Georgia Southern District Court
Judge:R Stan Baker
Referred: Christopher L Ray
Case #: 4:24-cv-00259
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:1981 Civil Rights
Case Filed:Nov 19, 2024
Last checked: Sunday May 18, 2025 4:45 AM EDT
Defendant
Savannah-Chatham County Public Schools
Represented By
Andrew Harrison Dekle
Bouhan Falligant, LLP
contact info
Defendant
S. Denise Watts
Represented By
Andrew Harrison Dekle
Bouhan Falligant, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Jacqueline Xavier
Represented By
Matthew C. Billips
Barrett & Farahany
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
26 26 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave of Absence Tue 04/15 2:48 PM
ORDER granting25 Motion for Leave of Absence for attorney Matthew C. Billips for the dates of June 2-6, 2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on April 15, 2025. (jrb)
Related: [-]
25 25 motion Leave of Absence Tue 04/15 12:56 PM
MOTION for Leave of Absence as to Jacqueline Xavier for dates of : June 2-6, 2025 by Jacqueline Xavier. Responses due by 4/29/2025. (Billips, Matthew)
Related: [-]
utility Motions Referred Tue 04/15 1:33 PM
MOTIONS REFERRED:25 MOTION for Leave of Absence as to Jacqueline Xavier for dates of : June 2-6, 2025 (thb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
24 24 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave of Absence Thu 03/27 10:19 AM
ORDER granting23 Motion for Leave of Absence of Andrew H. Dekle for the following dates: 5/19/2025 through 5/21/2025; 5/29/2025 through 5/30/2025; 6/12/2025 through 6/13/2025; 6/27/2025 through 7/3/2025; and 9/25/2025 through 9/26/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 3/26/2025. (amd)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
23 23 motion Leave of Absence Wed 03/26 1:41 PM
MOTION for Leave of Absence as to Savannah-Chatham County Public Schools, S. Denise Watts for dates of : 5/19/25 - 5/21/25; 5/29/25 - 5/30/25; 6/12/25 - 6/13/25; 6/27/25 - 7/3/25; and 9/25/25 - 9/26/25 by Savannah-Chatham County Public Schools, S. Denise Watts. Responses due by 4/9/2025.(Dekle, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
utility Motions Referred Wed 03/26 3:00 PM
MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge:23 MOTION for Leave of Absence as to Savannah-Chatham County Public Schools, S. Denise Watts for dates of : 5/19/25 - 5/21/25; 5/29/25 - 5/30/25; 6/12/25 - 6/13/25; 6/27/25 - 7/3/25; and 9/25/25 - 9/26/25. (kjm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
22 22 notice Notice (Other) Thu 03/13 3:04 PM
NOTICE by Jacqueline Xavier re19 Order on Motion to Dismiss,,, Order on Motion for More Definite Statement,,,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages,, (Billips, Matthew)
Related: [-]
21 21 notice Notice of Intent Thu 03/13 2:54 PM
NOTICE of Intent to File Reply by Jacqueline Xavier re20 Reply to Response to Motion. (Billips, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
20 20 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 03/12 5:33 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (Doc. No. 10) filed by Savannah-Chatham County Public Schools, S. Denise Watts. (Dekle, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
19 19 4 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Motion for More Definite Statement Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Tue 03/11 3:23 PM
ORDER terminating as moot5 -6 Motions to Dismiss; granting18 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Defendants may file a reply brief up to 36 pages, inclusive of the Certificate of Service. To understand more fully why Plaintiff refused to consent to the administrative request to file excess pages, Plaintiff is directed to submit a Notice informing the Court the bases for her apparent opposition to Defendants request no later than 5:00 p.m. on March 13, 2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 03/11/2025. (jlh)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 03/11 3:24 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance re Plaintiff's Notice due by 3/13/2025. (jlh)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
18 18 motion Leave to File Excess Pages Mon 03/10 3:16 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Savannah-Chatham County Public Schools, S. Denise Watts. Responses due by 3/24/2025. (Dekle, Andrew)
Related: [-]
utility Motions Referred Mon 03/10 4:28 PM
MOTION REFERRED:18 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages. (pmh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
17 17 notice Notice of Intent Tue 03/04 12:27 PM
NOTICE of Intent to File Reply Brief by Savannah-Chatham County Public Schools, S. Denise Watts re16 Response in Opposition to Motion. (Dekle, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
16 16 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 02/26 1:42 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (Doc. No. 10) filed by Jacqueline Xavier. (Billips, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
15 15 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 02/13 4:47 PM
ORDER granting14 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff is directed to respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by no later than 2/26/2025. Related [+] Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 2/13/2025. (amd)
Related: [-] sponses due by 2/26/2025.
