Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Mark A Kearney
Case #: 2:24-cv-06204
Nature of Suit443 Civil Rights - Housing/Accommodations
Cause42:405 Fair Housing Act
Case Filed:Nov 14, 2024
Re-opened:Feb 14, 2025
Terminated:Apr 28, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Dec 29, 2024 3:55 AM EST
Defendant
RECAP PA HOLDINGS, LLC
Plaintiff
MEREDITH TWYMAN
967 STREET ROAD APT. B
SOUTHAMPTON, PA 18966

GPO Mar 12 2025
MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 3/12/25. 3/13/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
GPO Mar 12 2025
ORDER DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS (ECF 24) IS GRANTED WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO PLAINTIFF AGAIN CAREFULLY STUDYING OUR LIMITED SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION CONSISTENT WITH THE ACCOMPANYING MEMORANDUM AND THEREAFTER, IF WARRANTED BASED ON DEFENDANTS ANTICIPATED REVIEW OF POTENTIAL STEPS TO ADDRESS A PARKING SPOT CLOSER TO HER APARTMENT UNIT FOLLOWING PLAINTIFFS IMMEDIATE PRODUCTION OF HER HANDICAPPED PLACARD AND MEDICAL CONFIRMATION OF DISABILITY, FILING A THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT AGAINST PARTIES SHE BELIEVES RESPONSIBLE FOR VIOLATING HER FEDERAL RIGHTS BY NO EARLIER THAN MARCH 27, 2025 (TO ALLOW DEFENDANT AN OPPORTUNITY TO MEDIATE CONCERNS) AND NO LATER THAN APRIL 4, 2025, MINDFUL, ABSENT PLAINTIFFS VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OR TIMELY THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT UNDER THIS ORDER, WE MAY CLOSE THIS CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO PLAINTIFF PURSUING HER RIGHTS BEFORE THE PENNSYLVANIA COURTS AND CONTINUING HER CLAIM IN ADMINISTRATIVE AGENCIES. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 3/12/25. 3/13/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
GPO Apr 28 2025
MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 4/28/25. 4/28/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
GPO Apr 28 2025
ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS 45 IS GRANTED. WE DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S STATE LAW CLAIMS WITHOUT PREJUDICE. DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S FEDERAL LAW CLAIMS WITH PREJUDICE AND THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL MARK THIS CASE CLOSED. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 4/28/25. 4/28/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)

Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, April 28, 2025
48 48 1 pgs order Memorandum and/or Opinion Order Mon 04/28 4:01 PM
ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS45 IS GRANTED. WE DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S STATE LAW CLAIMS WITHOUT PREJUDICE. DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S FEDERAL LAW CLAIMS WITH PREJUDICE AND THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL MARK THIS CASE CLOSED. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 4/28/25. 4/28/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
Related: [-]
47 47 14 pgs order Memorandum and/or Opinion Mon 04/28 3:58 PM
MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 4/28/25. 4/28/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
46 46 respoth Response Fri 04/18 12:00 PM
PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE IN OPPOSITIOIN TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT, MEMORANDUM OF LAW by MEREDITH TWYMAN. (rf, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum,
Att: 2 COVERLETTER
Friday, April 11, 2025
45 45 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 04/11 3:50 PM
Third MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by 963 STREET ROAD LLC, RECAP PA HOLDINGS, LLC.Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(BRENNAN, PATRICK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit D,
Att: 6 Exhibit E,
Att: 7 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 8 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
44 44 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Tue 04/08 3:39 PM
ORDER THAT UPON REVIEWING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS THE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT OR ALTERNATIVELY FOR SUMMATY JUDGMENT (ECF 43), FINDING THEIR SUMMATY JUDGMENT REQUEST DOES NOT COMPLY WITH OUR GOVERNING POLICIES (V.A. AND V.C.) AND THE BRIEFING IS TOO LONG FOR A MOTION TO DISMISS AND DEFENDANTS NEVER OFFER THE PARTICULAR GROUNDS OR SUMMATY OF ARGUMENT REQUIRED UNDER RULE 7(B) AND OUR POLICIES FOR A MOTION, IT IS ORDERED WE STRIKE DEFENDANTS' NON-COMPLIANT MOTION (ECF 43) WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO EITHER FILE AN ANSWER TO THE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT OR MOVE FOR DISPOSITIVE RELIEF COMPLIANT WITH OUR POLICIES AS TO THEIR ALTEMATIVE REQUESTS ON BEHALF OF EACH DEFENDANT NO LATER THAN APRIL 11, 2025 INCLUDING ATTACHING A NOTICE (IF SEEKING SUMMATY JUDGMENT RELIEF) ADVISING THE PRO SE PLAINTIFF OF HER OBLIGATION TO PRESENT EVIDENCE IN OPPOSITION TO A REQUEST FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT WITHIN FOURTEEN DAYS OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 4/8/25. 4/8/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
43 43 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 04/07 6:06 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by 963 STREET ROAD LLC, RECAP PA HOLDINGS, LLC.Memorandum, Statement of Undisputed Material Facts, Appendix, Certificate of Service.(BRENNAN, PATRICK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit D,
Att: 6 Exhibit E,
Att: 7 Exhibit F,
Att: 8 Exhibit G,
Att: 9 Exhibit H,
Att: 10 Statement of Undisputed Material Facts,
Att: 11 Memorandum,
Att: 12 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 13 Certificate of Service
42 42 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/07 5:50 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by PATRICK J. BRENNAN on behalf of 963 STREET ROAD LLC with Certificate of Service(BRENNAN, PATRICK)
Related: [-]
41 41 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/07 5:48 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT M. KLEIN on behalf of 963 STREET ROAD LLC with Certificate of Service(KLEIN, SCOTT)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
misc Remark Tue 03/25 3:06 PM
DOC. 40 MAILED TO PRO SE. (sg)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
40 40 service Summons Issued Mon 03/24 9:00 AM
Summons Issued as to 963 STREET ROAD LLC. NOT MAILED To: PRO SE on 3/24/25 (bw)
Related: [-]
39 39 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 03/24 8:55 AM
THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT against 963 STREET ROAD LLC, RECAP PA HOLDINGS, LLC, filed by MEREDITH TWYMAN.(bw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 COVER LETTER
Monday, March 17, 2025
38 38 notice Notice (Other) Tue 03/18 8:23 AM
NOTICE Re: JUde Hey's Policies and Procedures Regarding Settlement (bw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
37 37 order Scheduling Order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge-Settlement Thu 03/13 8:37 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: A FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 7/24/2025 08:45 AM IN Video Conference BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE MARK A. KEARNEY., ALL FACT AND EXPERT DISCOVERY DUE BY 5/20/2025., JURY SELECTION IS SET FOR 7/28/2025 09:00 AM IN Courtroom 6B BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE MARK A. KEARNEY., MOTIONS DUE BY 6/5/2025., MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DUE BY 6/5/2025., PLAINTIFF PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 7/9/2025., DEFENDANT PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 7/9/2025., A TWO-DAY TRIAL DATE IS SET FOR 7/28/2025 09:00 AM IN Courtroom 6B BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE MARK A. KEARNEY. THIS MATTER IS REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY FOR SETTLEMENT. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 3/12/25. 3/13/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
Related: [-]
36 36 1 pgs order Memorandum and/or Opinion Order Thu 03/13 7:33 AM
ORDER DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS (ECF 24) IS GRANTED WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO PLAINTIFF AGAIN CAREFULLY STUDYING OUR LIMITED SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION CONSISTENT WITH THE ACCOMPANYING MEMORANDUM AND THEREAFTER, IF WARRANTED BASED ON DEFENDANTS ANTICIPATED REVIEW OF POTENTIAL STEPS TO ADDRESS A PARKING SPOT CLOSER TO HER APARTMENT UNIT FOLLOWING PLAINTIFFS IMMEDIATE PRODUCTION OF HER HANDICAPPED PLACARD AND MEDICAL CONFIRMATION OF DISABILITY, FILING A THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT AGAINST PARTIES SHE BELIEVES RESPONSIBLE FOR VIOLATING HER FEDERAL RIGHTS BY NO EARLIER THAN MARCH 27, 2025 (TO ALLOW DEFENDANT AN OPPORTUNITY TO MEDIATE CONCERNS) AND NO LATER THAN APRIL 4, 2025, MINDFUL, ABSENT PLAINTIFFS VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OR TIMELY THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT UNDER THIS ORDER, WE MAY CLOSE THIS CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO PLAINTIFF PURSUING HER RIGHTS BEFORE THE PENNSYLVANIA COURTS AND CONTINUING HER CLAIM IN ADMINISTRATIVE AGENCIES. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 3/12/25. 3/13/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
