Colorado District Court
Judge:Robert E Blackburn
Case #: 1:24-cv-03229
Nature of Suit150 Contract - Recovery of Overpayment & Enforcement of Judgment
Cause9:9 Motion to Confirm Arbitration
Case Filed:Nov 21, 2024
Terminated:Feb 27, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Jan 05, 2025 2:02 AM MST
Petitioner
Alpine Advance 5 LLC
Represented By
Shawn Michael Grady
Shawn M. Grady Pllc, Law Firm Of
contact info
Respondent
Aerowood Property Management LLC
Respondent
Elberta Pricilla Reimer


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Thursday, February 27, 2025
20 20 order Judgment - Default Thu 02/27 4:53 PM
DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Alpine Advance 5 LLC against Aerowood Property Management LLC, Elberta Pricilla Reimer pursuant to the19 Order Granting Motion for Default Judgment. Entered by Clerk on 2/27/2025. (hguer)
Related: [-]
19 19 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Default Judgment Thu 02/27 4:49 PM
ORDER Granting18 Motion for Default Judgment. Entered by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 2/27/2025. (hguer)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
18 18 motion Default Judgment Tue 02/04 4:43 PM
Final MOTION for Default Judgment as to Aerowood Property Managegment, LLC et al by Petitioner Alpine Advance 5 LLC.(Grady, Shawn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration of Josh Greenblat,
Att: 2 Exhibit Agreement 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit Agreement 2,
Att: 4 Exhibit Final Arbitration Award,
Att: 5 Exhibit Declaration of Shawn M. Grady,
Att: 6 Exhibit Return of Service of Aerowood,
Att: 7 Exhibit Return of Service of Reimer,
Att: 8 Exhibit Federal Interest Rate,
Att: 9 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Judgment Confirming Final Arbitration Award
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
17 17 1 pgs order Order Wed 01/29 11:13 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 29 January 2025. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Scheduling Conference set for 10:30 a.m. on February 5, 2025, is VACATED. (cmadr, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
16 16 order Clerks Entry of Default Tue 01/28 2:50 PM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Aerowood Property Management LLC & Elberta Pricilla Reimer re15 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Aerowood Property Management, LLC, et al , by Clerk. Text Only Entry (cmadr, )
Related: [-]
Monday, January 20, 2025
15 15 motion Entry of Default Mon 01/20 6:11 AM
MOTION for Entry of Default as to Aerowood Property Management, LLC, et al by Petitioner Alpine Advance 5 LLC.(Grady, Shawn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration of Shawn M. Grady,
Att: 2 Exhibit Military Status Report
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
14 14 order Order on Motion for Default Judgment Wed 01/15 4:27 PM
ORDER denying without prejudice10 Motion for Default Judgment. In this circuit, a motion for default judgment under Rule 55(b) must be preceded by a clerk's entry of default under Rule 55(a). See Williams v. Smithson, 1995 WL 365988 at *1 (10th Cir. June 20, 1995) (noting Rule 55 mandates a two-step process for a party who seeks a default judgment in his favor.); see also Garrett v. Seymour, 2007 WL 549388 at *2 (10th Cir. Feb. 23, 2007) (describing clerks entry of default under Rule 55(a) as a prerequisite for the entry of a default judgment under Rule 55(b)). Thus, plaintiff must first file a motion asking the clerk to make entry of default, following which, it may file a separate motion seeking default judgment. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 1/15/2025. Text Only Entry Related [+]
Related: [-] bsec
13 13 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Wed 01/15 4:21 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella: IT IS ORDERED that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a)and (b), this matter is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge:(1) To convene a scheduling conference under FED. R. CIV. P. 16(b), enter a SchedulingOrder that satisfies the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, and enter such orders asappropriate to enforce the Scheduling order and resolve discovery matters; provided, furtherthat the scheduling conference, the Magistrate Judge shall advise the parties of JudgeBlackburns practice standards found at www.cod.uscourts.gov.;(2) To hear and finally determine non-dispositive matters that have been referred,subject to the exceptions found in 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A); and(3) To hear and make recommendations on dispositive matters that have been referredas defined in 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A).Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLOLCivR 16.6. Onthe recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the partiesby motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, asettlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 1/15/2025. Text Only Entry Related [+]
Related: [-] bsec
12 12 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Wed 01/15 10:48 AM
Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 15 January 2025. Plaintiff has filed a Motion for Default Judgment10 . See D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(3)(a) (mandating reassignment from a magistrate judge to a district judge in actions in which a motion for default judgment is filed). Accordingly,IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case shall be assigned to a District Judge under D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(3)(a) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(a).(Case randomly reassigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn for all further proceedings. All future pleadings shall be designated: 24-cv-03229-REB.) (cmadr, )
Related: [-]
11 11 2 pgs motion Judgment Wed 01/15 9:59 AM
JUDGMENT CONFIRMING FINAL ARBITRATION AWARD as to Aerowood Property Managegment, LLC et al by Petitioner Alpine Advance 5 LLC. (Grady, Shawn) Modified on 1/15/2025 to terminate Motion and Correct Title at the request of Chambers (norlin, )
Related: [-]
10 10 10 pgs motion Default Judgment Wed 01/15 9:20 AM
Final MOTION for Default Judgment as to Aerowood Property Managegment, LLC et al by Petitioner Alpine Advance 5 LLC.(Grady, Shawn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration of Josh Greenblat,
Att: 2 Exhibit Agreement 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit Agreement 2,
Att: 4 Exhibit Final Arbitration Award,
Att: 5 Exhibit Declaration of Shawn M. Grady,
Att: 6 Exhibit Return of Service of Aerowood,
Att: 7 Exhibit Return of Service of Reimer,
Att: 8 Exhibit Federal Interest Rate
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
9 9 3 pgs order Order Tue 01/07 2:42 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 7 January 2025. Proposed Scheduling Order due 1/29/2025. Scheduling Conference set for 2/5/2025 10:30 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella. (cmadr, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Continuation of Main Document,
Att: 2 Continuation of Main Document
Thursday, December 19, 2024
8 8 service Affidavit/Return of Service - Executed - Complaint Thu 12/19 4:14 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alpine Advance 5 LLC. Elberta Pricilla Reimer served on 12/17/2024, answer due 1/7/2025. (Grady, Shawn)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Affidavit/Return of Service - Executed - Complaint Thu 12/19 4:10 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alpine Advance 5 LLC. Aerowood Property Management LLC served on 12/17/2024, answer due 1/7/2025. (Grady, Shawn)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
6 6 misc Summons Issued Fri 11/22 8:39 AM
SUMMONSES issued by Clerk. (dgumb, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
5 5 notice Notice (Other) Thu 11/21 11:40 AM
NOTICE of Petitioner Alpine Advance 5 LLC's Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Petitioner Alpine Advance 5 LLC (Grady, Shawn)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Summons Request Thu 11/21 9:49 AM
SUMMONS REQUEST as to Aerowood Property Management LLC and Elberta Pricilla Reimer by Petitioner Alpine Advance 5 LLC. (Grady, Shawn)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Magistrate Judge Consent Form Thu 11/21 8:28 AM
Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (efoga, )
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Case Assigned to Judge Thu 11/21 8:28 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella. Text Only Entry (efoga, )
Related: [-]
1 1 5 pgs cmp Petition/Application Thu 11/21 8:03 AM
PETITION To Confirm Arbitration Award And For Entry Of Judgment (Filing fee $ 405, Receipt Number ACODC-9996558)Attorney Shawn Michael Grady added to party Alpine Advance 5 LLC(pty:pet), filed by Alpine Advance 5 LLC.(Grady, Shawn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 7 pgs Exhibit,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet