12/16/2024. (Noya, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
4 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by National American Insurance Company. J C Services, LLC served on 11/25/2024, answer due 12/16/2024. (Noya, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
3 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by National American Insurance Company (Noya, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
2 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Chief Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (eh)
Related: [-]
1 1 14 pgs COMPLAINT For Declaratory Relief against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by National American Insurance Company.(Noya, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet
Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 405 receipt number ANMDC-9646044 re1 Complaint, filed by National American Insurance Company (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Noya, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 1 (Albuquerque) to 2 (Las Cruces). (eh)
Related: [-]
United States Chief Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth and United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt assigned. (eh)
Related: [-]
PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Chief Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (eh)
Related: [-]
Summons Issued as to J C Services, LLC and J&J Investments, LLC. (eh)
Related: [-]