Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Rodney Gilstrap
Referred: Roy S Payne
Case #: 2:24-cv-00948
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Nov 19, 2024
Terminated:Apr 20, 2025
Last checked: Friday Jan 03, 2025 2:27 AM CST
Defendant
CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By
Jeanne M Gills
Foley & Lardner Llp - Chicago
contact info
Plaintiff
AML IP, LLC
Represented By
William P Ramey, III
Ramey LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 89 minutes ago
Sunday, April 20, 2025
16 16 1 pgs notice Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) Tue 04/22 1:08 PM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) at termination of case. AO 120 emailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (jmb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
15 15 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 04/15 11:27 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by AML IP, LLC (Ramey, William)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
misc Notice of Deficiency Tue 03/18 11:28 AM
Clerk's LR CV-10(d) Notice of Deficiency as to 14 Motion to Stay, - Recommended cure: Within one day, Filer must refile the motion in the lead case. (KLC)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
14 14 motion Stay Mon 03/17 12:57 PM
UNOPPOSED MOTION to Stay Unopposed Motion to Stay All Deadlines and Notice of Settlement by AML IP, LLC.(Ramey, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
13 13 1 pgs order Order Tue 02/18 12:00 PM
CONSOLIDATION ORDER - The above-captioned cases are hereby ORDERED to be CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues with the LEAD CASE, Case No. 2:24-cv-00908. All parties are instructed to file any future filings in the LEAD CASE. Individual cases remain active for trial.. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/18/2025. (NKL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
12 12 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 02/13 1:45 PM
ORDER granting11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re11 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint CVS Pharmacy, Inc. answer due 3/17/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 02/13/2025. (KLC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
11 11 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 02/12 5:23 PM
JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by CVS Pharmacy, Inc..(Gills, Jeanne)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, December 13, 2024
9 9 service Affidavit of Service Fri 12/13 9:52 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Brett Baquell on 12/11/2024, filed by AML IP, LLC. (Ramey, William)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
8 8 text Clerk's Entry re Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Thu 12/12 4:01 PM
Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted. CVS Pharmacy, Inc. answer is now due 2/14/2025. (Text entry only, no document attached.)(NKL)
Related: [-]
7 7 text Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Thu 12/12 3:52 PM
Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. Summons originally served on 12/11/2024. Agreed new answer date is 2/14/2025.(Gills, Jeanne)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Thu 12/12 3:38 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeanne M Gills on behalf of CVS Pharmacy, Inc. (Gills, Jeanne)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
5 5 service Summons Issued Tue 11/19 4:42 PM
SUMMONS Issued as to CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (NKL)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice (Other) Tue 11/19 4:08 PM
NOTICE Notice of Related Cases by AML IP, LLC(Ramey, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
3 3 notice Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons Tue 11/19 4:07 PM
Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by AML IP, LLC (Ramey, William)
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs notice Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) Tue 11/19 4:04 PM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 emailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ramey, William)
Related: [-]
1 1 6 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 11/19 4:03 PM
COMPLAINT against CVS Pharmacy, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXEDC-10501698.), filed by AML IP, LLC.(Ramey, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 11/19 4:35 PM
Case Assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap and Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (NKL)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Magistrate Judge Availability Tue 11/19 4:35 PM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (NKL)
Related: [-]