Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Melissa Damian
Referred: Alicia O Valle
Case #: 0:24-cv-62205
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:2201 Declaratory Judgment
Case Filed:Nov 20, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jan 05, 2025 4:18 AM EST
Defendant
Ammar and Ali Asad Irrevocable Trust u/a/d December 3, 2019
Defendant
Summit Structures General Contractors, Inc.
Plaintiff
Richmond National Insurance Company
Represented By
Miguel Gaspar Fernandez
Kennedys Cmk LLP
contact info
Aaron Phillip Konstam
Kennedys Cmk LLP
contact info
Eric Hiller
Kennedys Cmk LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Monday, April 07, 2025
24 24 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Mon 04/07 5:52 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Oliver Max Birman on behalf of Ammar and Ali Asad Irrevocable Trust u/a/d December 3, 2019. Attorney Oliver Max Birman added to party Ammar and Ali Asad Irrevocable Trust u/a/d December 3, 2019(pty:dft), Attorney Oliver Max Birman added to party Ammar and Ali Asad Irrevocable Trust u/a/d December 3, 2019(pty:cc). (Birman, Oliver)
Related: [-]
23 23 1 pgs order Order Scheduling Mediation Mon 04/07 12:14 PM
ORDER Scheduling Mediation before Mediator John S. Freud. Mediation Hearing set for 9/25/2025 10:00 AM Signed by Judge Melissa Damian on 4/7/2025. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
22 22 adr Notice of Mediator Selection and/or Hearing Mon 03/31 4:45 PM
NOTICE of Mediator Selection. Selected/Added John Freud as Mediator.(Fernandez, Miguel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Joint Proposed Order Scheduling Mediation
21 21 answer Answer to Counterclaim Mon 03/31 2:29 PM
Plaintiff and Counter- Defendant, Richmond National Insurance Company's ANSWER to Counterclaim by Ammar and Ali Asad Irrevocable Trust u/a/d December 3, 2019 by Richmond National Insurance Company. (Fernandez, Miguel)
Related: [-]
20 20 answer Answer to Counterclaim Mon 03/31 2:23 PM
Plaintiff and Counter- Defendant, Richmond National Insurance Company's ANSWER to Counterclaim by Summit Structures General Contractors, Inc., by Richmond National Insurance Company. (Fernandez, Miguel)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
19 19 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 03/17 6:13 PM
Amended Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Richmond National Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Richmond National Services, Inc,, Corporate Parent Richmond National Group, Inc. for Richmond National Insurance Company (Fernandez, Miguel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
18 18 order Scheduling Order Order Referring Case to Mediation Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Tue 03/11 2:23 PM
ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Jury Trial set for 1/26/2026 in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Melissa Damian. Calendar Call set for 1/21/2026 01:30 PM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Melissa Damian. Mediation Deadline 9/29/2025. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters. Signed by Judge Melissa Damian on 3/11/2025. See attached document for full details. (wce)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
17 17 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Counterclaim Mon 03/10 4:42 PM
ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Richmond National Insurance Company by Summit Structures General Contractors, Inc.. (Marino, Stephen)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 03/10 4:39 PM
Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Summit Structures General Contractors, Inc. (Marino, Stephen)
Related: [-]
15 15 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Counterclaim Mon 03/10 3:27 PM
ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Richmond National Insurance Company by Ammar and Ali Asad Irrevocable Trust u/a/d December 3, 2019. (Zebersky, Edward)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
14 14 misc Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Fri 03/07 11:21 AM
Joint Election to Jurisdiction for Final Disposition of Motions . Filed by Richmond National Insurance Company (Fernandez, Miguel)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Scheduling Report - Rule 26(f)/16.1 Fri 03/07 11:19 AM
Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Richmond National Insurance Company(Fernandez, Miguel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
12 12 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 03/07 10:50 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alessia Ariana Rocha on behalf of Summit Structures General Contractors, Inc.. Attorney Alessia Ariana Rocha added to party Summit Structures General Contractors, Inc.(pty:dft). (Rocha, Alessia)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 03/07 10:49 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stephen A. Marino, Jr on behalf of Summit Structures General Contractors, Inc.. Attorney Stephen A. Marino, Jr added to party Summit Structures General Contractors, Inc.(pty:dft). (Marino, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
10 10 1 pgs order Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report Tue 02/25 11:04 AM
ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES: The parties are directed to prepare and file a joint scheduling report, as required by Local Rule 16.1, by March 17, 2025. In addition, by March 17, 2025, the parties, including governmental parties, must file certificates of interested parties and corporate disclosure statements. Signed by Judge Melissa Damian on 2/25/2025. See attached document for full details. (wce)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
9 9 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 02/13 3:26 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Richmond National Insurance Company (Fernandez, Miguel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
8 8 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 01/15 10:31 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Richmond National Insurance Company. Summit Structures General Contractors, Inc. waiver sent on 1/9/2025, response/answer due 3/10/2025. (Fernandez, Miguel)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
7 7 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Mon 01/13 10:18 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward Herbert Zebersky on behalf of Ammar and Ali Asad Irrevocable Trust u/a/d December 3, 2019. Attorney Edward Herbert Zebersky added to party Ammar and Ali Asad Irrevocable Trust u/a/d December 3, 2019(pty:dft). (Zebersky, Edward)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 01/13 9:04 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ammar and Ali Asad Irrevocable Trust u/a/d December 3, 2019. Ammar and Ali Asad Irrevocable Trust u/a/d December 3, 2019 waiver sent on 1/9/2025, response/answer due 3/10/2025. (Zebersky, Edward)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
5 5 notice Notice (Other) Fri 12/20 4:55 PM
Plaintiff's NOTICE of Refiling Exhibits to Amended Complaint by Richmond National Insurance Company re4 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal, (Fernandez, Miguel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit G,
Att: 3 Exhibit H
Thursday, December 19, 2024
4 4 cmp Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal Thu 12/19 6:13 PM
Plaintiff's AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ammar and Ali Asad Irrevocable Trust u/a/d December 3, 2019, Summit Structures General Contractors, Inc., filed by Richmond National Insurance Company.(Fernandez, Miguel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit H
Friday, November 22, 2024
3 3 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Fri 11/22 10:03 AM
ORDER ON CASES WITH MULTIPLE DEFENDANTS. Signed by Judge Melissa Damian on 11/22/2024. See attached document for full details. (wce)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Wed 11/20 2:47 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Melissa Damian. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (wce)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 11/20 2:30 PM
COMPLAINT against Ammar and Ali Asad Irrevocable Trust u/a/d December 3, 2019, Summit Structures General Contractors, Inc.. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17998531, filed by Richmond National Insurance Company.(Fernandez, Miguel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Civil Cover Sheet