Alabama Southern District Court
Judge:Terry F Moorer
Referred: Sonja F Bivins
Case #: 2:24-cv-00429
Nature of Suit448 Civil Rights - Education
Cause28:1343 Violation of Civil Rights
Case Filed:Nov 20, 2024
Last checked: Monday May 19, 2025 3:26 AM CDT
Defendant
Linden City Board of Education
Represented By
Alexander Fournier Braswell
Lloyd, Dinning, Boggs & Dinning
contact info
Mark S. Boardman
Boardman, Carr, Petelos, Watkins & Ogle, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Timothy Thurman, Sr.
Represented By
Mark S. Boardman
Boardman, Carr, Petelos, Watkins & Ogle, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Shakita Hall
Represented By
James D. Sears
Sears Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
utility Document Referred Wed 03/12 10:34 AM
REFERRAL OF19 Reply to Response to Motion to Dismiss to Judge Moorer. (tot)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
19 19 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 03/11 9:57 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion12 filed by Linden City Board of Education, Timothy Thurman, Sr. (Boardman, Mark)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
18 18 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 03/05 9:22 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re12 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Shakita Hall. (Sears, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
17 17 respm Reply Wed 03/05 9:18 PM
REPLY to12 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Shakita Hall. (Sears, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
16 16 service Affidavit of Service Tue 02/18 5:17 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Linden City Board of Education on 01/23/25, filed by Shakita Hall. (Sears, James)
Related: [-]
15 15 service Affidavit of Service Tue 02/18 5:15 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Timothy Thurman, Sr. on 01/23/25, filed by Shakita Hall. (Sears, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
14 14 2 pgs order Order Setting Motion Deadline/Hearing Tue 02/11 5:05 PM
Order re:12 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint. Response due by 3/5/2025. Reply due by 3/12/2025. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 2/11/2025. (mab)
Related: [-]
13 13 respm Brief Tue 02/11 2:46 PM
Brief filed by Linden City Board of Education, Timothy Thurman, Sr re12 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint Defendants' Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss . (Boardman, Mark)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Dismiss Tue 02/11 2:43 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by All Defendants. (Boardman, Mark)
Related: [-]
utility Motions Referred Tue 02/11 4:15 PM
MOTIONS REFERRED:12 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint ; and13 Brief in Support; Referred to Judge Terry F. Moorer. (mab)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
11 11 answer Answer due deadline Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Fri 02/07 10:06 AM
Order, DENYING as moot Defendants'10 Motion to Dismiss1 Complaint. Defendant's shall file their answer(s) or other responsive pleading(s) to the9 Amended Complaint on or befor 2/21/2025. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 2/6/2025. (mab)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
10 10 motion Dismiss Fri 01/31 4:29 PM
MOTION to Dismiss filed by Linden City Board of Education, Timothy Thurman, Sr. (Boardman, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Defendants Brief in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss
utility Motions Referred Fri 01/31 4:31 PM
MOTIONS REFERRED:10 MOTION to Dismiss Referred to Judge Terry F. Moorer. (mab)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
9 9 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 01/08 4:16 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Shakita Hall (Sears, James)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Response to Order Wed 01/08 4:12 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER re:7 Order,, Terminate Deadlines and Hearings,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, by S.H. filed by S.H.. (Sears, James)
Related: [-]
utility Document Referred Wed 01/08 5:02 PM
REFERRAL OF8 Response to7 Order to Judge Moorer. (mab)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
7 7 1 pgs order Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 01/06 1:18 PM
Order, the Court gives Plaintiff until 1/10/2025 to file the show cause response and comply separately with the Court's prior6 Order. Failure to comply may result in dismissal of this lawsuit. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 1/6/2025. (mab)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
6 6 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 12/17 5:03 PM
Order, No later than 1/3/2025, Plaintiff shall file either an amended complaint or show cause as set out in order. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 12/17/2024. (mab)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
5 5 service Summons Issued Thu 11/21 2:58 PM
Summons Issued as to Linden City Board of Education. (Note to Counsel: The Summons has been issued. Please print copies necessary for service.) (mab)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Filing Proposed Summons Thu 11/21 2:55 PM
NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons as to Linden City Board of Education by S.H. (mab)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Thu 11/21 2:20 PM
Summons Issued as to Timothy Thurman, Sr. (NOTE TO COUNSEL: The Summons has been issued. Please print copies necessary for service.) (tot)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Filing Proposed Summons Thu 11/21 1:53 PM
NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by S.H. (Sears, James) Modified on 11/21/2024 (mab)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 11/21 10:18 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $405 receipt number AALSDC-3499591, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by S.H.. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 2/19/2025. (Sears, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Civil Cover Sheet