South Carolina District Court
Judge:Bruce Howe Hendricks
Referred: Kaymani D West
Case #: 5:24-cv-06520
Nature of Suit555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights, State Filers
Case Filed:Nov 15, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
35 35 1 pgs misc Letter Thu 04/10 11:02 AM
Letter from Le'Andre Richardson.(prou, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
34 34 misc Letter Wed 03/26 10:49 AM
Letter.(Morgan, H)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
30 30 misc Document Mailed Tue 03/18 12:51 PM
***DOCUMENT MAILED: 28 Text Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerk's Office to Le'Andre Kajuan Richardson, #33557, Florence County Detention Center, 6719 Friendfield Road, Effingham, SC 29541. (prou, )
Related: [-]
29 29 3 pgs misc Supplement - Not an attachment to main document Tue 03/18 12:48 PM
SUPPLEMENT by Le'Andre Kajuan Richardson to1 Complaint. (prou, )
Related: [-]
28 28 order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Tue 03/18 12:45 PM
TEXT ORDER: On March 17, 2025, Plaintiff filed a Motion to Amend/Correct his Complaint, ECF No. 27 , dated March 10, 2025. Plaintiff's Motion is one sentence long and seeks to amend his lawsuit to add proposed Defendant Florence County Sheriff's Office. Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15 governs amended and supplemental pleadings. Rule 15(a)(1) provides that a party may amend its pleadings once as a matter of course within twenty-one days after serving the pleading on any defendants, or if a responsive pleading is required, twenty-one days after service of the responsive pleading or twenty-one days after service of a motion under Rule 12(b), (e), or (f), whichever is earlier. Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(1)(A)-(B). Rule 15 further states that in all other cases, a party may amend it pleadings only with: (1) the opposing party's written consent, or (2) the court's leave. Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(2). Defendants filed their Answer on February 11, 2025. ECF No. 22 . However, in this case, the scheduling order set a deadline for amending pleadings, which expires on March 14, 2025. Plaintiff's Motion is timely under the scheduling order. Further, it appears Plaintiff is not adding any additional claims but simply seeks to add another Defendant to the Complaint. Upon review and considering the liberal construction afforded pro se plaintiffs, the undersigned grants Plaintiff's Motion to Amend/Correct his Complaint, ECF No. 27 . The Clerk of Court is instructed to docket Plaintiff's Motion, ECF No. 27 , as a supplement to Plaintiff's Complaint. Further, the court now directs counsel for Defendant to advise the court on or before April 1, 2025 whether he will accept service on behalf of The Florence County Sheriff's Office. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 3/18/2025.(prou, )
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
27 27 motion Amend/Correct Mon 03/17 11:53 AM
MOTION to Amend/Correct1 Complaint by Le'Andre Kajuan Richardson. Response to Motion due by 3/31/2025. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.Motions referred to Kaymani D West.(prou, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Friday, February 14, 2025
26 26 service Summons Returned Executed - Complaint Served Tue 02/18 9:25 AM
USM-285 Returned Executed. J Gee served on 1/29/2025. (prou, )
Related: [-]
25 25 service Summons Returned Executed - Complaint Served Tue 02/18 9:21 AM
USM-285 Returned Executed. R Poston served on 1/29/2025. (prou, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
24 24 misc Document Mailed Wed 02/12 12:51 PM
***DOCUMENT MAILED:23 Scheduling Order w/NEF, placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerk's Office to Le'Andre Kajuan Richardson, #33557, Florence County Detention Center, 6719 Friendfield Road, Effingham, SC 29541. (prou, )
Related: [-]
23 23 order Scheduling Order Wed 02/12 12:49 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 3/14/2025, Discovery due by 4/14/2025, Motions due by 5/27/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 2/12/2025. (prou, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
22 22 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 02/11 2:43 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by J Gee, R Poston.(Morgan, H)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service
Friday, December 20, 2024
19 19 service Summons Issued Fri 12/20 10:52 AM
Summons Issued as to J Gee, R Poston. Service due by 3/20/2025. (prou, )
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Document Mailed Fri 12/20 10:48 AM
***DOCUMENT MAILED:17 Order 1983 w/NEF, placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerk's Office to Le'Andre Kajuan Richardson, #33557, Florence County Detention Center, 6719 Friendfield Road, Effingham, SC 29541. (prou, )
Related: [-]
17 17 3 pgs order Order 1983 - Service - Inmate Fri 12/20 10:44 AM
ORDER authorizing service of process. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 12/20/2024. (prou, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
12 12 misc Document Mailed Thu 11/21 9:16 AM
***DOCUMENTS MAILED:10 Proper Form Order w/NEF, two USM-285 Forms, 11 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerk's Office to Le'Andre Kajuan Richardson, #33557, Florence County Detention Center, 6719 Friendfield Road, Effingham, SC 29541. (prou, )
Related: [-]
11 11 order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 11/21 9:12 AM
ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis per 10 Proper Form Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 11/21/2024.(prou, )
Related: [-]
10 10 order Proper Form Order Thu 11/21 9:10 AM
PROPER FORM ORDER: Case to be brought into proper form by 12/12/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 11/21/2024. (prou, )
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2024
4 4 misc True Division for Trial Wed 11/20 10:16 AM
TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Florence. (prou, )
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 11/20 10:13 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Related [+] by Le'Andre Kajuan Richardson. Response to Motion due by 12/2/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.Motions referred to Kaymani D West.(prou, )
Related: [-] stricted Access
Att: 1 Envelope
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 11/20 10:12 AM
COMPLAINT against J Gee, R Poston, filed by Le'Andre Kajuan Richardson. Service due by 2/13/2025.(prou, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope