Oklahoma Northern District Court
Judge:Jodi F Jayne
Case #: 4:24-cv-00561
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act (ADA)
Case Filed:Nov 19, 2024
Last checked: Sunday May 18, 2025 4:16 AM CDT
Defendant
Sofidel America Corp.
Represented By
Philip Richard Bruce
Mcafee & Taft
contact info
Grace DeJohn
Mcafee & Taft
contact info
Plaintiff
Dalia Cristina Saravia
Represented By
Janelle Jade Romero
Consumer Justice Law Firm PLC
contact info
Haley Lynn Simmoneau
Athena Legal Group PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
19 19 order 05 - Scheduling Order Deadlines - Set/Reset Scheduling Order Date(s) Tue 02/04 1:47 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jodi F Jayne , setting/resetting scheduling order date(s): ( Discovery due by 7/21/2025, Dispositive Motions due by 8/11/2025, Motion Hearing set for 10/3/2025 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jodi F Jayne, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 11/12/2025, Pretrial Conference set for 11/25/2025 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jodi F Jayne, Jury Trial set for 1/5/2026 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jodi F Jayne) (sdc, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
18 18 misc Joint Status Report per LCvR16-1(b)(1) Mon 02/03 10:54 AM
JOINT STATUS REPORT by Dalia Cristina Saravia (Romero, Janelle)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
17 17 notice Appearance - Attorney Wed 01/29 11:09 AM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Janelle Jade Romero on behalf of Dalia Cristina Saravia [Note: Attorney Janelle Jade Romero added to party Dalia Cristina Saravia(pty:pla).] (Romero, Janelle)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
16 16 order 02 - Minute Order Ruling on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Thu 01/23 12:57 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jodi F Jayne granting Plaintiff's motion to admit Janelle Romero pro hac vice (ECF No. 15). Attorney Romero is admitted pro hac vice and further directed to file a separate entry of appearance by January 30, 2025 ; granting15 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (kah, Chambers)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 20, 2025
15 15 motion Admission Pro Hac Vice Mon 01/20 12:42 PM
MOTION for Attorney(s) Janelle Romero to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $125 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-3140595) by Dalia Cristina Saravia (Simmoneau, Haley)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
14 14 notice Appearance - Attorney Thu 01/16 10:44 AM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Grace DeJohn on behalf of Sofidel America Corp. [Note: Attorney Grace DeJohn added to party Sofidel America Corp.(pty:dft).] (DeJohn, Grace)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
13 13 order 01 - Order Directing - Parties to File Joint Status Report Mon 01/13 2:39 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jodi F Jayne , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 2/3/2025) (kah, Chambers)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
12 12 respoth Answer Fri 01/10 1:34 PM
ANSWER Related [+] by Sofidel America Corp. (Bruce, Philip)
Related: [-] 2 Complaint
11 11 misc Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) Fri 01/10 1:23 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Sofidel S.p.A., Corporate Parent Sofidel UK Ltd, Other Affiliate Sofidel Tissue LLC, Other Affiliate Sofidel Las Vegas TAS LLC, Other Affiliate Sofidel Elwood LLC, Other Affiliate Sofidel Shelby LLC for Sofidel America Corp.) by Sofidel America Corp. (Bruce, Philip)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
10 10 order 02 - Minute Order Directing - Party(ies) to File Disclosure Statement Mon 12/16 9:07 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Sofidel America Corp. to file a Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 and LCvR 7.1-1, if applicable. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dla, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
9 9 order 02 - Minute Order Deadlines - Set/Reset Deadline(s)/Hearing(s) Ruling on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 12/13 11:21 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jodi F Jayne Defendant's unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint or Otherwise Respond (ECF No. 8) is GRANTED. Defendant may answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint by January 10, 2025 ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Miscellaneous Deadline set for 1/10/2025); granting8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (kah, Chambers)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
8 8 motion Extension of Time to Answer Thu 12/12 5:11 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Related [+] by Sofidel America Corp. (Bruce, Philip)
Related: [-] 2 Complaint
7 7 notice Appearance - Attorney Thu 12/12 5:04 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Philip Richard Bruce on behalf of Sofidel America Corp. [Note: Attorney Philip Richard Bruce added to party Sofidel America Corp.(pty:dft).] (Bruce, Philip)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 12/04 10:36 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Sofidel America Corp. Related [+] by Dalia Cristina Saravia (Simmoneau, Haley)
Related: [-] 2 Complaint
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
5 5 service Summons Issued Wed 11/20 10:40 AM
SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Sofidel America Corp. (atn, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
4 4 order 15 - Notice of Assignment of Case to MJ Wed 11/20 10:39 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF CASE TO A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. ACTION REQUIRED: This case has been randomly assigned to a United States magistrate judge for all purposes, including trial, final entry of judgment, and direct review by the Tenth Circuit Court of Appeals. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge, if the attached form is not signed and returned within the applicable deadline. The plaintiff or removing party must serve a copy of this notice upon all other parties to this action. (atn, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
order 02 - Minute Order Directing - Party(ies) to File Disclosure Statement Wed 11/20 10:38 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Dalia Cristina Saravia to file a Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 and LCvR 7.1-1, if applicable. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (atn, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
2 2 cmp Complaint Tue 11/19 4:56 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Sofidel America Corp. (paid $405 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-3109735) by Dalia Cristina Saravia (Simmoneau, Haley)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 11/19 4:53 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by Dalia Cristina Saravia (Simmoneau, Haley)
Related: [-]