Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Julie S Sneed
Referred: Robert M Norway
Case #: 6:24-cv-02124
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Case Filed:Nov 20, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
11 11 2 pgs order Order directing response to motion Wed 04/09 1:59 PM
ORDER directing Ralph Lescoe Byrd, III to reply to the response re 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Petitioner shall have NINETY (90) DAYS from the date of this Order to file a Reply to the Response if he chooses. Thereafter, the Petition, the Response, and the Reply (if filed) will be taken under advisement by the Court, and an order will be entered without further notice. The Court will not address new grounds raised in the Reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway on 4/9/2025. (LDJ)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
10 10 misc Tangible Item Received Tue 04/08 9:55 AM
Tangible Item Received. CD by Secretary, Department of Corrections. Filed on shelf in Clerk's office. (MSN)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 04/04 1:50 PM
Response ANSWER to Complaint Petition by Secretary, Department of Corrections.(Compton, Robin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix PART 1,
Att: 2 Appendix PART 2,
Att: 3 Appendix Part 3,
Att: 4 Appendix Part 4,
Att: 5 Appendix Part 5,
Att: 6 Appendix Part 6
Thursday, April 03, 2025
8 8 misc Response to order to show cause Thu 04/03 2:01 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re3 Order to respond to habeas petition filed by Secretary, Department of Corrections.(Compton, Robin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix Part 1,
Att: 2 Appendix Part 2,
Att: 3 Appendix Part 3,
Att: 4 Appendix Part 4,
Att: 5 Appendix Part 5,
Att: 6 Appendix Part 6
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
7 7 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Tue 01/14 11:52 AM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Loren D. Rhoton on behalf of Ralph Lescoe Byrd, III. Lead Counsel: Loren Rhoton. (Rhoton, Loren)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Tue 01/14 8:39 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Loren D. Rhoton of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MLB)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
5 5 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 01/13 2:45 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Secretary, Department of Corrections. (Compton, Robin)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of appearance Mon 01/13 2:44 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Robin A. Compton on behalf of Secretary, Department of Corrections (Compton, Robin)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
3 3 3 pgs order Order to respond to habeas petition Fri 01/03 1:57 PM
ORDER to respond and show cause why the petition should not be granted. Respondent shall file, within NINETY (90) DAYS from the date of this Order, a response, entitled "Response to Petition," indicating why the relief sought in the Petition should not be granted. The Clerk is directed to send a copy of this Order, the Petition, and any supporting documentation to Respondent. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway on 1/3/2025.(LDJ)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Service Documents
Thursday, November 21, 2024
2 2 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 11/21 8:14 AM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Julie S. Sneed and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway. New case number: 6:24-cv-2124-JSS-RMN. (ARL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
1 1 cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Wed 11/20 3:51 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - State (Filing fee $ 5 receipt number AFLMDC-22742769) filed by Ralph Lescoe Byrd.(Rhoton, Loren)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Main Document memorandum of law in support of habeas corpus petition,
Att: 2 Appendix Appendix to Habeas Corpus Petition,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet