Utah District Court
Case #: 2:24-cr-00375
Case Filed:Nov 18, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 20, 2024 12:40 AM MST
Defendant
Arnulfo Rios-Melchor (1)
Represented By
Carlos A. Garcia
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Bryan N. Reeves
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 11/20/2024 1:43 AM MST
Monday, November 18, 2024
Spanish Interpreter Required in case as to Arnulfo Rios-Melchor. (mh)
Related: [-]
1 1 FELONY INFORMATION as to Arnulfo Rios-Melchor (1) count(s) 1. Assigned to Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. Arraignment set for 11/19/2024 at 10:00 AM in Rm 8.400 before Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead. (mh)
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE OF SENTENCING ENHANCEMENT as to Arnulfo Rios-Melchor. (mh)
Related: [-]
4 4 NOTICE of FILING of Supervising Attorney's Consent to Entry of Appearance by Law Student by USA as to Arnulfo Rios-Melchor Related [+]
Related: [-] eves, Bryan
Att: 1 Supplement Client Consent Form,
Att: 2 Supplement Law School Certification
5 5 MOTION for Detention by USA as to Arnulfo Rios-Melchor. Related [+]
Related: [-] eves, Bryan