Chesaning Union Schools v. Meta Platforms, Inc. et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers |
Case #: | 4:24-cv-08194 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Nov 20, 2024 |
Last checked: Sunday Jan 05, 2025 1:23 AM PST |
Defendant
Meta Payments Inc.
|
|
Defendant
TikTok Ltd
|
|
Defendant
TikTok LLC
|
|
Defendant
TikTok Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Google, LLC
|
|
Defendant
ByteDance Ltd
|
|
Defendant
YouTube, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Snap, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Siculus, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Meta Platforms, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Instagram, LLC
1601 Willow Road
Menlo Park, CA 94025 |
|
Defendant
Facebook Technologies, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Facebook Payments, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Facebook Operations, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Facebook Holdings, LLC
|
|
Defendant
ByteDance Inc.
ByteDance Inc. 1920 Olympic Blvd
Santa Monica, CA 90404 |
|
Defendant
Alphabet Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Chesaning Union Schools, MI
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, December 03, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
![]() SUMMONS Returned Executed by Chesaning Union Schools. All Defendants.(Shinoff, William) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Wednesday, November 20, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Summons Issued as to Alphabet Inc., ByteDance Inc., ByteDance Ltd, Facebook Holdings, LLC, Facebook Operations, LLC, Facebook Payments, Inc., Facebook Technologies, LLC, Google, LLC, Instagram, LLC, Meta Payments Inc., Meta Platforms, Inc., Siculus, Inc., Snap, Inc., TikTok Inc., TikTok LLC, TikTok Ltd, YouTube, LLC. (krp, COURT STAFF) |
|
3 | 3
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Wed 11/20 11:02 AM
Case assigned to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (smc, COURT STAFF) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Proposed Summons. (Shinoff, William) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-20067676.). Filed by Chesaning Union Schools.(Shinoff, William) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
utility
MDL Member Case
Wed 11/20 2:45 PM
DIRECT FILED MEMBER CASE OPENED MDL 3047: Opened in California Northern District as 4:24-cv-08194-YGR Chesaning Union Schools v. Meta Platforms, Inc. et al cc: JPMDL (krp, COURT STAFF) |