New Jersey District Court
Judge:William J Martini
Referred: Jose R Almonte
Case #: 2:24-cv-10599
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:451 Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Nov 20, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jan 05, 2025 5:18 AM EST
Defendant
STEVEN FULOP
Defendant
JOHN METRO
Defendant
THE CITY OF JERSEY CITY
Defendant
KIMBERLY WALLACE-SCALCIONE
Defendant
MOBIN YOUSAF
Defendant
JOHN DOE (1-10)
Defendant
JOHN MINELLA
Plaintiff
JONATHAN GOMEZ NORIEGA
Represented By
GIANCARLO GHIONE
Sekas Law Group
contact info
NICHOLAS GEORGE SEKAS
contact info

GPO Apr 14 2025
OPINION re 14 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge William J. Martini on 4/14/2025. (wh)

Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
26 26 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Wed 05/14 4:15 PM
LETTER ORDER Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 16.1. On 6/6/2025 at 10:30 AM there shall be an Initial Scheduling Conference before Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte. The conference will be held telephonically. For the conference, please dial 973-437-5535 and enter Phone conference ID: 591 374 488#. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 5/14/2025. (akw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
25 25 order Stipulation and Order Tue 05/13 3:45 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER setting schedule for plaintiff's motion for leave to amend. Signed by Judge William J. Martini on 5/13/2025. (lag, )
Related: [-]
Friday, May 09, 2025
24 24 misc Stipulation Fri 05/09 5:47 PM
STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER by STEVEN FULOP, THE CITY OF JERSEY CITY. (KINGSBERY, PAUL)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
utility Update Answer Due Deadline Fri 04/25 10:35 AM
Clerk`s Text Order - The document23 submitted by STEVEN FULOP, THE CITY OF JERSEY CITY has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 5/12/2025. (sm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
23 23 misc Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order Thu 04/24 3:23 PM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer. (KINGSBERY, PAUL)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
22 22 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Mon 04/14 4:33 PM
ORDER re14 Motion to Dismiss, that Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Count One of Plaintiff's Complaint is GRANTED as to Defendant MOBIN YOUSAF only, and is otherwise DENIED. Plaintiff's claim against Defendant YOUSAF is DISMISSED. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Count Two is DENIED. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Counts Three, Four, Five, and Six are GRANTED. Counts Three, Four, Five, and Six are DISMISSED. Parties KIMBERLY WALLACE-SCALCIONE, MOBIN YOUSAF, JOHN METRO, and JOHN MINELLA terminated. Signed by Judge William J. Martini on 4/14/2025. (wh)
Related: [-]
21 21 14 pgs order Opinion Mon 04/14 4:23 PM
OPINION re14 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge William J. Martini on 4/14/2025. (wh)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
20 20 respm Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion Mon 03/10 10:28 PM
REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by STEVEN FULOP, JOHN METRO, JOHN MINELLA, THE CITY OF JERSEY CITY, KIMBERLY WALLACE-SCALCIONE, MOBIN YOUSAF re14 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint (MARRA, RALPH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
19 19 misc Letter Wed 03/05 10:14 AM
Letter Re: Request for Emergency Hearing and Expedited Trial, from Maicoll Gomez. Related [+] (wh)
Related: [-] ceived via ADS
Monday, March 03, 2025
18 18 respm Brief in Opposition to Motion Mon 03/03 5:59 PM
BRIEF in Opposition filed by JONATHAN GOMEZ NORIEGA re14 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint (GHIONE, GIANCARLO)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Ghione Decl,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Certificate of Service Cert of Service
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
17 17 order Text Order Wed 02/19 10:53 AM
TEXT ORDER: The Court is in receipt of the parties'16 Stipulation seeking adjournment of the Motion Day for Defendants'14 Motion to Dismiss until April 7, 2025. Plaintiff is entitled to an automatic adjournment to March 17, 2025 pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(d)(5). "No other extension of the time limits... shall be permitted without an Order of the Court[.]" Id. The Court declines to adjourn this matter beyond the March 17, 2025 Motion Day at this time . Plaintiff shall file its Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss on or before March 3, 2025 . Defendants shall file any reply on or before March 10, 2025 . No further extension of these time limits shall be granted unless for good cause shown. So Ordered by Judge William J. Martini on 2/19/2025. (krg, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
16 16 misc Stipulation Tue 02/18 1:51 PM
STIPULATION by All Plaintiffs. (GHIONE, GIANCARLO)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 02/04 10:30 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by EMILY AREZZI on behalf of THE CITY OF JERSEY CITY, STEVEN FULOP, KIMBERLY WALLACE-SCALCIONE, JOHN MINELLA, JOHN METRO, MOBIN YOUSAF (AREZZI, EMILY)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Tue 02/04 9:45 AM
Set Deadlines as to14 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint . Motion set for 3/3/2025 before Judge William J. Martini. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sm)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
14 14 motion Dismiss Fri 01/31 7:02 PM
MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint by THE CITY OF JERSEY CITY, STEVEN FULOP, KIMBERLY WALLACE-SCALCIONE, JOHN MINELLA, JOHN METRO, MOBIN YOUSAF. Responses due by 2/18/2025.(MARRA, RALPH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss,
Att: 2 Declaration of Ralph J. Marra, Jr. in Support of Motion to Dismiss,
Att: 3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Ralph J. Marra, Jr.,
Att: 4 Exhibit B to Declaration of Ralph J. Marra, Jr.,
Att: 5 Exhibit C to Declaration of Ralph J. Marra, Jr.,
Att: 6 Exhibit D to Declaration of Ralph J. Marra, Jr.,
Att: 7 Exhibit E to Declaration of Ralph J. Marra, Jr.,
Att: 8 Exhibit F to Declaration of Ralph J. Marra, Jr.,
Att: 9 Exhibit G to Declaration of Ralph J. Marra, Jr.,
Att: 10 Exhibit H to Declaration of Ralph J. Marra, Jr.,
Att: 11 Exhibit I to Declaration of Ralph J. Marra, Jr.,
Att: 12 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 13 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
13 13 order Stipulation and Order Wed 01/08 10:35 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint, that Defendants' time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended up to and including 1/31/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 1/8/2025. (wh)
Related: [-]
utility Update Answer Due Deadline Wed 01/08 10:39 AM
Answer Due Deadline Update - The answer due date has been set for 1/31/2025 as to Defendants JOHN METRO, STEVEN FULOP, MOBIN YOUSAF, THE CITY OF JERSEY CITY, KIMBERLY WALLACE-SCALCIONE, and JOHN MINELLA pursuant to the13 STIPULATION AND ORDER. (wh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
12 12 misc Stipulation Tue 01/07 9:36 PM
STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by THE CITY OF JERSEY CITY, STEVEN FULOP, KIMBERLY WALLACE-SCALCIONE, JOHN MINELLA, JOHN METRO, MOBIN YOUSAF. (MARRA, RALPH)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 01/07 9:32 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by PAUL C KINGSBERY on behalf of THE CITY OF JERSEY CITY, STEVEN FULOP, KIMBERLY WALLACE-SCALCIONE, JOHN MINELLA, JOHN METRO, MOBIN YOUSAF (KINGSBERY, PAUL)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 01/07 9:31 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by RALPH JOSEPH MARRA, JR on behalf of THE CITY OF JERSEY CITY, STEVEN FULOP, KIMBERLY WALLACE-SCALCIONE, JOHN MINELLA, JOHN METRO, MOBIN YOUSAF (MARRA, RALPH)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
9 9 service Affidavit of Service Fri 12/20 1:18 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint & Summons served on Mayor Steven Fulop on December 18, 2024, filed by JONATHAN GOMEZ NORIEGA. (GHIONE, GIANCARLO)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Affidavit of Service Fri 12/20 1:17 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint & Summons served on Kimberly Wallace-Scalcione on December 18, 2024, filed by JONATHAN GOMEZ NORIEGA. (GHIONE, GIANCARLO)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Affidavit of Service Fri 12/20 1:16 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint & Summons served on Mobin Yousaf on December 18, 2024, filed by JONATHAN GOMEZ NORIEGA. (GHIONE, GIANCARLO)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Affidavit of Service Fri 12/20 1:15 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint & Summons served on John Minella on December 18, 2024, filed by JONATHAN GOMEZ NORIEGA. (GHIONE, GIANCARLO)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Affidavit of Service Fri 12/20 1:15 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint & Summons served on John Metro on December 18, 2024, filed by JONATHAN GOMEZ NORIEGA. (GHIONE, GIANCARLO)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Affidavit of Service Fri 12/20 1:14 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint & Summons served on City of Jersey City on December 18, 2024, filed by JONATHAN GOMEZ NORIEGA. (GHIONE, GIANCARLO)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 12/02 10:12 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by GIANCARLO GHIONE on behalf of All Plaintiffs (GHIONE, GIANCARLO)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
qc QC - Fillable PDF Fri 11/22 4:49 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The1 -1 Civil Cover Sheet filed by NICHOLAS SEKAS on 11/20/2024 was uploaded prior to being flattened. Before uploading fillable forms to ECF you must flatten the file to prevent other users from manipulating or editing the information. The easiest way to flatten a PDF form is by selecting Print to PDF and saving the flattened form, other PDF software may differ. Please visit our[LINK:website] under Flattening PDF Forms for guidance. Your document has been corrected. This message is for informational purposes only. (wh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 11/21 10:28 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to STEVEN FULOP, JOHN METRO, JOHN MINELLA, THE CITY OF JERSEY CITY, KIMBERLY WALLACE-SCALCIONE, MOBIN YOUSAF. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (wh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
1 1 30+ pgs cmp Complaint Wed 11/20 10:41 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15820009) with JURY DEMAND, filed by JONATHAN GOMEZ NORIEGA.(SEKAS, NICHOLAS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Add and Terminate Judges Wed 11/20 1:58 PM
Judge William J. Martini and Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte added. (ps)
Related: [-]