Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Steven D Grimberg
Case #: 1:24-cv-05290
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1446 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Case Filed:Nov 18, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Jan 02, 2025 4:21 AM EST
Defendant
John Doe
Defendant
Mikayla Jordan
Represented By
Sean L. Hynes
Downey & Cleveland, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Quiktrip Corporation
Represented By
Sean L. Hynes
Downey & Cleveland, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
William Ayala
Represented By
Anthony Reginald Jones, II
Durham Law Group
contact info
Bryce Durham
Durham Law Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 57 minutes ago
Thursday, March 20, 2025
19 19 discov Certificate of Service Thu 03/20 3:26 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by Mikayla Jordan, Quiktrip Corporation.(Hynes, Sean)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 03/12 1:57 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Valorri C. Jones on behalf of William Ayala (Jones, Valorri)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
17 17 discov Certificate of Service Fri 02/28 3:53 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF DISCOVERY by Quiktrip Corporation.(Hynes, Sean)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
16 16 discov Certificate of Service Tue 02/25 3:41 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF DISCOVERY by Mikayla Jordan, Quiktrip Corporation.(Hynes, Sean)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
15 15 misc Leave of Absence Wed 02/19 10:28 AM
Application for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): April 7, 8, 9, 10, 11, June 25, 26, 27, 30, July 2, 7, 8, 9, 10, 14, August 18, 19, 20, December 4, 5, by Sean L. Hynes. (Hynes, Sean)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
14 14 notice Notice to Take Deposition Mon 02/10 12:03 PM
NOTICE to Take Deposition of William Ayala filed by Mikayla Jordan, Quiktrip Corporation (Hynes, Sean)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
13 13 order Scheduling Order Tue 01/28 3:28 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER (by docket entry only): On review of the Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan [ECF12 ], the Court orders that the time limits for adding parties, amending the pleadings, filing motions, completing discovery, and discussing settlement are as set out in the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of this Court, except as herein modified: Discovery will end on June 18, 2025. Dispositive motions must be filed by July 18, 2025. If a dispositive motion is not filed, the Consolidated Pre-Trial Order must be filed by August 4, 2025, otherwise the Consolidated Pre-Trial Order will be due 30 days after the Court's ruling on all pending dispositive motions. Approved by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 1/28/2025. (dnb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
12 12 misc Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan Wed 01/22 3:09 PM
JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Quiktrip Corporation. (Hynes, Sean)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
11 11 misc Clerk's Notation for LOA/CIP Mon 01/13 9:47 AM
ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER: Clerk's Notation re: ECFs6 and10 ; no conflicts identified. Approved by Judge Grimberg.(dnb)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
10 10 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 01/10 10:37 AM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Quiktrip Corporation. (Hynes, Sean)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Order ~Util - Set Submission Deadline Fri 01/10 10:01 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Defendant removed this case on November 18, 2024, and discovery commenced on December 18, 2024. A review of the docket indicates that the parties have failed to file the Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan required by LR 16.2, NDGa. Within 14 days of this Order, the parties are ORDERED to conduct the Rule 26(f) conference and file the Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Approved by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 1/10/2025. (dnb)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Order ~Util - Set Submission Deadline Fri 01/10 9:58 AM
ORDER: This matter is before the Court on a sua sponte jurisdictional inquiry into diversity of citizenship. Within three days of this Order, Plaintiff is DIRECTED to file a notice indicating his place of citizenshipnot just residencefor purposes of diversity jurisdiction. Citizenship for individuals is equivalent to domicile, not to a persons residence. McCormick v. Aderholt, 293 F.3d 1254, 125758 (11th Cir. 2002) (Domicile is a party's "true, fixed, and permanent home and principal establishment, and to which he has the intention of returning whenever he is absent therefrom."). Approved by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 1/10/2025. (dnb)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Order ~Util - Set Submission Deadline Fri 01/10 9:57 AM
ORDER: The Court's Local Rules require a party to file, at the time of first appearance, a certificate of interested persons and a corporate disclosure statement. LR 3.3, NDGa. Defendants have not complied with this requirement. Defendants are accordingly ORDERED to file their certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement within three days of this Order. Approved by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 1/10/2025. (dnb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
6 6 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 12/19 1:50 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by William Ayala identifying Corporate Parent QuikTrip Corporation for William Ayala. (Durham, Bryce)
Related: [-]
5 5 discov Initial Disclosures Thu 12/19 1:46 PM
Initial Disclosures by William Ayala.(Durham, Bryce)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 12/19 1:45 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Bryce Durham on behalf of William Ayala (Durham, Bryce)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
3 3 30+ pgs order Order Wed 11/20 10:43 AM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 11/20/2024. (tas)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
2 2 answer Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Tue 11/19 9:39 AM
ANSWER to1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Quiktrip Corporation, Mikayla Jordan. Discovery ends on 4/17/2025. (Filed in state court on 11/18/2024 and included with 1 Notice of Removal). (tcc)
Related: [-]
1 1 7 pgs cmp Notice of Removal Tue 11/19 9:37 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Quiktrip Corporation, Mikayla Jordan. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AGANDC-13873508)(tcc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet