Washington Western District Court
Judge:Barbara J Rothstein
Case #: 2:24-cv-01909
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Nov 19, 2024
Terminated:Mar 24, 2025
Case in other court:9th Circuit Court of Appeals, 25-02652
Last checked: Friday Jan 03, 2025 12:40 AM PST
Defendant
Garret Smith
Defendant
Skagit Highlands Homes LLC
Defendant
MTT Homes 1 LLC
Defendant
MTT Holdings Inc
Defendant
MTT Construction LLC
Defendant
Dead Goat Properties LLC
Defendant
Whatcom County
Defendant
Thomas L Tollen, III
Defendant
Jon-Paul Shanahan
Defendant
Erin Page
Defendant
Morgan Tollen Lindberg
Defendant
Matthew Mahaffie
Defendant
Mark Personius
Defendant
Amy Keenan
Defendant
Thomas Brissenden
Plaintiff
Whisper Lake Developments Inc
Represented By
Lawrence A Kogan
The Kogan Law Group PC
contact info
Nicholas E. D. Power
Law Office Of Nicholas Power
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
60 60 discov Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement Wed 05/14 11:36 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Kogan, Lawrence)
Related: [-]