Related: [-]
35 35 13 pgs order Memorandum and/or Opinion Thu 03/13 7:31 AM
MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 3/12/25. 3/13/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
Related: [-]
34 34 minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Wed 03/12 1:34 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before DISTRICT JUDGE MARK A. KEARNEY Pretrial Conference held on 3/12/25 (bw)
Related: [-]
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Thu 03/13 9:23 AM
Per #36 : AMENDED PLEADINGS DUE BY 3/27/2025. (lisad, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
33 33 respoth Response Wed 03/12 8:33 AM
PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS by MEREDITH TWYMAN. (bw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Cover Letter
32 32 respoth Response Wed 03/12 8:30 AM
PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS by MEREDITH TWYMAN. (bw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Cover Letter
Monday, March 10, 2025
31 31 discov Discovery Plan Mon 03/10 7:59 PM
Discovery Plan by RECAP PA HOLDINGS, LLC.(BRENNAN, PATRICK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Statement of Undisputed Material Facts,
Att: 2 Exhibit Demand,
Att: 3 Exhibit Counteroffer,
Att: 4 Exhibit Rejection,
Att: 5 Certificate of Service
30 30 trial Exhibit Mon 03/10 4:46 PM
EXHIBIT B by MEREDITH TWYMAN.(er)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 cover sheet
29 29 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 03/10 4:37 PM
PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND HER SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT TO ADD 963 STREET ROAD, LLC AS CO-DEFENDANT IN THIS CIVIL ACTION filed by MEREDITH TWYMAN.(er)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 cover page
Thursday, March 06, 2025
28 28 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 03/06 9:05 AM
ORDER THAT THE PLAINTIFF'S PRO SE MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME26 IS DENIED AS DUPLICATIVE. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 3/6/25.3/6/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
27 27 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 03/05 9:04 AM
ORDER THAT THE PLAINTIFF'S PRO SE MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE/REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS25 IS DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 3/5/25.3/5/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
26 26 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 03/05 8:49 AM
PRO SE PLAINTIFF MEREDITH TWYMAN'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE A RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (DT)(dt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Page
25 25 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 03/04 3:58 PM
PRO SE PLAINTIFF MEREDITH TWYMAN'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE A RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(dt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Page
Monday, March 03, 2025
24 24 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 03/03 1:55 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by RECAP PA HOLDINGS, LLC.Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(BRENNAN, PATRICK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Memorandum,
Att: 3 Exhibit A - Lease,
Att: 4 Exhibit B - Documents,
Att: 5 Exhibit C - Demand,
Att: 6 Exhibit D - Counteroffer,
Att: 7 Certificate of Service
Friday, February 21, 2025
23 23 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Order Fri 02/21 8:43 AM
ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERING PLAINTIFFS PRO SE MOTION TO APPEAR REMOTELY (ECF 20) AT THE MARCH 12, 2025 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (ECF 18), WITHOUT TIMELY OPPOSITION UNDER OUR FEBRUARY 18, 2025 NOTICE (ECF 21), AND FOR GOOD CAUSE, IT IS ORDERED PLAINTIFFS MOTION (ECF 18) IS GRANTED REQUIRING WE AMEND OUR FEBRUARY 14, 2025 ORDER (ECF 18) ONLY TO REQUIRE THE PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANTS COUNSEL TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY VIA ZOOMGOV (1-646-828-7666; MEETING ID: 160 064 9276; PASSCODE: 254157) AT THE MARCH 12, 2025 CONFERENCE ABSENT AN EARLIER SETTLEMENT OF THE HABITABILITY CONCERNS ALLOWING THE FILING OF A LOCAL RULE 41.1 ORDER. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 2/21/25.2/21/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
22 22 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Order Tue 02/18 3:48 PM
ORDER THAT THE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR AN ESCROW ORDER19 IS DENIED. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 2/18/25.2/18/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
Related: [-]
21 21 notice Notice (Other) Tue 02/18 12:55 PM
NOTICE granting Defendant leave to file a Response not exceeding two pages by no later than February 19, 2025 to the Plaintiff's Motion20 to amend our February 14, 2025 Order18 only to allow the parties and counsel appear remotely over a Zoom.gov connection for the March 12, 2025 Initial Pretrial Conference.(KEARNEY, MARK)
Related: [-]
20 20 5 pgs motion Order Tue 02/18 8:46 AM
PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPEAR REMOTELY FOR PRE TRAIL CONFERENCE filed by MEREDITH TWYMAN..(bw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 COVER LETTER
Monday, February 17, 2025
19 19 9 pgs motion Order Tue 02/18 8:11 AM
PLAINTIFF'S SECOND EXPEDITED MOTION FOR ISSUANCE OS AN ESCROW ORDER filed by MEREDITH TWYMAN..(bw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 COVER LETTER
Friday, February 14, 2025
18 18 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Fri 02/14 12:21 PM
ORDER THAT FOLLOWING TODAY'S ORDER REOPENING THIS MATTER16 AND DIRECTING A RESPONSE TO THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT17 IT IS ORDERED THAT A PRETRIAL CONFERENCE HAS BEEN SET FOR 3/12/2025 12:15 PM IN Courtroom 6B BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE MARK A. KEARNEY. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 2/14/25. 2/14/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
Related: [-]
17 17 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 02/14 11:33 AM
SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against RECAP PA HOLDINGS, LLC, filed by MEREDITH TWYMAN.(bw)
Related: [-]
16 16 6 pgs order Order on Motion for Order Fri 02/14 11:30 AM
ORDER MEMORANDUM. ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERING PLAINTIFFS PRO SE MOTION TO REOPEN (ECF 15) WITH ATTACHED PROPOSED SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT (15-1), NO TIMELY OPPOSITION, AND FINDING DEFENDANTS EARLIER ARGUMENTS (ECF 12) DO NOT PRECLUDE FILING OF A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT WITHIN OUR LIMITED SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION AS ADDRESSED BELOW, IT IS ORDERED PLAINTIFFS UNOPPOSED MOTION (ECF 15) IS GRANTED REQUIRING: WE DIRECT THE CLERK OF COURT TO REOPEN THE CASE AND FILE THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT (ECF 15-1); AND, DEFENDANT SHALL RESPOND TO THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT BY NO LATER THAN MARCH 3, 2025; AS IT IS OUTLINED HEREIN.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 2/14/25.2/14/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
15 15 8 pgs motion Order Thu 01/30 1:05 PM
MOTION TO REOPEN CIVIL DOCKET AND LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by MEREDITH TWYMAN..(bw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT,
Att: 2 COVER LETTER
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
14 14 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 01/29 10:20 AM
ORDER THAT UPON NOTING DEFENDANT MOVED TO DISMISS (ECF 12) AN AMENDED PRO SE COMPLAINT (ECF 10) AFTER WE DISMISSED THIS CASE ON JANUARY 6, 2025 FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION AND CLOSED THE CASE (ECF 9), FINDING PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT (ECF 10) FILED WITHOUT LEAVE IS A NULLITY WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR HER TO PURSUE HER STATE COURT REMEDIES IN STATE COURT OR MOVE HERE FOR RELIEF UNDER RULES 15 OR 60, AND FOR GOOD CAUSE, IT IS ORDERED WE: STRIKE THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT (ECF 10) FILED WITHOUT LEAVE AS A NULLITY AS A MATTER OF LAW AFTER THE CLOSE OF THE CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO PLAINTIFF SEEKING A REMEDY IN THE STATE COURT OR FILING A MOTION SEEKING LEAVE TO AMEND HERE CONSISTENT WITH RULES 11 AND 151; DENY DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS (ECF 12) AS MOOT; AND, DIRECT THE CLERK OF COURT THIS CASE REMAINS CLOSED. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 1/29/25.1/29/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 01/28 4:35 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT M. KLEIN on behalf of RECAP PA HOLDINGS, LLC with Certificate of Service(KLEIN, SCOTT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
12 12 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 01/28 4:28 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by RECAP PA HOLDINGS, LLC.Memorandum and Certificate of Service.(BRENNAN, PATRICK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Memorandum,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Certificate of Service
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 01/28 4:24 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by PATRICK J. BRENNAN on behalf of RECAP PA HOLDINGS, LLC with Certificate of Service(BRENNAN, PATRICK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
10 10 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 01/08 9:05 AM
SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against RECAP PA HOLDINGS, LLC, filed by MEREDITH TWYMAN, VERIFICATION, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(er)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 cover page
Monday, January 06, 2025
9 9 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Mon 01/06 11:30 AM
ORDER THAT WE DECLINE TO EXERCISE SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION OVER THE STATE LAW CONTRACT CLAIMS ABSENT A FEDERAL QUESTION OR DIVERSITY JURISDICTION AS PLAINTIFF NO LONGER PLEADS A CLAIM UNDER FEDERAL LAW REQUIRING WE DISMISS THIS CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO TIMELY PURSUE THE CONTRACT-BASED LANDLORD TENANT CLAIMS IN THE BUCKS COUNTY COURTS AND AS THE DISPUTE OTHERWISE INVOLVES LOCAL PROPERTY ISSUES; WE DENY PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ISSUANCE OF PAYMENT INTO ESCROW (ECF 8) AS MOOT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO PURSUE REMEDIES IN STATE COURT; AND, THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL CLOSE THIS CASE. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 1/6/25. 1/6/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
Related: [-]
Saturday, January 04, 2025
8 8 motion Issue Mon 01/06 8:13 AM
PLAINIFF'S EXPEDITED MOTION FOR ISSUANCE OF AN ESCROW ORDER filed by MEREDITH TWYMAN..(bw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 COVER LETTER
Friday, January 03, 2025
7 7 service Affidavit of Service Fri 01/03 5:42 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service(va)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Sheet
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
6 6 service Summons Issued Wed 12/18 10:39 AM
Summons Issued as to RECAP PA HOLDINGS, LLC. Forwarded To: Meredith Twyman on 12/18/24 (fdc)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Filing Fee Received Wed 12/18 10:09 AM
Complaint Filing Fee Paid: $ 405.00, receipt number 20025829 (fdc)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
4 4 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 12/16 9:53 AM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by MEREDITH TWYMAN.(bw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 COVER LETTER
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
3 3 1 pgs order Order Wed 11/20 1:22 PM
ORDER THAT THE PLAINTIFF SHALL, ON OR BEFORE DECEMBER 20, 2024, EITHER: (1) PAY $405 (THE $350 FILING FEE AND $55 ADMINISTRATIVE FEE) TO THE CLERK OF COURT, OR (2) MOVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS; THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL SEND THIS ORDER TO PLAINTIFF ALONG WITH A COPY OF THE APPROPRIATE NON-PRISONER APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, BEARING THE CIVIL ACTION NUMBER OF THIS CASE. PLAINTIFF MAY USE THIS FORM TO SEEK LEAVE TO PROCEED IN JONNA PAUPERIS IF HE CANNOT AFFORD TO PAY THE FEES TO COMMENCE THIS CASE; AND, WE MAY DISMISS THIS MATTER WITHOUT FURTHER NOTICE IF PLAINTIFF FAILS TO COMPLY WITH THIS ORDER. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 11/20/24. 11/20/24 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE W/ IFP APPLICATION FORMS.(bw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
2 2 notice Notice re: Pro Se Guidelines Wed 11/20 12:26 PM
PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES. MAILED TO PRO SE W/ E-NOTICE CONSENT FORMS.(bw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Pro Se E-Notice Consent Form
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 11/20 12:24 PM
COMPLAINT against RECAP PA HOLDINGS, LLC, filed by MEREDITH TWYMAN. (NO FEE PAID; NO IFP FILED)(bw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet