California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:24-mj-04313
Case Filed:Nov 18, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 19, 2024 11:31 PM PST
Defendant
Yolanda Elizabeth Garcia (1)
Represented By
Federal Defenders
Federal Defenders Of San Diego
contact info
Carmen Rivera
Federal Defenders Of San Diego
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Kristin Mihelic
Doj-Usao
contact info
U S Attorney CR
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info


Docket last updated: 11/20/2024 12:27 AM PST
Friday, November 15, 2024
Arrest of Yolanda Elizabeth Garcia (no document attached) (dls)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Yolanda Elizabeth Garcia.(dls)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Info Sheet
2 2 Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to Yolanda Elizabeth Garcia: Initial Appearance set for 11/18/2024 before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard. (no document attached) (fjp)
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Kristin Mihelic appearing for USA. (Mihelic, Kristin)Attorney Kristin Mihelic added to party USA(pty:pla) (yxc).
Related: [-]
4 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard: Initial Appearance as to Yolanda Elizabeth Garcia held on 11/18/2024. Appointed Federal Defenders for Yolanda Elizabeth Garcia. Bond set as to Yolanda Elizabeth Garcia (1) $10,000 PS secured by 1 FRA. Rule 5 advisement provided. ( Preliminary Hearing set for 11/26/24 at 9:30am before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard. Arraignment set for 12/12/24 at 1:30pm before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg. ) (Interpreter Paula Navarro). (CD# 11/18/2024 AHG 24-1:2:09-2:58). (Plaintiff Attorney Allison Rogge AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Vina Seelam FD-S/A). (aje)
Related: [-]
5 5 ***Spanish Interpreter needed as to Yolanda Elizabeth Garcia (no document attached) (aje)
Related: [-]
7 7 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Yolanda Elizabeth Garcia (ecf)
Related: [-]