California Northern District Court
Judge:Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Case #: 4:24-cv-08237
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Nov 21, 2024
Case in other court:IN RE: SOCIAL MEDIA ADOLESCENT ADDICTION/PERSONAL, 4:22-md-03047
Last checked: Sunday Jan 05, 2025 1:39 AM PST
Defendant
Instagram, LLC
Defendant
YouTube, LLC
Defendant
TikTok Ltd.
Defendant
TikTok LLC
Defendant
TikTok Inc.
Defendant
Snap, Inc.
Defendant
Siculus, Inc.
Defendant
Meta Platforms, Inc.
Defendant
Meta Payments Inc.
Defendant
Google, LLC
Defendant
Facebook Payments, Inc.
Defendant
Facebook Operations, LLC
Defendant
Facebook Holdings, LLC
Defendant
Bytedance Ltd.
Defendant
Bytedance Inc.
Plaintiff
Hamilton Central School District
Represented By
Austin P. Brane
Wagstaff & Cartmell LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 01/07 11:05 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hamilton Central School District. Bytedance Inc. served on 11/25/2024, answer due 12/16/2024; Bytedance Ltd. served on 11/25/2024, answer due 12/16/2024; Facebook Holdings, LLC served on 11/25/2024, answer due 12/16/2024; Facebook Operations, LLC served on 11/25/2024, answer due 12/16/2024; Facebook Payments, Inc. served on 11/25/2024, answer due 12/16/2024; Google, LLC served on 11/25/2024, answer due 12/16/2024; Instagram, LLC served on 11/25/2024, answer due 12/16/2024; Meta Payments Inc. served on 11/25/2024, answer due 12/16/2024; Meta Platforms, Inc. served on 11/25/2024, answer due 12/16/2024; Siculus, Inc. served on 11/25/2024, answer due 12/16/2024; Snap, Inc. served on 11/25/2024, answer due 12/16/2024; TikTok Inc. served on 11/25/2024, answer due 12/16/2024; TikTok LLC served on 11/25/2024, answer due 12/16/2024; TikTok Ltd. served on 11/25/2024, answer due 12/16/2024; YouTube, LLC served on 11/25/2024, answer due 12/16/2024. (Brane, Austin)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Mon 11/25 12:02 PM
Summons Issued as to Bytedance Inc., Bytedance Ltd., Facebook Holdings, LLC, Facebook Operations, LLC, Facebook Payments, Inc., Google, LLC, Instagram, LLC, Meta Payments Inc., Meta Platforms, Inc., Siculus, Inc., Snap, Inc., TikTok Inc., TikTok LLC, TikTok Ltd., YouTube, LLC. (kmg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
3 3 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Thu 11/21 10:02 AM
Case assigned to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Thu 11/21 9:09 AM
Proposed Summons. (Brane, Austin)
Related: [-]
1 1 5 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 11/21 9:09 AM
COMPLAINT against Bytedance Inc., Bytedance Ltd., Facebook Holdings, LLC, Facebook Operations, LLC, Facebook Payments, Inc., Google, LLC, Instagram, LLC, Meta Payments Inc., Meta Platforms, Inc., Siculus, Inc., Snap, Inc., TikTok Inc., TikTok LLC, TikTok Ltd., YouTube, LLC ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-20071278.). Filed by Hamilton Central School District.(Brane, Austin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility MDL Member Case Mon 11/25 11:56 AM
MEMBER CASE OPENED: MDL 3047 Opened in California Northern District 4:24-cv-08237-YGR Hamilton Central School District v. Meta Platforms, Inc. et al cc: JPMDL (kmg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]