14 14 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 02/13 1:05 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (Doc. No. 10) by Jacqueline Xavier. Responses due by 2/27/2025. (Billips, Matthew)
Related: [-]
utility Motions Referred Thu 02/13 1:35 PM
MOTIONS REFERRED:14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (Doc. No. 10) (thb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
13 13 motion Dismiss Wed 02/05 5:15 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (Doc. No. 10) by Savannah-Chatham County Public Schools, S. Denise Watts. Responses due by 2/19/2025.(Dekle, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-EEOC Charge,
Att: 2 Exhibit B-Affidavit-Finch-Wirth,
Att: 3 Exhibit C-Affidavit-Watts,
Att: 4 Exhibit D-Waiver of Service
Thursday, January 23, 2025
12 12 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 01/23 8:10 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re5 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for More Definite Statement and Suggestion of Mootness filed by Jacqueline Xavier. (Billips, Matthew)
Related: [-]
11 11 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 01/23 8:09 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re6 MOTION to Dismiss Rule 12(b) MOTION for More Definite Statement Rule 12(b) filed by Jacqueline Xavier. (Billips, Matthew)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Amended Document (NOT Motion) Thu 01/23 8:08 PM
AMENDED DOCUMENT by Jacqueline Xavier. Amendment to1 Complaint . (Billips, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
9 9 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Amend Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 12/23 10:41 AM
ORDER granting8 Motion for Extension of Time to file an Amended1 Complaint. Plaintiff shall up through and including January 23, 2025, to file her response to Defendants' pending5 and6 Motions to Dismiss, as well as to file an Amended Complaint. Responses due by 1/23/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 12/23/2024. (jlh)
Related: [-]
utility Motions Referred Mon 12/23 9:15 AM
MOTIONS REFERRED:8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend1 Complaint Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to5 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for More Definite Statement,6 MOTION to Dismiss Rule 12(b) MOTION for More Definite Statement Rule 12(b).(csr)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 12/23 10:41 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 1/23/2025. (jlh)
Related: [-]
Sunday, December 22, 2024
8 8 motion Extension of Time to Amend Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Sun 12/22 8:16 PM
*******Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend1 Complaint , Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to5 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for More Definite Statement ,6 MOTION to Dismiss Rule 12(b) MOTION for More Definite Statement Rule 12(b) by Jacqueline Xavier. Responses due by 1/6/2025. (Billips, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
7 7 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 12/13 10:17 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jacqueline Xavier. S. Denise Watts waiver sent on 12/12/2024, answer due 2/10/2025. (Billips, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
6 6 motion Dismiss More Definite Statement Thu 12/12 5:52 PM
******* MOTION to Dismiss Rule 12(b) , MOTION for More Definite Statement Rule 12(b) by S. Denise Watts. Responses due by 12/26/2024.(Dekle, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Dr. Watts,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Finch-Wirth,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Redacted EEOC Charge,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Waiver of Service of Summons
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
5 5 motion Dismiss More Definite Statement Tue 12/10 4:53 PM
******* MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION for More Definite Statement by Savannah-Chatham County Public Schools. Responses due by 12/24/2024.(Dekle, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - EEOC Charge
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
4 4 Notice to All Counsel of Record: Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form.[LINK:CLICK HERE TO READ] . (gmh)
Related: [-]
3 3 order Rule 26(f) Order Tue 11/19 4:23 PM
NOTICE of Standing Order regarding cases pending before Chief District Judge R. Stan Baker. ([LINK:Click Here to View Standing Order)] RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Chief District Judge R. Stan Baker on 11/19/2024. (gmh)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 11/19 4:22 PM
Summonses Issued as to Savannah-Chatham County Public Schools, S. Denise Watts. (gmh)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 11/19 4:20 PM
COMPLAINT against Savannah-Chatham County Public Schools, S. Denise Watts, filed by Jacqueline Xavier. Filing fee paid, $405.00, Receipt # AGASDC-3941412. (gmh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
notice Notice to Counsel (CLR Forms) Tue 11/19 4:24 PM
Notice to All Counsel of Record: Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form.[LINK:CLICK HERE TO READ] . (gmh)
Related: [-]