California Southern District Court
Judge:Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Referred: Valerie E Torres
Case #: 3:24-cv-02179
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause15:0078m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Case Filed:Nov 20, 2024
Last checked: Monday May 19, 2025 1:29 AM PDT
Defendant
Eng Taing
Represented By
Lauren M. Leider
Wick Phillips Gould & Martin, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Touzi Capital, LLC
Represented By
Lauren M. Leider
Wick Phillips Gould & Martin, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Securities and Exchange Comission
Represented By
Robert Carl Stillwell
United States Securities And Exchange Commission
contact info
Peter Del Greco
Us Securities And Exchange Commission
contact info
Jasmine M. Starr
U.S. Securities And Exchange Commission
contact info
Stuart Alexander Johnson
U. S. Securities And Exchange Commission
contact info
Alec Johnson
U. S. Securities And Exchange Commission
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Movant
Vince Faridani
Terminated: 04/17/2025
PRO SE ALLOWED TO E-FILE 8471 Strom Park Drive
Melbourne, FL 32940

GPO Apr 17 2025
ORDER Denying Motion to Intervene [Doc. No. 5]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 4/17/2025. (anh)

Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, May 19, 2025
33 33 order Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel Mon 05/19 12:23 PM
Minute Order: On May 13, 2025, Defendant Touzi Capital, LLC, erroneously filed a pro hac vice application for Jeffrey Linsday Mills as a motion to appoint counsel. [Doc. No.29 .] The motion is withdrawn. Defendant is instructed to properly re-file their application. (anh)
Related: [-]
32 32 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 05/19 9:11 AM
NOTICE of Appearance Attorney Christopher Kirkpatrick by Lauren M. Leider on behalf of Eng Taing (Leider, Lauren) QC Email: Wrong event selected. Attorney instructed to withdraw and refile using the correct event (anh)
Related: [-]
31 31 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 05/19 9:10 AM
NOTICE of Appearance Attorney Rusty Okane by Lauren M. Leider on behalf of Eng Taing (Leider, Lauren) QC Email: Wrong event selected. Attorney instructed to withdraw and refile using the correct event. (anh)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 16, 2025
30 30 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Intervene Fri 05/16 1:13 PM
ORDER Denying Renewed Motion to Intervene28 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 5/16/2025. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(bdc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
29 29 motion Appoint Counsel Tue 05/13 3:02 PM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel Jeffrey L. Mills by Touzi Capital, LLC. (Leider, Lauren)QC Email: Wrong event/instructed to withdraw and refile (anh)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
28 28 motion Intervene Mon 05/12 8:16 PM
MOTION to Intervene and Request for Expedited Consideration by Vince Faridani.(Faridani, Vince)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration in Support of Motion to Intervene,
Att: 2 Declaration of Robert Daniels,
Att: 3 Declaration of Janes Thiel
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
27 27 minutes Case Management Conference Early Neutral Evaluation Conference ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 04/29 1:57 PM
Minute Entry for Proceedings Held Before Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres and Minute Order Setting Settlement Conference. The Court held an Early Neutral Evaluation Conference ("ENE") on April 29, 2025. Settlement discussions are ongoing, therefore the Court did not hold a Case Management Conference ("CMC"). Accordingly, the Court SETS a follow-on Settlement Conference for June 2, 2025 at 10:30 a.m. If the case does not resolve, the Court will immediately hold a CMC. (no document attached) (jam)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
26 26 notice Joint Discovery Plan Tue 04/22 10:07 AM
JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Securities and Exchange Comission and Eng Taing and Touzi Capital, LLC (Johnson, Alec) (anh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
25 25 6 pgs order Order on Motion to Intervene Thu 04/17 12:45 PM
ORDER Denying Motion to Intervene [Doc. No.5 ]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 4/17/2025. (anh)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
24 24 notice Notice (Other) Mon 04/14 7:48 PM
NOTICE of Supplemental Authority And Status Update by Vince Faridani (Faridani, Vince)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
23 23 4 pgs notice Notice of Appearance Tue 03/11 1:20 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Stuart Alexander Johnson on behalf of Securities and Exchange Comission (Johnson, Stuart)Attorney Stuart Alexander Johnson added to party Securities and Exchange Comission(pty:pla)
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 02, 2025
22 22 respm Reply to Response to Motion Sun 03/02 4:42 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re5 MOTION to Intervene Reply to Eng Taing & Touzi Capital's Response filed by Vince Faridani.(Faridani, Vince)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D
21 21 respm Reply to Response to Motion Sun 03/02 4:36 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re5 MOTION to Intervene Reply to SEC's Response filed by Vince Faridani.(Faridani, Vince)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
