District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Rudolph Contreras
Case #: 1:24-cv-03281
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Cause29:1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Case Filed:Nov 20, 2024
Case in other court:Utah, 2:24-cv-00596
Last checked: Monday May 19, 2025 4:30 AM EDT
Defendant
EDISON ELECTRIC INSTITUTE
Represented By
Derek P. Roussillon
Mcnees Wallace & Nurick LLC
contact info
Defendant
UNITED BEHAVIORAL HEALTH
Represented By
Creighton R. Magid
Dorsey & Whitney LLP
contact info
Michelle S. Grant
Dorsey & Whitney LLP
contact info
Defendant
UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By
Creighton R. Magid
Dorsey & Whitney LLP
contact info
Michelle S. Grant
Dorsey & Whitney LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
PHILLIP M.
Represented By
Brian Smith King
Brian S. King, Attorney At Law
contact info
Damon Robert Miller
Benglasslaw
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
35 35 motion Scheduling Order Wed 04/30 4:13 PM
Joint MOTION for Scheduling Order Amendment by UNITED BEHAVIORAL HEALTH, UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY.(Grant, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
order Order on Motion for Scheduling Order Wed 04/30 4:24 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting35 Stipulated Motion to Amend Scheduling Order: It is HEREBY ORDERED that the Court removes the following provision from28 the scheduling order: If there is a dispute about the amount at issue in the case, and/or the Plaintiff's desire to conduct discovery relating to a conflict of interest, a party may bring a motion to have such issues determined by the Court by April 30, 2025. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT the Court and the parties shall address any dispute as to the amount at issue in dispositive motions to be further discussed during the status conference scheduled with the Court on September 12, 2025. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT to the extent Plaintiff's desire to conduct discoveryrelating to a conflict of interest, and there is a dispute regarding the proposed discovery, the parties will follow the provision already provided for in the Scheduling Order regarding discovery motions. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 4/30/2025. (lcrc1)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
34 34 notice Notice (Other) Tue 04/22 5:11 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery by EDISON ELECTRIC INSTITUTE (Roussillon, Derek)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
33 33 motion Extension of Time to Mon 04/21 2:53 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to as to the Completeness of the Record by PHILLIP M..(King, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Mon 04/21 4:01 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting33 Consent Motion for Extension of Time: It is HEREBY ORDERED that the deadline by which the parties must supplement the prelitigation appeal record shall be May 26, 2025. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 4/21/2025. (lcrc1)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
32 32 motion Scheduling Order Mon 03/24 5:32 PM
Joint MOTION for Scheduling Order Amendment by UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY, UNITED BEHAVIORAL HEALTH.(Magid, Creighton)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
order Order on Motion for Scheduling Order Mon 03/24 6:25 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting32 Motion for Scheduling Order Amendment: It is HEREBY ORDERED that28 the Scheduling Order is amended to remove the deadline for Defendants to file a motion regarding the need for or permissibility of discovery as to the second and third causes of action. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3/24/2025. (lcrc1)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
31 31 16 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Tue 03/11 10:15 AM
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER AND CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3/11/2025. (lcrc3)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
30 30 motion Protective Order Thu 03/06 12:28 PM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order AND CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT by UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY, UNITED BEHAVIORAL HEALTH.(Magid, Creighton)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Set/Reset Hearings Tue 03/04 5:00 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines:( Amended Pleadings due by 6/2/2025., Discovery due by 5/28/2025., Joinder of Parties due by 6/2/2025., Plaintiff Rule 26(a)(1) due by 6/25/2025., Defendant Rule 26(a)(1) due by 7/25/2025.), Set/Reset Hearings:(Status Conference set for 9/12/2025 at 10:30 AM in Telephonic/VTC before Judge Rudolph Contreras.) (tj)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Fri 02/21 9:29 AM
MINUTE ORDER granting29 Consent Motion for Extension of Time: It is HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants shall file a motion regarding the need for or permissibility of discovery as to the second and third causes of action on or before March 24, 2025. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 2/21/2025. (lcrc1)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
29 29 motion Extension of Time to Thu 02/20 5:59 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to file a motion regarding the need for or permissibility of discovery as to the second and third causes of action by UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY, UNITED BEHAVIORAL HEALTH, EDISON ELECTRIC INSTITUTE.(Magid, Creighton)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, January 27, 2025
28 28 order .Order Mon 01/27 1:03 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 1/27/2025. (lcrc1)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
27 27 misc Meet and Confer Statement Fri 01/24 11:24 AM
MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (King, Brian)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
order .Order Fri 01/10 9:50 AM
MINUTE ORDER: It is HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and submit a joint report in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) and Local Civil Rule 16.3 on or before January 24, 2025. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 1/10/2025. (lcrc1)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
26 26 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 01/08 5:38 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle S. Grant on behalf of UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY, UNITED BEHAVIORAL HEALTH (Grant, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
25 25 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 12/20 3:15 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY, UNITED BEHAVIORAL HEALTH.(Magid, Creighton)
Related: [-]
24 24 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 12/20 1:58 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Michelle S. Grant, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-11372283. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY, UNITED BEHAVIORAL HEALTH.(Magid, Creighton)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Michelle Grant,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 12/20 3:00 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting24 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice : Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.2, it is HEREBY ORDERED that Michelle S. Grant is admitted to represent Defendants pro hac vice in this case. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). [LINK:Click for instructions.] SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 12/20/2024. (lcrc1)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
23 23 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 12/11 3:31 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by EDISON ELECTRIC INSTITUTE.(Roussillon, Derek)
Related: [-]
22 22 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 12/11 3:21 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Derek P. Roussillon on behalf of EDISON ELECTRIC INSTITUTE (Roussillon, Derek)
Related: [-]
21 21 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 12/11 12:47 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Smith King on behalf of PHILLIP M. (King, Brian)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
20 20 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 12/09 9:31 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY, UNITED BEHAVIORAL HEALTH.(Magid, Creighton)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 12/09 11:15 AM
MINUTE ORDER granting20 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time: It is HEREBY ORDERED that United Defendants shall file an answer or otherwise respond to1 Plaintiff's Complaint on or before December 20, 2024. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 12/9/2024. (lcrc1)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Dismiss Mon 12/09 12:18 PM
MINUTE ORDER denying11 Motion to Dismiss: It is HEREBY ORDERED that11 Defendant Edison Electric Institute's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or, In the Alternative, Motion to Transfer Venue is DENIED as MOOT. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 12/9/2024. (lcrc1)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
19 19 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 12/02 10:36 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Creighton R. Magid on behalf of UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY, UNITED BEHAVIORAL HEALTH (Magid, Creighton)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
18 18 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 11/25 7:51 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Brian S. King, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-11319503. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by PHILLIP M..(Miller, Damon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Certificate of Good Standing
17 17 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 11/25 7:44 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Damon Robert Miller on behalf of PHILLIP M. (Miller, Damon)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 11/25 2:41 PM
ORDER granting18 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice : Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.2, it is HEREBY ORDERED that Brian S. King is admitted to represent Defendants pro hac vice in this case. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 11/25/2024. (lcrc1)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
16 16 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Wed 11/20 12:39 PM
Case transferred in from District of Utah; Case Number 2:24-cv-00596. Original file ,transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
15 15 ORDER granting 14 Motion to Change Venue. This case be transferred to the United States District Court for the District of Columbia. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 11/19/2024. (mh) [Transferred from Utah on 11/20/2024.]
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
14 14 Stipulated MOTION to Change Venue filed by Defendants United Behavioral Health, United Healthcare Insurance Company. Motions referred to Cecilia M. Romero.(Bauhs, Maryann) [Transferred from Utah on 11/20/2024.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, October 31, 2024
13 13 ORDER granting 12 Motion for Extension of Time: The deadline for Defendants' Answer to the Complaint is extended to twenty-one (21) days after entry of a written order denying the Motion to Transfer Venue (ECF 11 ), or, if the Motion to Transfer Venue is granted, twenty-one (21) days after the transfer is reflected on the docket of the United States District Court for the District of Columbia. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 10/31/24. (dle) [Transferred from Utah on 11/20/2024.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
12 12 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint Pending Motion to Dismiss or Transfer Venue filed by Defendants United Behavioral Health, United Healthcare Insurance Company. Motions referred to Cecilia M. Romero.(Bauhs, Maryann) [Transferred from Utah on 11/20/2024.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, October 21, 2024
11 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer Venue filed by Defendant Edison Electric Institute.(Lang, Trevor) [Transferred from Utah on 11/20/2024.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Calderon Affidavit
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
10 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Phillip M. (King, Brian) [Transferred from Utah on 11/20/2024.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
9 9 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 9/11/2024. (mh) [Transferred from Utah on 11/20/2024.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
8 8 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate Judge to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 9/10/2024. (mjm) [Transferred from Utah on 11/20/2024.]
Related: [-]
7 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher J. Martinez on behalf of United Behavioral Health, United Healthcare Insurance Company (Martinez, Christopher) [Transferred from Utah on 11/20/2024.]
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
6 6 RECEIVED Magistrate Availability Form from Defendants United Behavioral Health and United Healthcare Insurance Company. (mh) [Transferred from Utah on 11/20/2024.]
Related: [-]
5 5 RECEIVED Magistrate Availability Form from Plaintiff Phillip M.. (mh) [Transferred from Utah on 11/20/2024.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
4 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Phillip M. (King, Brian) [Transferred from Utah on 11/20/2024.]
Related: [-]
3 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Phillip M. (King, Brian) [Transferred from Utah on 11/20/2024.]
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2024
2 2 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY TO PRESIDE OVER CASE- Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, and DUCivR 72-4, you are hereby notified that a magistrate judge for the District of Utah may conduct any or all proceedings in this case, including a jury or bench trial and entry of a final judgment. Exercise of this jurisdiction by the magistrate judge is permitted only if all parties voluntarily sign and return the form. To consent, return the Consent Form to the clerk's office within 21 days via email at consents@utd.uscourts.gov or mail at the address on the form. Please do not efile the Consent Form in the case. Notice emailed or mailed to Plaintiff Phillip M.. (Notice generated by Clerk's office) Form due by 9/9/2024. (kec) [Transferred from Utah on 11/20/2024.]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against Edison Electric Institute, United Behavioral Health, United Healthcare Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AUTDC-5157182) filed by Phillip M.. (King, Brian) [Transferred from Utah on 11/20/2024.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
Judge Robert J. Shelby added. Case number will now read 2:24-cv-00596-RJS. Please make changes to document captions accordingly. (kec) [Transferred from Utah on 11/20/2024.]
Related: [-]