New Jersey District Court
Judge:Michael E Farbiarz
Referred: Cathy L Waldor
Case #: 2:24-cv-10602
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1343 Violation of Civil Rights
Case Filed:Nov 20, 2024
Last checked: Monday May 19, 2025 4:54 AM EDT
Defendant
635 SECURE PARKING, INC.
Represented By
GEORGE KAROUSATOS
Biancamano & Di Stefano, PC
contact info
Defendant
INTERPORT MAINTENANCE CO., INC.
Represented By
GEORGE KAROUSATOS
Biancamano & Di Stefano, PC
contact info
Defendant
INTERPORT SECURE PARKING
Represented By
GEORGE KAROUSATOS
Biancamano & Di Stefano, PC
contact info
Defendant
JACK SANTOS
Represented By
GEORGE KAROUSATOS
Biancamano & Di Stefano, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
ERNESTO SETELO
Represented By
DAVID ANDREW BERLIN
Weisberg Law
contact info
MATTHEW BENJAMIN WEISBERG
Weisberg Law
contact info
GARY SCHAFKOPF
Hopkins & Schafkopf, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
12 12 order Scheduling Order Tue 04/08 5:01 PM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 4/8/2025. (sm)
Related: [-]
11 11 order Text Order Tue 04/08 11:57 AM
TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold a teleconference on 6/23/25 at 10 a.m. using the Webex platform. Parties are to use the teleconference dial-in: 855-244-8681 and Access Code: 23021816037. An attendee ID # is not needed. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 4/8/2025. (qa, )
Related: [-]
minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Tue 04/08 11:44 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 4/8/2025. (qa, )
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 04/04 1:56 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by GEORGE KAROUSATOS on behalf of All Defendants (KAROUSATOS, GEORGE)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 04/01 7:54 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by ERNESTO SETELO. 635 SECURE PARKING, INC. served on 2/12/2025, answer due 3/5/2025; INTERPORT MAINTENANCE CO., INC. served on 2/12/2025, answer due 3/5/2025; INTERPORT SECURE PARKING served on 2/12/2025, answer due 3/5/2025; JACK SANTOS served on 2/12/2025, answer due 3/5/2025.(BERLIN, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service of Sumons and Complaint for Interport Secure Parking,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint for 635 Secure Parking, Inc.,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint for Interport Maintenance Co., Inc.,
Att: 4 Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint for Jack Santos
Monday, March 10, 2025
8 8 order Text Order ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 03/10 12:08 PM
TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold an initial conference (rule 16) before U.S.M.J. C. Waldor by telephone on 4/8/25 at 11am. Parties are to use the Courts teleconference dial-in: 855-244-8681 and Access Code: 23021816037. An attendee ID # is not needed. Local counsel for any/all parties must participate. Parties are to submit a completed Pretrial Scheduling Order (for Judge Salas cases, please use her dedicated PTSO found in the same location) found in the Notice of Judicial Preferences link to chambers via email at CLW_Orders@njd.uscourts.gov no later than 3 days before the scheduled conference.. Please contact chambers with any questions or concerns at (973) 776 7862. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 3/10/2025. (qa, )
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 03/07 3:26 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by 635 SECURE PARKING, INC., INTERPORT MAINTENANCE CO., INC., INTERPORT SECURE PARKING, JACK SANTOS.(KAROUSATOS, GEORGE)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
6 6 notice Notice of Call for Dismissal Wed 02/19 11:06 AM
Notice of Call for dismissal Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 4(m). Returnable 3/11/2025. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ro, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 11/27 1:40 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by GARY SCHAFKOPF on behalf of ERNESTO SETELO (SCHAFKOPF, GARY)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Thu 11/21 10:27 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to 635 SECURE PARKING, INC., INTERPORT MAINTENANCE CO., INC., INTERPORT SECURE PARKING, JACK SANTOS. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mj)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
3 3 misc Exhibit (to Document) Wed 11/20 4:32 PM
Exhibit to1 Complaint, by ERNESTO SETELO. (WEISBERG, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 11/20 4:27 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by MATTHEW BENJAMIN WEISBERG on behalf of ERNESTO SETELO (WEISBERG, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 11/20 12:58 PM
COMPLAINT against 635 SECURE PARKING, INC., INTERPORT MAINTENANCE CO., INC., INTERPORT SECURE PARKING, Jack Santos ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15820671) with JURY DEMAND, filed by ERNESTO SETELO.(BERLIN, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
qc QC - Civil Cover Sheet JS44 Wed 11/20 3:34 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed did not include a Civil Cover Sheet (JS-44), which is required to be submitted along with the initial pleading, as indicated in the Attorney Case Opening Guide. Please complete and file a[LINK:Civil Cover Sheet] using the event Exhibit (to Document) found under Civil/Other Filings/Other Documents. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (ps)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Wed 11/20 5:00 PM
Judge Michael E. Farbiarz and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor added. (ps)
Related: [-]