Illinois Southern District Court
Judge:Staci M Yandle
Case #: 3:24-cv-02511
Nature of Suit140 Contract - Negotiable Instrument
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Negotiable Instrument
Case Filed:Nov 20, 2024
Terminated:May 12, 2025
Last checked: Monday May 19, 2025 3:33 AM CDT
Defendant
Frederick Harrold
1226 Bissell
Venice, IL 62090
Defendant
Stephanie Harrold
Defendant
Pallet World LLC
Plaintiff
BB Community Leasing Services, Inc.
Represented By
Emily Ann Plakon
Quarles & Brady LLP
contact info

GPO May 12 2025
ORDER: The Motion for Default Judgment (Doc. 10) is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 5/12/2025. (cyl)

Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, May 12, 2025
12 12 order Judgment - Clerk Mon 05/12 11:11 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Approved by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 5/12/2025. (cyl)
Related: [-]
11 11 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Default Judgment Mon 05/12 11:02 AM
ORDER: The Motion for Default Judgment (Doc.10 ) is GRANTED . Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 5/12/2025. (cyl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
10 10 motion Default Judgment Wed 03/05 3:35 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendants by BB Community Leasing Services, Inc..(Plakon, Emily)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Emily Plakon,
Att: 2 Affidavit Declaration of Linda Lease
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
9 9 order Clerks Entry of Default ~Util - Terminate Motions Wed 02/26 8:37 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Pallet World LLC, Frederick Harrold, Stephanie Harrold, GRANTING8 MOTION for Entry of Default (Clerk's Default) filed by BB Community Leasing Services, Inc.(jdc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
8 8 motion Default Tue 02/25 12:54 PM
MOTION for Entry of Default (Clerk's Default) by BB Community Leasing Services, Inc.. (Plakon, Emily)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 01/23 9:31 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by BB Community Leasing Services, Inc.. Frederick Harrold served on 12/24/2024, answer due 1/14/2025. (Plakon, Emily)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 01/10 1:26 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by BB Community Leasing Services, Inc.. Pallet World LLC served on 12/24/2024, answer due 1/14/2025. (Plakon, Emily)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 01/10 1:22 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by BB Community Leasing Services, Inc.. Stephanie Harrold served on 12/24/2024, answer due 1/14/2025. (Plakon, Emily)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Thu 11/21 8:52 AM
Summons Issued as to Frederick Harrold, Stephanie Harrold, The Pallet World, LLC. Originals sent to counsel for service. (clw)
Related: [-]
3 3 utility Case Opening Notification Thu 11/21 8:41 AM
Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Staci M. Yandle assigned. All future documents must bear case number 24-CV-2511-SMY. (clw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
2 2 misc Disclosure Statement Wed 11/20 4:09 PM
Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement by BB Community Leasing Services, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Bankers' Bank for BB Community Leasing Services, Inc.. (Plakon, Emily)
Related: [-]
1 1 8 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 11/20 3:30 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AILSDC-5532943.), filed by BB Community Leasing Services, Inc..(Plakon, Emily)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex. A,
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex. B,
Att: 4 Exhibit Ex. C,
Att: 5 Exhibit Ex. D,
Att: 6 Exhibit Ex. E,
Att: 7 Exhibit Ex. F,
Att: 8 Summons Summons to be issued,
Att: 9 Summons Summons to be issued,
Att: 10 Summons Summons to be issued