Robertson v. Cold Spring Country Club, Inc.
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Gary R Brown |
Referred: | Steven Tiscione |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-08070 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 29:754 Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Nov 20, 2024 |
Terminated: | May 08, 2025 |
Last checked: Monday May 19, 2025 4:31 AM EDT |
Defendant
Cold Spring Country Club, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Matt Tucker
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Robertson
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, May 08, 2025 | ||
23 | 23
![]() ORDER DISMISSING CASE re22 Stipulation of Dismissal: The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this case - Case closed. Ordered by Judge Gary R. Brown on 5/8/2025. (JC) |
|
Wednesday, May 07, 2025 | ||
22 | 22
![]() STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Cold Spring Country Club, Inc. (Kang, William) |
|
Friday, May 02, 2025 | ||
21 | 21
![]() STATUS REPORT by Cold Spring Country Club, Inc., Matt Tucker (Kang, William) |
|
Friday, April 11, 2025 | ||
20 | 20
![]() Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference and all upcoming deadlines sine die by Cold Spring Country Club, Inc., Matt Tucker. (Kang, William) |
|
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference 1 - Terminate Hearings
Fri 04/11 5:10 PM
ORDER granting20 Motion to Adjourn Conference. The initial conference scheduled for April 21st is adjourned without date. Counsel shall electronically file an updated status report with the Court no later than May 2, 2025. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 4/11/2025. (LV) |
||
Wednesday, March 12, 2025 | ||
19 | 19
![]() Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re14 Amended Complaint by Cold Spring Country Club, Inc., Matt Tucker. (Kang, William) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer 1 - Terminate Hearings ~Util - Set Hearings
Wed 03/12 5:43 PM
ORDER granting19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The time to answer or otherwise respond is extended to April 16, 2025. The initial conference scheduled for April 10th will instead be held at 12:00 p.m. on April 21, 2025. Counsel shall use the same dial-in information previously provided. The completed Discovery Plan Worksheet is to be submitted no later than April 17th. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 3/12/2025. (LV) |
||
Thursday, February 13, 2025 | ||
18 | 18
![]() SCHEDULING ORDER: An initial conference will be held at 11:00 a.m. on April 10, 2025 before the undersigned by phone. Counsel for all parties must participate and shall connect to the conference through dial-in number 571-353-2301 with ID# 179933855. The attached Discovery Plan Worksheet is to be completed by counsel and electronically filed with the Court by no later than April 8th. THE PARTIES ARE REMINDED that audio or video recording of proceedings by any party other than the Court, is strictly prohibited by Local Civil Rule 1.8. Violation of this rule may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed appropriate by the Court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 2/13/2025. (LV) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Thu 02/13 9:16 AM
ORDER granting17 Motion for Extension of Time to March 17, 2025 to Answer for All Defendants. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 2/13/2025. (LV) |
||
Tuesday, February 11, 2025 | ||
17 | 17
![]() Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re14 Amended Complaint by Cold Spring Country Club, Inc., Matt Tucker. (Kang, William) |
|
Thursday, December 19, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Michael Robertson. MATT TUCKER waiver sent on 12/17/2024, answer due 2/17/2025. (Ostrove, Rick) |
|
15 | 15
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Michael Robertson. Cold Spring Country Club, Inc. waiver sent on 12/17/2024, answer due 2/17/2025. (Ostrove, Rick) |
|
Tuesday, December 17, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
![]() AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Michael Robertson. (Ostrove, Rick) |
|
Monday, December 16, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by John Thomas Bauer on behalf of Cold Spring Country Club, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Bauer, John) |
|
12 | 12
![]() Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by Cold Spring Country Club, Inc.. (Kang, William) |
|
11 | 11
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by William Kang on behalf of Cold Spring Country Club, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Kang, William) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Mon 12/16 4:34 PM
ORDER granting12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Cold Spring Country Club, Inc. answer due 1/17/2025. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 12/16/2024. (LV) |
||
Monday, December 09, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
![]() SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Robertson. Cold Spring Country Club, Inc. served on 11/27/2024, answer due 12/18/2024. (Schwartz, Madeleine) |
|
Monday, November 25, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon David Okano on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Okano, Brandon) |
|
Thursday, November 21, 2024 | ||
utility
Incorrect Case-Document Information
Thu 11/21 5:23 PM
Incorrect Case/Document/Entry Information re: DE8 : The notice of appearance did not add Attorney Brandon Okano because it was not filed from this attorneys ECF account. Counsel is advised to refile the notice of appearance at DE 8 and using their own individual ECF account in order to be added to the docket. (JC) |
||
Wednesday, November 20, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Madeleine Schwartz on behalf of Michael Robertson (notification declined or already on case) (Schwartz, Madeleine) |
|
7 | 7
![]() Summons Issued as to Cold Spring Country Club, Inc. (LJ) |
|
6 | 6
![]() Clerk's Notice Re: Consent. A United States Magistrate Judge has been assigned to this case and is available to conduct all proceedings. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent.The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/MJConsentForm.pdf] (LJ) |
|
5 | 5
![]() This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (LJ) |
|
4 | 4
![]() Proposed Summons.Civil Cover Sheet.. by Michael Robertson (Schwartz, Madeleine) Modified on 11/20/2024 (LJ) |
|
3 | 3
![]() Civil Cover Sheet.. by Michael Robertson (LJ) Modified on 11/20/2024 (LJ) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Proposed Summons. by Michael Robertson (Schwartz, Madeleine) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against Cold Spring Country Club, Inc., filed by Michael Robertson. Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes (LJ) Modified on 11/20/2024 (LJ) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
misc
Filing Fee Received
Wed 11/20 2:59 PM
FILING FEE: $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-18513892 (LJ) |
||
utility
Incorrect Case-Document Information
Wed 11/20 2:59 PM
Incorrect Document Entry Information. Complaint was entered as against plaintiff; entry was deleted and re-entered as against defendant. (LJ) |
||
notice
Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet
Wed 11/20 3:01 PM
***Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. A completed Civil Cover Sheet was not filed - specifically page 2 of the document is missing. Please file a corrected Cover Sheet and complete all applicable questions under Certificate of Arbitration, Disclosure Statement, NY-E Division of Business Rule 1(d) and Bar Admission found on Page 2. Counsel is directed to submit the new Civil Cover Sheet using the event Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (LJ) |
||
utility
Incorrect Case-Document Information
Wed 11/20 4:22 PM
Incorrect Case/Document/Entry Information. Original DE 3 (CONSENT to Arbitration by Michael Robertson (Schwartz, Madeleine)) deleted by Clerk's Office as incorrect event was used by filing attorney during case opening. Subsequent Docket Entries 4 & 5 to be renumbered as 3 & 4 respectively. (LJ) |
||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 11/20 4:37 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Gary R. Brown and Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (LJ) |
||
utility
Incorrect Case-Document Information
Thu 11/21 12:00 PM
Incorrect Case/Document/Entry Information: Original DE 8 (NOTICE of Appearance by Madeleine Schwartz on behalf of Michael Robertson (notification declined or already on case) (Schwartz, Madeleine)) was deleted from the docket. Document was inadvertently filed as a notice of appearance and in the wrong case. Clerks Office has made all necessary changes. (JC) |