Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Roy K Altman
Referred: Enjolique A Lett
Case #: 1:24-cv-24563
Nature of Suit790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Case Filed:Nov 19, 2024
Last checked: Friday Jan 03, 2025 3:27 AM EST
Defendant
Lera Investment Technologies, Inc.
1111 Brickell Ave Suite 2775
Miami, FL 33131
Represented By
Maia Aron
Mark Migdal & Hayden
contact info
Plaintiff
Robert M Koffler
Represented By
Tracy Perez
De La Pena Group, P.A.
contact info
Otto De Cordoba, Jr.
De La Pena Group, P.A.
contact info
Leoncio Ernesto De La Pena
De La Pena Group, PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Thursday, February 20, 2025
22 22 respm Reply in Support of Motion Thu 02/20 4:02 PM
REPLY in Support of Motion re7 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss1 Complaint . filed by Lera Investment Technologies, Inc.. (Aron, Maia)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
21 21 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 02/13 12:25 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re7 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss1 Complaint filed by Robert M Koffler. Replies due by 2/20/2025. (De La Pena, Leoncio)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
20 20 1 pgs order Order Scheduling Mediation Thu 01/30 4:15 PM
ORDER Scheduling Mediation before Mediator Alan S. Fine. Mediation Hearing set for 7/28/2025 10:00 AM Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 1/29/2025. See attached document for full details. (ar24)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
19 19 notice Notice (Other) Wed 01/29 11:59 AM
Joint NOTICE of Filing Proposed Order Scheduling Mediation by Lera Investment Technologies, Inc. re14 Scheduling Order,, Order Referring Case to Mediation,, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge, (Aron, Maia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
18 18 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 01/14 8:01 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING the Plaintiff's17 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the7 Motion to Dismiss. The Plaintiff must respond to the Motion to Dismiss by February 13, 2025 . Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 1/14/2025. (es00)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Extension of Time Tue 01/14 11:43 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to Motion to Dismiss re7 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss1 Complaint by Robert M Koffler. Responses due by 1/28/2025. (De La Pena, Leoncio)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2025
16 16 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Thu 01/09 10:30 AM
ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURES Signed by Magistrate Judge Enjolique A. Lett on 1/9/2025. See attached document for full details. (mwn)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Thu 01/09 10:03 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles Mark Garabedian, Jr on behalf of Lera Investment Technologies, Inc.. Attorney Charles Mark Garabedian, Jr added to party Lera Investment Technologies, Inc.(pty:dft). (Garabedian, Charles)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
14 14 order Scheduling Order Order Referring Case to Mediation Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Thu 01/09 8:05 AM
ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Jury Trial set for 1/12/2026 in Miami Division before Judge Roy K. Altman., Calendar Call set for 1/6/2026 01:45 PM in Miami Division before Judge Roy K. Altman.), ( Mediation Deadline 9/30/2025.). Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 1/8/2025. See attached document for full details. (drz)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 01/08 10:31 AM
Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Robert M Koffler identifying Corporate Parent Maite, LLC for Robert M Koffler (De La Pena, Leoncio)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
12 12 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Tue 01/07 8:31 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. We6 ordered the parties to file certificates of interested parties by January 6, 2025. The Defendant11 did. The Plaintiff didn't. By 5:00 p.m. ET on January 8, 2025 , then, the Plaintiff must file its certificate of interested parties. If it doesn't, we'll dismiss this action under Rule 41(b). Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 1/7/2025. (es00)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
11 11 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 01/06 4:04 PM
Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lera Investment Technologies, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Tri-Cap Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate 530 Mashta, LLC, Other Affiliate LIT Argentina S.R.L., Other Affiliate LIT Australia Pty Ltd, Other Affiliate LIT Brazil Ltda, Other Affiliate Lera Investment Technologies Canada Limited, Other Affiliate LIT Chile SpA, Other Affiliate LIT China Company Limited, Other Affiliate Lera Investment Technologies Colombia S.A.S., Other Affiliate LIT Egypt LLC, Other Affiliate LIT Germany GmbH, Other Affiliate Lera Investment Technologies Hong Kong, Other Affiliate Lera Investment Technologies India Private Limited, Other Affiliate PT LIT Technologies Indonesia, Other Affiliate Lera Investment Technologies Ireland Limited, Other Affiliate LIT Italia S.R.L., Other Affiliate LIT JAPAN KK, Other Affiliate LIT Lera Investment Technologies Kenya Limited, Other Affiliate Lera Technologies Malaysia Sdn. Bhd., Other Affiliate Lera Technologies Mexico S. de R.L. de C.V., Other Affiliate LIT Morocco SRL, Other Affiliate Lera Investment Technologies Peru S.A.C., Other Affiliate LIT US LLC (Branch), Other Affiliate Lera Investment Technologies RUS Limited Liability Company, Other Affiliate Lera Investment Technologies Singapore Pte. Ltd., Other Affiliate LIT South Africa (PTY) Ltd, Other Affiliate Lera Investment Technologies Spain, S.L.U., Other Affiliate LIT Helvetica GmbH, Other Affiliate LIT Technologies Thai Limited, Other Affiliate LIT Pakistan Private Limited, Other Affiliate Lera Technologies Philippines Inc, Other Affiliate Lera Turkey Investment Technologies Trading LLC, Other Affiliate Lera Investment Technologies Ukraine LLC, Other Affiliate Lera Investment Technologies UK Limited, Other Affiliate LIT Korea LTD, Other Affiliate LIT US LLC, Other Affiliate LIT Digital Infrastructure, LLC, Other Affiliate LIT Insurance Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate LERA INVESTMENT TECHNOLOGIES VIETNAM COMPANY LIMITED, Other Affiliate Camilo Montana Pradilla, Other Affiliate MG Revocable Trust, Other Affiliate The Montana Gonzalez Family Irrevocable Trust, Other Affiliate Syndicated Investors, Other Affiliate Kickstart Seed Fund VI LP, Other Affiliate Clearly Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate Sandra Osuna de Holschneider, Other Affiliate Crisoforo A. Lozano, Other Affiliate Crisoforo A. Lozano, Other Affiliate Thor Equity Trust USA, Other Affiliate Dinamo Holding Trust - USA, Other Affiliate Catetes Trust USA for Lera Investment Technologies, Inc. (Aron, Maia)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney Mon 01/06 2:20 PM
Clerk's Notice to Filer re9 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents Not Entered ; ERROR - The Filer failed to enter all Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents from the Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Filer is instructed to refile their Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement and enter the missing Other Affiliates/Corp Parents. Note - Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents do not appear on the docket sheet. (drz)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 01/06 1:40 PM
Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lera Investment Technologies, Inc. (Aron, Maia)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Scheduling Report - Rule 26(f)/16.1 Mon 01/06 12:28 PM
Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Robert M Koffler (De La Pena, Leoncio)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
7 7 motion Dismiss Thu 01/02 3:07 PM
Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss1 Complaint by Lera Investment Technologies, Inc.. Responses due by 1/16/2025. (Aron, Maia)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
6 6 1 pgs order Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report Mon 12/23 3:20 PM
ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Joint Scheduling Report due by 1/6/2025 Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 12/23/2024. See attached document for full details. (drz)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
5 5 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Wed 12/11 12:37 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING the Defendant's4 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. The Defendant must answer or respond to the1 Complaint by January 2, 2025 . Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 12/11/2024. (es00)
Related: [-]
utility ~Util - Set/Reset Response/Answer Due Deadline Wed 12/11 1:51 PM
Set/Reset Response/Answer Due Deadline: Lera Investment Technologies, Inc. response/answer due 1/2/2025. (per order de#5) (drz)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
4 4 motion Extension of Time Tue 12/10 9:00 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to Complaint by Lera Investment Technologies, Inc.. Attorney Maia Aron added to party Lera Investment Technologies, Inc.(pty:dft). Responses due by 12/26/2024.(Aron, Maia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Wed 11/20 9:17 AM
Summons Issued as to Lera Investment Technologies, Inc.. (ar24)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Wed 11/20 9:15 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Roy K. Altman. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Enjolique A. Lett is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (ar24)
Related: [-]
1 1 15 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 11/19 6:20 PM
COMPLAINT against Lera Investment Technologies, Inc.. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17996586, filed by Robert M Koffler.(De La Pena, Leoncio)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summon(s)