New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Hector Gonzalez
Referred: Lois Bloom
Case #: 1:24-cv-07885
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1983 Civil Rights
Case Filed:Nov 08, 2024
Terminated:Feb 14, 2025
Last checked: Monday Dec 23, 2024 3:46 AM EST
Defendant
New York City Officer, Rodriguez #928
Plaintiff
Kerry Rita Constantino
185 St Marks Pl.
Staten Island, NY 10301

GPO Jan 17 2025
ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the Attached Order, Plaintiff's motion seeking leave to proceed in forma pauperis is granted, see ECF No. 2, but Plaintiff's Complaint is dismissed for failure to state a claim, see 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii), and failure to comply with Rule 8 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The Court grants Plaintiff leave to file an amended complaint on or before February 7, 2025. Any amended complaint she elects to file must be captioned "Amended Complaint" and bear the same docket number as this Order. If Plaintiff does not file an amended complaint on or before February 7, 2025, the Court will direct the Clerk of Court to issue judgment and close this case. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to mail a copy of this Order to the pro se Plaintiff and to note the mailing on the docket. The Court certifies pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith and, therefore, in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of any appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Ordered by Judge Hector Gonzalez on 1/17/2025. (ICP)

Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Friday, February 14, 2025
7 7 order Judgment - Clerk Fri 02/14 3:54 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT: that Plaintiff's complaint is dismissed; that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith; and that IFP status is denied for the purpose of any appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 44445 (1962). Signed by Deputy Clerk, Jalitza Poveda, on behalf of Clerk of Court, Brenna B. Mahoney, on 2/14/2025. (copy of order, appeals packet and judgment mailed to pro se). (JP)
Related: [-]
6 6 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Fri 02/14 2:23 PM
ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the attached Order, Plaintiff's Complaint is dismissed. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to enter judgment dismissing this action, to close this case, and to mail a copy of this Order to the pro se Plaintiff and note the mailing on the docket. The Court certifies pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith and, therefore, IFP status is denied for the purpose of any appeal. See Coppedge v. United States , 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Ordered by Judge Hector Gonzalez on 2/14/2025. (ICP)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
5 5 misc Mail Returned Thu 02/13 3:18 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Copy of Documents Mailed: Order 4 dated January 17, 2025 sent to pro se Plaintiff, Kerry Rita Constantino 185 St Marks Pl. Staten Island, NY 10301, via regular mail January 21, 2025, Did Not Delivered. (DLMP)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
4 4 6 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Order Dismissing Case Fri 01/17 11:10 AM
ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the Attached Order, Plaintiff's motion seeking leave to proceed in forma pauperis is granted, see ECF No.2 , but Plaintiff's Complaint is dismissed for failure to state a claim, see 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii), and failure to comply with Rule 8 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The Court grants Plaintiff leave to file an amended complaint on or before February 7, 2025. Any amended complaint she elects to file must be captioned "Amended Complaint" and bear the same docket number as this Order. If Plaintiff does not file an amended complaint on or before February 7, 2025, the Court will direct the Clerk of Court to issue judgment and close this case. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to mail a copy of this Order to the pro se Plaintiff and to note the mailing on the docket. The Court certifies pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith and, therefore, in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of any appeal. See Coppedge v. United States , 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Ordered by Judge Hector Gonzalez on 1/17/2025. (ICP)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
3 3 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Tue 11/19 10:26 AM
Clerk's Notice Re: Consent. A United States Magistrate Judge has been assigned to this case and is available to conduct all proceedings. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent.The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/MJConsentForm.pdf] (SDM)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
2 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kerry Rita Constantino. (SDM)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against New York City Officer, Rodriguez #928, filed by Kerry Rita Constantino. (SDM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Letter