20 20 9 pgs order Order for Early Neutral Evaluation Wed 02/26 11:54 AM
NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres on 2/26/2025.(anh)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
19 19 22 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Mon 02/24 8:46 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Eng Taing, Touzi Capital, LLC.(Leider, Lauren) (anh)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
18 18 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 02/14 3:13 PM
MINUTE ORDER: The movant, pro se, has moved for an extension to respond to the opposition filed by the parties against movants motion to intervene. The movant may file his response by March 7, 2025. No further extensions will be granted. (anh)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 02/14 1:13 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Oppositions to Movant's Motion to Intervene by Vince Faridani. (Faridani, Vince)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
16 16 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 02/13 3:09 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re5 MOTION to Intervene filed by Securities and Exchange Comission.(Stillwell, Robert) (anh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Robert C. Stillwell,
Att: 2 Index of Exhibit to Declaration of Robert C. Stillwell,
Att: 3 Exhibit 1
15 15 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 02/13 1:07 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re5 MOTION to Intervene filed by Eng Taing, Touzi Capital, LLC. (Leider, Lauren) (anh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 02/12 7:32 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Carl Stillwell on behalf of Securities and Exchange Comission (Stillwell, Robert)Attorney Robert Carl Stillwell added to party Securities and Exchange Comission(pty:pla)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
13 13 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 02/07 10:00 AM
ORDER granting12 Defendants' motion for extension. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 2/07/2025. (jpp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
12 12 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 02/06 11:07 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer - Unopposed by Touzi Capital, LLC, Eng Taing.(Leider, Lauren)Attorney Lauren M. Leider added to party Touzi Capital, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Lauren M. Leider added to party Eng Taing(pty:dft) QC Email: Proposed Order (anh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Order
Thursday, January 30, 2025
11 11 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Electronically File Documents Thu 01/30 9:49 AM
ORDER Granting Motion to File Documents Electronically [ECF No.10 ]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 1/30/2025. (anh) **Movant notified through email provided**(exs)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
10 10 motion Leave to Electronically File Documents Tue 01/21 10:57 AM
MOTION for Leave to Electronically File Documents by Vince Faridani. (anh)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
9 9 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Fri 01/17 3:18 PM
ORDER granting8 Motion for Extension of Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 1/17/2025. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(sjt)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Fri 01/17 9:41 AM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion to Extend Briefing Schedule on Movant Vince Faridani's Motion to Intervene by Securities and Exchange Comission. (Starr, Jasmine)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
7 7 1 pgs order Order Striking Document Mon 01/13 12:00 PM
Minute Order: The Court orders that the SEC file a response to the motion to intervene filed in this case by Jan. 27, 2025. The Court strikes the movants motion for preliminary injunction, [ECF No.6 ], as improperly filed. Movant shall wait until the motion to intervene has been adjudicated before refiling his motion.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(anh) (anh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (1/13/2025) Stricken Document
Thursday, January 09, 2025
6 6 motion Preliminary Injunction Fri 01/10 9:24 AM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Vince Faridani. (anh)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Intervene Fri 01/10 9:21 AM
MOTION to Intervene by Vince Faridani. (anh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 26, 2024
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 12/26 8:19 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Touzi Capital, LLC, as to Touzi Capital, LLC. (Starr, Jasmine) (jmo)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 12/26 8:16 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Securities and Exchange Comission, as to Eng Taing. (Starr, Jasmine) (jmo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Wed 11/20 4:08 PM
Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (yxc) (anh).
Related: [-]
1 1 36 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 11/20 4:03 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Eng Taing and Touzi Capital, LLC,, No Fee Required, filed by Securities and Exchange Comission. The new case number is 3:24-cv-2179-CAB-VET. Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo and Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres are assigned to the case. (Starr, Jasmine)(yxc) (anh).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet