California Central District Court
Judge:Sherilyn Peace Garnett
Referred: Brianna Fuller Mircheff
Case #: 2:24-cv-10031
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Case Filed:Nov 20, 2024
Last checked: Monday May 19, 2025 1:31 AM PDT
Defendant
Old Copper Company, Inc.
Represented By
Mohammad Keshavarzi
Sheppard, Mullin, Richter And Hampton LLP
contact info
Benjamin D Brooks
Sheppard Mullin Richter And Hampton LLP
contact info
J. Randall Boyer
Sheppard Mullin Richter And Hampton LLP
contact info
Defendant
Penney OpCo, LLC
Represented By
Mohammad Keshavarzi
Sheppard, Mullin, Richter And Hampton LLP
contact info
Benjamin D Brooks
Sheppard Mullin Richter And Hampton LLP
contact info
J. Randall Boyer
Sheppard Mullin Richter And Hampton LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Jordan Krantz
Represented By
Michael P Connett
Siri & Glimstad LLP
contact info
Kyle Douglas McLean
Siri And Glimstad LLP
contact info
Lisa R. Considine
Siri And Glimstad LLP
contact info
David J. DiSabato
Siri Glimstad LLP
contact info
Leslie L. Pescia
Siri And Glimstad LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Marjanique Robinson
Represented By
Kyle Douglas McLean
Siri And Glimstad LLP
contact info
Lisa R. Considine
Siri And Glimstad LLP
contact info
David J. DiSabato
Siri Glimstad LLP
contact info
Leslie L. Pescia
Siri And Glimstad LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Ariana Skurauskis
Represented By
Kyle Douglas McLean
Siri And Glimstad LLP
contact info
Lisa R. Considine
Siri And Glimstad LLP
contact info
David J. DiSabato
Siri Glimstad LLP
contact info
Leslie L. Pescia
Siri And Glimstad LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
44 44 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Tue 05/13 8:44 AM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Kyle Douglas McLean counsel for Plaintiff Jordan Krantz. Kyle McLean is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Jordan Krantz. (McLean, Kyle)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
43 43 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Thu 05/08 11:04 AM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Michael P Connett counsel for Plaintiff Jordan Krantz. Adding Michael Connett as counsel of record for Jordan Krantz for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Michael Connett. (Attorney Michael P Connett added to party Jordan Krantz(pty:pla))(Connett, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
42 42 misc For Judicial Notice Mon 04/21 3:44 PM
REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 41 filed by Defendants Old Copper Company, Inc., Penney OpCo, LLC.(Brooks, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
41 41 motion Dismiss Case Mon 04/21 3:41 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Old Copper Company, Inc., Penney OpCo, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 7/2/2025 at 01:30 PM before Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. (Brooks, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum In Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint,
Att: 2 Declaration of Benjamin D. Brooks In Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Benjamin D. Brooks,
Att: 4 Exhibit B to Declaration of Benjamin D. Brooks,
Att: 5 Exhibit C to Declaration fo Benjamin D. Brooks,
Att: 6 Exhibit D to Declaration of Benjamin D. Brooks,
Att: 7 Proposed Order 6
Thursday, March 20, 2025
40 40 order Extending Answer Due Deadline Fri 03/21 11:30 AM
ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO AMENDED COMPLAINT AND SET BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON DEFENDANT'S RESPONSIVE MOTION39 by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. Defendants' deadline to file a responsive pleading or motion shall be April 21, 2025. (iv)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
39 39 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Mon 03/17 3:28 PM
Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Penney OpCo, LLC answer now due 4/21/2025; Old Copper Company, Inc. answer now due 4/21/2025, re Amended Complaint/Petition37 filed by Defendants Penney OpCo, LLC; Old Copper Company, Inc..(Brooks, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Benjamin D. Brooks in Support Thereof,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
38 38 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Wed 03/12 3:52 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. In light, of Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint filed at Dkt. No.37 . The Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint filed at Dkt. No.33 is DENIED and MOOT. The April 23, 2025, hearing is vacated and taken off calendar. No appearance necessary. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pg)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
37 37 othcmp Amended Complaint/Petition Fri 03/07 3:27 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Old Copper Company, Inc., Penney OpCo, LLC amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 , filed by Plaintiff Jordan Krantz(Considine, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
36 36 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Wed 02/19 3:35 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney J Randall Boyer counsel for Defendants Old Copper Company, Inc., Penney OpCo, LLC. Adding J. Randall Boyer as counsel of record for Defendants Old Copper Company, Inc. and Penney OpCo LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Old Copper Company, Inc. and Penney OpCo LLC. (Attorney J Randall Boyer added to party Old Copper Company, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney J Randall Boyer added to party Penney OpCo, LLC(pty:dft))(Boyer, J)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
35 35 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Tue 02/18 1:33 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendant Penney OpCo, LLC, identifying Jordan Krantz, Penney OpCo LLC, Penney Borrower LLC, Simon Property Group, Inc., and Brookfield Asset Management, Inc.. (Brooks, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
34 34 notice Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Tue 02/18 12:04 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: Motion to Dismiss33 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7-1.1 no notice of interested parties. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. (iv)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
33 33 motion Dismiss Case Fri 02/14 4:16 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Penney OpCo, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 4/23/2025 at 01:30 PM before Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. (Brooks, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities,
Att: 2 Declaration of Benjamin Brooks in Support Thereof,
Att: 3 Exhibit A,
Att: 4 Proposed Order
Monday, January 27, 2025
32 32 misc Refund of Fees (G-124) - Issued Mon 01/27 5:20 AM
REFUND OF $500.00 made payable on 01/27/2025 to Cassandra Jernigan for payment made on 11/27/2024 Re: APPLICATION for Refund of Fees Paid31 . (rdj)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 26, 2024
31 31 motion Refund of Fees Paid (G-124) Thu 12/26 2:08 PM
APPLICATION for Refund of Fees Paid filed by Plaintiff Jordan Krantz. (DiSabato, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
30 30 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Thu 12/12 4:43 PM
STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. (pg)
Related: [-]
29 29 attorney Notice of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information (G-06) Thu 12/12 1:05 PM
NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Mohammad Keshavarzi counsel for Defendants Old Copper Company, Inc., Penney OpCo, LLC. Changing address to 350 South Grand Avenue, 40th Flr., Los Angeles, CA 90071-3460. Filed by Defendants Old Copper Company, Inc., Penney OpCo, LLC. (Keshavarzi, Mohammad)
Related: [-]
28 28 2 pgs order Order Thu 12/12 11:55 AM
ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT AND SET BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON DEFENDANT'S RESPONSIVE MOTION27 by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (iv)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
27 27 stip Extending Time to Answer (More than 30 days) Mon 12/09 1:35 PM
Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to February 14, 2025 re Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days),20 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days),19 filed by Defendants Old Copper Company, Inc., Penney OpCo, LLC.(Attorney Benjamin D Brooks added to party Old Copper Company, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Benjamin D Brooks added to party Penney OpCo, LLC(pty:dft))(Brooks, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Benjamin D. Brooks in Support of Joint Stipulation to Continue Deadline to Respond to Complaint and Set Briefing Schedule on Defendant's Responsive Motion,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
26 26 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 12/03 12:29 PM
ORDER by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett: finding as moot7 ; granting25 Non-Resident Attorney Leslie Pescia APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Jordan Krantz, designating Kyle McLean as local counsel. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY (sbou)
Related: [-]
25 25 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Tue 12/03 11:28 AM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Leslie Pescia to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Jordan Krantz (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 11/26/2024, Receipt No. 38633400) filed by Plaintiff Jordan Krantz. (McLean, Kyle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing AL,
Att: 2 Certificate of Good Standing KY,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Monday, December 02, 2024
24 24 notice Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) - optional html form Mon 12/02 2:34 PM
NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application.21 The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event is Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. (sbou)
Related: [-]
23 23 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 12/02 11:51 AM
ORDER by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett: granting22 Non-Resident Attorney David J. DiSabato APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Jordan Krantz, designating Kyle McLean as local counsel. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY (sbou)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
22 22 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Wed 11/27 1:21 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney David J. DiSabato to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Jordan Krantz (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-38665918) filed by PLAINTIFF Jordan Krantz. (McLean, Kyle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
21 21 respm Amendment (Motion related) Tue 11/26 11:27 AM
Amendment to APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Leslie Pescia to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Jordan Krantz (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-38633400)7 filed by Plaintiff Jordan Krantz. (McLean, Kyle)
Related: [-]
20 20 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Tue 11/26 11:15 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jordan Krantz, upon Defendant Old Copper Company, Inc. served on 11/25/2024, answer due 12/16/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Zachary Rouse, Intake Specialist in compliance with statute not specified by personal service (Considine, Lisa)
Related: [-]
19 19 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Tue 11/26 11:14 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jordan Krantz, upon Defendant Penney OpCo, LLC served on 11/25/2024, answer due 12/16/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Lauren Phillips, Fulfillment Associate for CT Corporation in compliance with statute not specified by personal service (Considine, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
18 18 notice Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) - optional html form Mon 11/25 3:16 PM
NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Leslie Pescia to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Jordan Krantz (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-38633400)7 . The following error(s) was/were found: The application is not signed. (sbou)
Related: [-]
17 17 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 11/25 11:39 AM
ORDER by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett: granting6 Non-Resident Attorney Lisa R. Considine APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Jordan Krantz, designating Kyle McLean as local counsel. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY (sbou)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
16 16 notice Clerical Error (G-11) Fri 11/22 11:55 AM
NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form15 , Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form13 . Docket entries 13 and 15 should be disregarded. (et)
Related: [-]
15 15 attorney Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form Fri 11/22 11:48 AM
[NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR ISSUED ON 11/22/2024, SEE DOCKET ENTRY16 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Leslie Pescia on behalf of Plaintiff. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (et) Modified on 11/22/2024 (et)
Related: [-]
14 14 attorney Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form Fri 11/22 11:47 AM
NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney David J. DiSabato. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (et)
Related: [-]
13 13 attorney Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form Fri 11/22 11:46 AM
[NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR ISSUED ON 11/22/2024, SEE DOCKET ENTRY16 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Lisa R. Considine on behalf of Plaintiff. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (et) Modified on 11/22/2024 (et)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 11/22 11:44 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Penney OpCo, LLC. (et)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 11/22 11:43 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Old Copper Company, Inc. (et)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Fri 11/22 11:38 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et)
Related: [-]
9 9 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Fri 11/22 11:38 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Fri 11/22 11:37 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett and Magistrate Judge Brianna Fuller Mircheff. (et)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Fri 11/22 8:25 AM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Leslie Pescia to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Jordan Krantz (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-38633400) filed by Plaintiff Jordan Krantz. (McLean, Kyle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 2 Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Thursday, November 21, 2024
6 6 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Thu 11/21 1:49 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Lisa R. Considine to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Jordan Krantz (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-38628896) filed by Plaintiff Jordan Krantz. (McLean, Kyle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 2 Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 3 Proposed Order Proposed Order
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
5 5 notice Summons Request Wed 11/20 1:16 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Jordan Krantz. (McLean, Kyle)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Summons Request Wed 11/20 1:15 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Jordan Krantz. (McLean, Kyle)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 11/20 1:14 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Jordan Krantz, identifying None. (McLean, Kyle)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Wed 11/20 1:12 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Jordan Krantz. (McLean, Kyle)
Related: [-]
1 1 58 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 11/20 1:11 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-38619458 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff Jordan Krantz. (Attorney Kyle Douglas McLean added to party Jordan Krantz(pty:pla))(McLean, Kyle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A