Oregon District Court
Case #: 3:24-mj-00253
Case Filed:Nov 18, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 19, 2024 11:21 PM PST
Defendant
James Michael Johnson, III (1)
Represented By
Robert Hamilton
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Meredith Bateman
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 11/20/2024 12:06 AM PST
Monday, November 18, 2024
1 1 Documents Received From Other Court as to James Michael Johnson, III from Western District of Washington Case No: 24-mj-596 (sb) (sb).
Related: [-]
Att: 2 (11/18/2024) Docket Sheet - Western District of Washington (Seattle)
2 2 (DOCUMENT FILED UNDER SEAL) Arrest Warrant as to James Michael Johnson, III from Western District of Washington Case No: 24-mj-596 (sb)
Related: [-]
3 3 Order Setting Conditions of Release as to Defendant James Michael Johnson, III. Signed on 11/18/2024 by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (caan).
Related: [-]
4 4 Minutes of Proceedings: Initial Appearance pursuant to Rule 5(c)(3) for Arrest in Our District Offense in Another. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman as to James Michael Johnson, III on 11/18/2024. ORDER appointing counsel for James Michael Johnson, III: Robert Hamilton for proceedings in the District of Oregon. Defendant advised of rights, waived reading of the Complaint, and proceeds as named. Defendant waived an identity hearing, production of the warrant, and a preliminary hearing. The Court accepts the waiver as knowing and voluntary. (Formal waiver to follow.) The Government and Pretrial Services do not request detention. Defendant is released on conditions. ORDER: Defendant is to appear before Judge S. Kate Vaughan in U.S. District Court (Courtroom 12B) in Seattle on Monday, 12/2/2024, at 11:00 a.m. (Formal order to follow). Other Court Information: Western District of Washington case No. 2:24-mj-00596-SKV, USA v. James Michael Johnson, III. Counsel Present for the Government: Meredith Bateman. Counsel Present for Defendant: Robert Hamilton. (U.S. Pretrial Services Officer Present: Cally Ane) (Court Reporter Lindsey Weresch) (gw)
Related: [-]
5 5 Waiver of Rule 5 & 5.1 Hearings by James Michael Johnson, III (sb)
Related: [-]
6 6 Order Requiring Defendant to Appear in District Where Charges are Pending and Transferring Bail as to James Michael Johnson, III (sb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix