Wyoming District Court
Judge:Kelly H Rankin
Referred: Scott P Klosterman
Case #: 2:24-cv-00210
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Oct 21, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Apr 19, 2025 2:55 AM MDT
Defendant
Jessica Araiza
Represented By
Kay Lynn Bestol
Sundahl Powers Kapp & Martin
contact info
Defendant
Pat Cornwell
Represented By
Kay Lynn Bestol
Sundahl Powers Kapp & Martin
contact info
Defendant
Casey Freund
Represented By
Katherine Diane Kleve
Wyoming Ag
contact info
Timothy W Miller
Wyoming Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Ken Smith
Represented By
Katherine Diane Kleve
Wyoming Ag
contact info
Timothy W Miller
Wyoming Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Douglas Edwards
1441 King Drive
Thermopolis, WY 82443
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Hot Springs County Sheriff's Department
Terminated: 12/18/2024
Defendant
Hot Springs County Sheriff's Deputy Freund
Terminated: 12/18/2024
Defendant
Hot Springs County Sheriff's Deputy Smith
Terminated: 12/18/2024
Defendant
Thermopolis Police Department
Terminated: 12/18/2024
Defendant
Thermopolis Police Department Chief of Police
Terminated: 12/18/2024
Defendant
Thermopolis Police Department Police Officer
Terminated: 12/18/2024


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Friday, April 04, 2025
24 24 respm Reply Fri 04/04 2:03 PM
REPLY to23 Reply Joinder in County Defendants Reply on Partial Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendants Jessica Araiza, Pat Cornwell. (Bestol, Kay)
Related: [-]
23 23 respm Reply Fri 04/04 1:22 PM
REPLY to22 Opposition filed by Defendants Casey Freund, Ken Smith. (Miller, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
22 22 respm Opposition Fri 03/28 4:51 PM
OPPOSITION to21 Motion to Dismiss,16 Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Douglas Edwards. (Court Staff, stbd)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
21 21 motion Dismiss Fri 03/21 4:49 PM
MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendants Jessica Araiza, Pat Cornwell. (Bestol, Kay)
Related: [-]
20 20 misc Jury Demand Fri 03/21 4:43 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury filed by Defendants Jessica Araiza, Pat Cornwell. (Bestol, Kay)
Related: [-]
19 19 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Fri 03/21 4:37 PM
ANSWER to4 Amended Complaint by Jessica Araiza, Pat Cornwell. (Bestol, Kay)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
18 18 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Wed 03/19 4:36 PM
ANSWER to4 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, by Ken Smith, Casey Freund. (Kleve, Katherine)
Related: [-]
17 17 7 pgs respm Memorandum in Support Wed 03/19 4:34 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of16 Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendants Ken Smith, Casey Freund. (Kleve, Katherine)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Dismiss Wed 03/19 4:32 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Civil Rights Complaint Pursuant to 42 § 1983 Amended filed by Defendants Ken Smith, Casey Freund. (Kleve, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
15 15 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 03/11 11:45 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Katherine Diane Kleve on behalf of Ken Smith, Casey Freund (Kleve, Katherine)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 03/11 11:26 AM
DISREGARD. Filing Error - Counsel to Refile. NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Timothy W Miller on behalf of Ken Smith, Casey Freund (Miller, Timothy) Modified on 3/11/2025 (Court Staff, stmo)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
13 13 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 02/21 12:50 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Casey Freund. Casey Freund 1/22/2025, answer due 3/24/2025 (Miller, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
12 12 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 02/12 10:35 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Timothy W Miller on behalf of Ken Smith, Casey Freund (Miller, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
11 11 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 02/07 2:26 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jessica Araiza. Jessica Araiza 1/22/2025, answer due 3/24/2025; Pat Cornwell 1/22/2025, answer due 3/24/2025 (Bestol, Kay) (Court Staff, sjlg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (2/7/2025) Cornwell Waiver
10 10 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 02/07 1:58 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kay Lynn Bestol on behalf of Jessica Araiza, Pat Cornwell (Bestol, Kay)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
9 9 service Acceptance of Service Mon 02/03 1:15 PM
ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE filed by Ken Smith. Ken Smith served on 1/29/2025, answer due 2/19/2025. (Court Staff, smxb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
8 8 service Waiver of Service Issued Wed 01/22 2:58 PM
NOTICE of Lawsuit and REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service of Summons Issued for Ken Smith, Casey Freund, Jessica Araiza and Pat Cornwell on 1/22/25. Waiver of Service due by 2/21/2025. Copy sent to Plaintiff via US Mail. Wyoming Attorney General emailed and Notice/Waivers mailed to individual defendants via US Mail. (Court Staff, sjlg)
Related: [-]
7 7 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Service of Process Wed 01/22 2:34 PM
ORDER by the District Judge Kelly H Rankin granting6 MOTION for Service of Process at Government Expense. Please see Order for details. Copy of Order sent to Plaintiff via US Mail. (Court Staff, sjlg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
6 6 motion Service of Process Tue 01/21 3:04 PM
MOTION for Service of Process at Government Expense filed by Plaintiff Douglas Edwards. (Court Staff, semt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
5 5 4 pgs order Order Wed 01/08 11:48 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CLAIM 5 and REQUIRING SERVICE OF AMENDED COMPLAINT by the District Judge Kelly H Rankin. Claim 5 of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint fails to state a claim upon which relief can be granted and is dismissed. Further, pursuant to the Court's Order Partially Dismissing1 , Granting Leave to Amend, and Granting Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis3 , Plaintiff is responsible to serve the summons and a copy of the Amended Complaint upon Defendants. Pro Se Plaintiff sent a copy of this order via U.S. Postal Service sent on 1/8/2025. (Court Staff, sjgc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
4 4 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 12/18 3:17 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Jessica Araiza, Pat Cornwell, Casey Freund, Ken Smith with Jury Demand, filed by Douglas Edwards. (Court Staff, stbd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
3 3 10 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 11/19 4:25 PM
ORDER Partially Dismissing1 Complaint, Granting Leave to Amend and Granting2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by the District Judge Kelly H Rankin. The Court orders Plaintiff's Claims 2, 3, 4, 5, 6 and 7 are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. It is further ordered Plaintiff is GRANTED LEAVE TO AMEND. Plaintiff may file an amended complaint within thirty (30) days of this order. It is further ordered Plaintiff's2 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is GRANTED. It is further ordered that if Plaintiff wants the officers of the court to serve the summons and a copy of the complaint upon Defendants, Plaintiff must file a Motion for Government Service and include the Defendants' addresses where service of process may be accomplished. If Plaintiff does not submit such a motion, it will be Plaintiff's responsibility to properly serve the summons and a copy of the complaint upon Defendants. (Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff via US Mail.) (Court Staff, sjlg)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 10/21 4:17 PM
MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by Plaintiff Douglas Edwards. (Court Staff, semt) Modified text on 10/25/2024 (Court Staff, sjlg)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 10/21 4:15 PM
CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants (IFP motion pending), filed by Douglas Edwards. (Court Staff, semt)
Related: [-]