California Central District Court
Case #: 2:24-cr-00691
Case Filed:Nov 18, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 20, 2024 11:34 PM PST
Defendant
Myah Ofeibia Saakwa-Mante (1)
Represented By
Rebecca Kathleen Harris
Federal Public Defenders Office
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Jason Alexander Gorn
Ausa - Us Attorneys Offce
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/27/2025 3:52 AM PST
Monday, November 04, 2024
1 1 15 pgs COMPLAINT filed as to Defendant Myah Ofeibia Saakwa-Mante in violation of 21:841(a)(1),(b)(1)(A)(viii). Approved by Magistrate Judge A. Joel Richlin as to Myah Ofeibia Saakwa-Mante (1). (jb) [2:24-mj-06694-DUTY]
Related: [-]
3 3 5 pgs NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR DETENTION filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Myah Ofeibia Saakwa-Mante. (jb) [2:24-mj-06694-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
4 4 1 pgs REPORT COMMENCING CRIMINAL ACTION as to Defendant Myah Ofeibia Saakwa-Mante; defendants Year of Birth: 2004; date of arrest: 11/2/2024 (jb) [2:24-mj-06694-DUTY]
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs MINUTES OF INITIAL APPEARANCE ON LOCAL COMPLAINT held before Magistrate Judge Stephanie S. Christensen as to Defendant Myah Ofeibia Saakwa-Mante. Court issues Order under Fed. R. Crim. P. 5(f) concerning prosecutor's disclosure obligations; see General Order 21-02 (written order). Defendant arraigned and advised of the charges. Defendant states true name as charged. Attorney: Rebecca Kathleen Harris for Myah Ofeibia Saakwa-Mante, Deputy Federal Public Defender, present. Court orders defendant temporarily detained. Defendant remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal. Preliminary Hearing set for 11/19/2024 11:30 AM before Duty Magistrate Judge. Post-Indictment Arraignment set for 11/25/2024 11:30 AM before Duty Magistrate Judge. Detention Hearing set for 11/12/2024 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Stephanie S. Christensen in courtroom 790. Court Smart: CS 11/5/2024. (jb) [2:24-mj-06694-DUTY]
Related: [-]
6 6 1 pgs NOTICE DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO APPEAR for Preliminary Hearing and Arraignment on Indictment/Information. Defendant Myah Ofeibia Saakwa-Mante is directed to appear for Preliminary Hearing on November 19, 2024 at 11:30 am and for Post Indictment Arraignment on November 25, 2024 at 11:30 am before the Duty Magistrate Judge. (jb) [2:24-mj-06694-DUTY]
Related: [-]
7 7 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT filed as to Defendant Myah Ofeibia Saakwa-Mante. ( Not for Public View pursuant to the E-Government Act of 2002) (jb) [2:24-mj-06694-DUTY]
Related: [-]
8 8 2 pgs ADVISEMENT OF STATUTORY & CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS filed by Defendant Myah Ofeibia Saakwa-Mante. (jb) [2:24-mj-06694-DUTY]
Related: [-]
9 9 1 pgs ADVISEMENT OF STATUTORY & CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS filed by Defendant Myah Ofeibia Saakwa-Mante. (jb) [2:24-mj-06694-DUTY]
Related: [-]
10 10 1 pgs DECLARATION RE: PASSPORT filed by Defendant Myah Ofeibia Saakwa-Mante, declaring that I am unable to locate my passport(s) or other travel document(s). If I locate any passport or other travel document issued to me, I will immediately surrender it to the U.S. Pretrial Services Agency. I will not apply for a passport or other travel document during the pendency of this case. (jb) [2:24-mj-06694-DUTY]
Related: [-]
11 11 1 pgs ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION Pending Hearing Pursuant to Bail Reform Act by Magistrate Judge Stephanie S. Christensen as to Defendant Myah Ofeibia Saakwa-Mante. Pending hearing, the defendant shall be held in custody by the U. S. Marshal and produced for the hearing. Detention Hearing set for 11/12/2024 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Stephanie S. Christensen. (jb) [2:24-mj-06694-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
12 12 1 pgs MINUTES OF Detention Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Stephanie S. Christensen as to Defendant Myah Ofeibia Saakwa-Mante. Government's request for detention is: GRANTED. The Court Orders the defendant permanently detained. Court Smart: 11/12/2024. (jb) [2:24-mj-06694-DUTY]
Related: [-]
13 13 2 pgs MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephanie S. Christensen: ORDER OF DETENTION as to Defendant Myah Ofeibia Saakwa-Mante. (jb) [2:24-mj-06694-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
14 14 3 pgs INDICTMENT Filed as to Myah Ofeibia Saakwa-Mante (1) count(s) 1. Offense occurred in LA. (mhe)
Related: [-]
15 15 2 pgs CASE SUMMARY filed by AUSA Jason A Gorn as to Defendant Myah Ofeibia Saakwa-Mante; defendants Year of Birth: 2004 (mhe)
Related: [-]