Delaware District Court
Judge:Colm F Connolly
Case #: 1:24-cv-01273
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Case Filed:Nov 20, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 19, 2025 7:01 AM EDT
Defendant
Christopher Grilli
Represented By
Todd C Schiltz
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
Alan D. Albert
O'Hagan Meyer PLLC
contact info
Defendant
James Miller
Represented By
Todd C Schiltz
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
Alan D. Albert
O'Hagan Meyer PLLC
contact info
Defendant
RxMapper, LLC
Represented By
Todd C Schiltz
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
Alan D. Albert
O'Hagan Meyer PLLC
contact info
Defendant
David Upjohn
Represented By
Todd C Schiltz
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
Alan D. Albert
O'Hagan Meyer PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Paul C. Miller
Represented By
Steven M. Hecht
contact info
Samuel Taylor Hirzel, II
Heyman Enerio Gattuso & Hirzel LLP
contact info
Brendan McDonnell
Heyman Enerio Gattuso & Hirzel
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, April 03, 2025
29 29 respm Brief - Reply Thu 04/03 4:31 PM
REPLY BRIEF re17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Counts I-VI) filed by Christopher Grilli, James Miller, RxMapper, LLC, David Upjohn. (Albert, Alan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
28 28 notice Notice - Other Wed 03/19 10:32 AM
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel by Christopher Grilli, James Miller, RxMapper, LLC, David Upjohn (Schiltz, Todd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
27 27 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 03/18 4:20 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Alan D. Albert on behalf of All Defendants (Albert, Alan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
26 26 order SO ORDERED ~Util - Set Briefing Schedule - open,ans,reply,surreply Wed 03/12 5:05 PM
SO ORDERED, re25 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to File Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss to April 3, 2025 filed by Christopher Grilli, RxMapper, LLC, James Miller, David Upjohn,17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Christopher Grilli, RxMapper, LLC, James Miller, David Upjohn, Set Briefing Schedule: Related [+]. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 3/12/2025. (mws)
Related: [-] ply Brief due 4/3/2025
Monday, March 10, 2025
25 25 motion Stipulation to EXTEND Time Mon 03/10 9:23 AM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to File Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss to April 3, 2025 - filed by Christopher Grilli, James Miller, RxMapper, LLC, David Upjohn. (Schiltz, Todd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
24 24 misc Declaration Thu 02/27 3:50 PM
DECLARATION of Steven M. Hecht in Opposition to Motion for Partial Dismissal re23 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Paul C. Miller.(Hirzel, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-B
23 23 respm Brief - Answering Brief in Opposition Thu 02/27 3:46 PM
ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion for Partial Dismissal filed by Paul C. Miller.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 3/6/2025. (Hirzel, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
utility Add Attorneys - PHV only Fri 02/21 8:29 AM
Pro Hac Vice Attorney Steven M. Hecht for Paul C. Miller added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (oam)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
22 22 misc -District Court Pro Hac Vice Fee - 01 Attorney Credit Card Payment Wed 02/19 2:48 PM
Pro Hac Vice Fee - Credit Card Payment received for Steven M. Hecht of Rolnick Kramer Sadighi LLP. ( re21 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Steven M. Hecht of Rolnick Kramer Sadighi LLP )( Payment of $ 50, receipt number ADEDC-4618188).(McDonnell, Brendan)
Related: [-]
21 21 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 02/19 2:44 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Steven M. Hecht of Rolnick Kramer Sadighi LLP - filed by Paul C. Miller. (McDonnell, Brendan)
Related: [-]
order SO ORDERED Wed 02/19 3:35 PM
SO ORDERED, re21 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Steven M. Hecht of Rolnick Kramer Sadighi LLP, filed by Paul C. Miller. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 2/19/2025. (kmd)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
20 20 order SO ORDERED ~Util - Set Briefing Schedule - open,ans,reply,surreply Mon 02/03 4:21 PM
SO ORDERED, re19 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Regarding Briefing Schedule, filed by Paul C. Miller. Reset Briefing Schedule: Answering Brief due 2/27/2025. Reply Brief due 3/20/2025. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 2/3/2025. (kmd)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Stipulation to EXTEND Time Mon 02/03 10:14 AM
Stipulation and Order Governing Motion to Dismiss Briefing - filed by Paul C. Miller. (Hirzel, Samuel) Modified on 2/3/2025 (kmd)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
18 18 respm Brief - Opening Brief in Support Wed 01/29 4:40 PM
OPENING BRIEF in Support re17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by RxMapper, LLC, James Miller, Christopher Grilli, David Upjohn.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 2/12/2025.(Schiltz, Todd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Compliance,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C
17 17 motion Dismiss/Fail to State Claim Wed 01/29 4:36 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by RxMapper, LLC, James Miller, Christopher Grilli, David Upjohn.(Schiltz, Todd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, January 16, 2025
16 16 misc Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1 Thu 01/16 10:32 AM
Supplemental Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by RxMapper, LLC. (Schiltz, Todd)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
order Oral Order Mon 01/13 4:53 PM
ORAL ORDER: WHEREAS Defendant RxMapper, LLC's 7.1 Disclosure Statement (D.I.13 ) does not comply with Chief Judge Connolly's Standing Order Regarding Disclosure Statements, Defendant shall within 7 days of the date of this order submit a revised disclosure statement. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 1/13/2025. (mws)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
15 15 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 12/30 1:10 PM
ORDER granting14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants must move, answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before January 29, 2025. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 12/30/2024. (mws)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2024
14 14 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 12/27 2:08 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re2 Complaint, - filed by RxMapper, LLC, James Miller, Christopher Grilli, David Upjohn.(Schiltz, Todd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
13 13 misc Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1 Fri 12/27 2:07 PM
Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by RxMapper, LLC. (Schiltz, Todd)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 12/27 2:05 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Todd C Schiltz on behalf of RxMapper, LLC, James Miller, Christopher Grilli, David Upjohn (Schiltz, Todd)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
11 11 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 12/16 2:37 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Paul C. Miller.David Upjohn served on 12/9/2024, answer due 12/30/2024. (Hirzel, Samuel)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 12/16 2:36 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Paul C. Miller.Christopher Grilli served on 12/9/2024, answer due 12/30/2024. (Hirzel, Samuel)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 12/16 2:33 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Paul C. Miller.James Miller served on 12/9/2024, answer due 12/30/2024. (Hirzel, Samuel)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 12/16 2:31 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Paul C. Miller.RxMapper, LLC served on 12/6/2024, answer due 12/27/2024. (Hirzel, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
7 7 2 pgs order Order Mon 12/02 8:40 AM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING IN ALL CASES. (mws)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
6 6 misc Letter Wed 11/27 4:02 PM
Letter to The Honorable Colm Connolly from Samuel T. Hirzel, II regarding Redactions of Complaint and Exhibits - re5 Redacted Document. (Hirzel, Samuel)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Redacted Document Wed 11/27 3:56 PM
REDACTED VERSION of2 Complaint, by Paul C. Miller.(Hirzel, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-B Redacted its in Entirety
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 11/27 12:39 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
4 4 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Seal Thu 11/21 3:20 PM
ORDER: GRANTING D.I.1 MOTION to Leave to File Under Seal.Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Hall (m) on 11/21/2024. (oam)
Related: [-]
utility Remark Thu 11/21 3:26 PM
Remark: Case Submitted for Routine Judicial Assignment. (oam)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
3 3 misc Magistrate Consent Forms Wed 11/20 12:19 PM
Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (oam)
Related: [-]
2 2 cmp Complaint Wed 11/20 12:18 PM
[SEALED] COMPLAINT for Violations of the Federal Securities Law and Common Law with Jury Demand against Christopher Grilli, James Miller, RxMapper, LLC, David Upjohn (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ADEDC-4552943) - filed by Paul C. Miller.(oam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet
1 1 3 pgs motion Seal Wed 11/20 12:15 PM
MOTION to Leave to File Under Seal - filed by Paul C. Miller.(oam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
service No Summons Issued Wed 11/20 12:20 PM
No Summons Issued. (oam)
Related: [-]
utility Remark Wed 11/20 12:23 PM
Remark: Exit Electronic Copies to Duty Judge JLH. (oam)
Related: [-]