Texas Southern District Court
Judge:David Hittner
Case #: 4:24-cv-04592
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000 Job Discrimination
Case Filed:Nov 21, 2024
Terminated:Mar 11, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday May 20, 2025 3:45 AM CDT
Defendant
Cognizant Technology Solutions
211 Quality Circle
College Station, TX 77845
Represented By
Kimberly Frances Cheeseman
Norton Rose Fulbright Us LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Whitney Anthony Lindie
563 W Bay Area Blvd
Webster, TX 77598


Docket last updated: 11/21/2024 12:40 PM CST
Thursday, November 21, 2024
Referral Judge Selected: Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo randomly selected to receive referrals. The selected Magistrate Judge is not assigned to this case until a District Judge refers the case or a motion or the parties consent to jurisdiction of the Magistrate Judge. Once a referral has been made, the name of the referral judge will appear at the top of the docket sheet. (dm4)
Related: [-]
Confirmation of receipt of payment from Whitney Lindie in the amount of $ 405.00 re:1 Complaint. Receipt date: 11/21/2024. Receipt number 400009686. Purpose Description: Civil Filing Fee. (dm4)
Related: [-]
1 1 10 pgs COMPLAINT against Cognizant Technology Solutions filed by Whitney Anthony Lindie. (dm4)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 EEOC Letter
2 2 MOTION Access to Pacer e-file System by Whitney Anthony Lindie, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/12/2024. (dm4)
Related: [-]
3 3 CLERKS NOTICE Regarding Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. Parties notified, filed. (dm4)
Related: [-]