Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Robert J White
Referred: Anthony P Patti
Case #: 2:24-cv-13050
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
CauseNo cause code entered
Case Filed:Nov 15, 2024
Terminated:Jan 16, 2025
Last checked: Thursday May 15, 2025 8:25 AM EDT
Defendant
Muhammad Yunus
Plaintiff
Rabbi Alam
Dr. MD 29390 Sharon Lane
Southfield, MI 48212
Plaintiff
Rizvi Alam
Plaintiff
Shere Rasu Alam
8853 Eastern Ave.
Kansas City, MO 64138


Docket last updated: 80 minutes ago
Thursday, January 16, 2025
5 5 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Thu 01/16 9:54 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by District Judge Robert J. White. (TVil)
Related: [-]
service Certificate of Service Thu 01/16 9:57 AM
TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re5 Order of Dismissal on Rabbi Alam at 29390 Sharon Lane, Southfield, MI. 48212, Rizvi Alam at Calle Hermandad Donantes De Sangre - 29 Piso-5A Madrid 28041 Spain and Shere Rasu Alam at 8853 Eastern Ave., Kansas City, MO 64138. (TVil)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
4 4 notice Regarding Parties Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes* Wed 11/20 12:58 PM
Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (THum)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
2 2 notice Filing Fee Not Paid* Tue 11/19 9:57 AM
Notice of Filing Fee Not Paid. Correction due by 12/3/2024 (JPar)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2024
1 1 35 pgs cmp Civil Case - Complaint Tue 11/19 9:57 AM
COMPLAINT filed by Rabbi Alam, Shere Rasu Alam, Rizvi Alam against Muhammad Yunus [Pro Se Document Upload] (JPar)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet