California Northern District Court
Judge:Kandis A Westmore
Case #: 4:24-cv-08119
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000 Job Discrimination (Sex)
Case Filed:Nov 18, 2024
Last checked: Saturday May 17, 2025 2:56 AM PDT
Defendant
Adyen NV
Represented By
Nicholas A. Deming
Gordon & Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP
contact info
Nikayla Nikayla Johnson
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Ryane Hecker
Represented By
Emily Anne Nugent
Emily Nugent Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, May 15, 2025
28 28 order Order Thu 05/15 1:58 PM
ORDER DISCHARGING 24 Order to Show Cause in light of the filing of the 25 Response to Order to Show Cause and 26 Declaration in Support of the Proposed Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 5/15/2025. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kawlc1, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
27 27 13 pgs order Order on Stipulation Tue 05/13 9:30 AM
Order Granting 22 Stipulation for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 5/13/2025. (ccf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
26 26 oth_sup Declaration in Support Mon 05/12 3:30 PM
Declaration of NICHOLAS A. DEMING IN SUPPORT OF STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER filed byAdyen NV. (Deming, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
25 25 misc Response to Order to Show Cause Mon 05/12 3:28 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Adyen NV DECLARATION OF NICHOLAS A. DEMING IN RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING FAILURE TO SUBMIT DECLARATION . (Deming, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
24 24 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause ~Util - Set Deadlines Mon 05/05 7:44 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Regarding Proposed Stipulated Protective Order 22 , 23 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 5/5/2025. Show Cause and Declarations due by 5/12/2025. (ccf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
23 23 1 pgs order Order Fri 03/28 2:02 PM
ORDER re 22 STIPULATED Protective Order filed by Ryane Hecker.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 3/28/2025. (klh, COURT STAFF) Modified on 3/28/2025 (klh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
22 22 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Thu 03/27 5:00 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Protective Order filed by Ryane Hecker. (Nugent, Emily)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
21 21 3 pgs order Order Thu 03/13 10:51 AM
Notice of Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge Sallie Kim on March 13, 2025. (sklc1, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
20 20 minutes Scheduling Conference ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Thu 03/13 9:13 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held by Zoom before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim: Scheduling Conference held on 3/13/2025. Settlement Conference set for 7/29/2025 at 9:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. The Court will issue a Settlement Conference Order. Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who will be attending the settlement conference. A joint list of names including client representatives and titles must be sent to the CRD at SKCRD@cand.uscourts.gov no later than 7/25/2025 at 12:00PM. Total Time in Court: 5 minutes. Court Reporter: Not Reported. Plaintiff Attorney: Emily Nugent. Defendant Attorney: Nicholas Deming. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bxl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/13/2025)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
19 19 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 03/07 9:10 AM
NOTICE OF VIDEO SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Scheduling Conference set for 3/13/2025 at 9:00 AM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 3/7/2025. (bxl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
18 18 order Case Management Scheduling Order Thu 03/06 2:35 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER FOR JURY TRIAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 3/6/2025. (klh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
utility Case Referred to Magistrate Judge for Settlement Wed 03/05 5:53 PM
CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim for Settlement. (shy, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
17 17 minutes Case Management Conference - Initial ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Teleconference Zoom Tue 03/04 2:36 PM
Minute Entry for ZOOM proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore: Initial Case Management Conference held on 3/4/2025. Case randomly referred to a Magistrate Judge for Settlement Conference to be completed by 9/30/2025 or as is convenient to that Magistrate Judge. Court set the following schedule: Amended Pleadings due by 5/5/2025. Close of Fact Discovery due by 3/20/2026. Designation of Experts due by 5/15/2026. Rebuttal Reports due by 5/29/2026. Close of Expert Discovery due by 6/19/2026. Case Management Statement due by 10/7/2025. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/14/2025 01:30 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Dispositive Motion Hearing set for 5/7/2026 01:30 PM in Oakland, - To be determined before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Meet and Confer: 7/28/2026. Joint Pretrial Statements; Motions in Limine: 8/4/2026. Oppositions to Motions in Limine: 8/14/2026. Joint Evidentiary Objections & Responses: 8/21/2026. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/2/2026 02:00 PM in Oakland, - To be determined. Jury Selection set for 9/14/2026 09:00 AM in Oakland, - To be determined before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Jury Trial set for 9/14/2026 to 9/18/2026 09:00 AM in Oakland, - To be determined before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/kaw General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Digital Recording Time: Zoom Webinar Time: 1:32-1:52 - 10 M. Plaintiff Attorney: Emily Nugent. Defendant Attorney: Nicholas Deming. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/4/2025)
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred to Magistrate Judge for Settlement Tue 03/04 2:41 PM
CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge for Settlement. See Minute Order17 (klh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
16 16 5 pgs order Order on Stipulation Tue 02/18 1:57 PM
Order. Signed 2/18/2025 by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 15 Stipulation to Continue Initial Case Mgmt Conference. Case Management Statement due by 2/25/2025. Initial Case Management Conference re-set for 3/4/2025 01:30 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held by Zoom videoconference. (klh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Tue 02/18 9:36 AM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Adyen NV. (Deming, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
14 14 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom Hearing Wed 02/12 12:59 PM
CLERKS NOTICE CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/18/2025 IS CONTINUED TO 2/25/2025 at 1:30 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. Parties do not need to refile their joint case management statement. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/kaw] Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. One list of names of all counsel appearing for all parties must be sent to the CRD at KAWCRD@cand.uscourts.gov no later than February 18, 2025 at 2:00 p.m. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jlg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
13 13 misc Case Management Statement Tue 02/11 2:38 PM
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT & [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by Adyen NV. (Johnson, Nikayla) Modified on 2/11/2025 (jlg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice (Other) Tue 02/11 11:31 AM
NOTICE by Ryane Hecker (Nugent, Emily)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
11 11 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Thu 02/06 2:27 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Adyen NV.. (Deming, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
10 10 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Tue 01/28 4:36 PM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Deming, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
9 9 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Tue 01/28 2:01 PM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Nugent, Emily)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
8 8 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Fri 01/24 5:25 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE TO DEFENDANT Re: Consent or Declination. Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 2/7/2025. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: [LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shy, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Fri 01/24 10:50 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Adyen NV (Deming, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 01/24 10:46 AM
ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by Adyen NV. (Deming, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 12/23 12:46 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Adyen NV. Service waived by Adyen NV waiver sent on 11/25/2024, answer due 1/24/2025. (Deming, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
4 4 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Mon 11/25 2:43 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ryane Hecker.. (Nugent, Emily)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
3 3 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Tue 11/19 1:23 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See [LINK:General Order 71] . Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 2/11/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/18/2025 01:30 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Tue 11/19 9:54 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/3/2024. (as, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
1 1 16 pgs COMPLAINT for Damages against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-20061442.). Filed by Ryane Hecker.(Nugent, Emily)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet