Florida Northern District Court
Judge:Allen C Winsor
Referred: Martin A Fitzpatrick
Case #: 4:24-cv-00470
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Nov 21, 2024
Case in other court:Second Judicial Circuit in and for Leon County, FL, 2024-CA-001179
Last checked: Tuesday May 20, 2025 4:32 AM EDT
Defendant
FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Represented By
ASHLEA A EDWARDS
Grayrobinson Pa - Jacksonville Fl
contact info
FABIAN A RUIZ
Ruiz Trial Law Pllc - Miami Fl
contact info
ANDRES JESUS GARCIA
Grayrobinson Pa - Miami Fl
contact info
Plaintiff
JOPHIA WATTS
Represented By
THOMAS L DICKENS, III
Mattox Law Firm - Tallahassee Fl
contact info
MARIE A MATTOX
Mattox Law Firm - Tallahassee Fl
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
RICKY DIXON
Terminated: 01/29/2025
Represented By
FABIAN A RUIZ
Ruiz Trial Law Pllc - Miami Fl
contact info
ANDRES JESUS GARCIA
Grayrobinson Pa - Miami Fl
contact info


Docket last updated: 78 minutes ago
Monday, May 19, 2025
27 27 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 05/19 11:16 AM
ORDER REQUIRING EXPEDITED RESPONSE re 25 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. (Defendant's response due no later than 5/22/2025) . Signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 5/19/2025. (kdm)
Related: [-]
26 26 misc Notice of Mediation re Scheduling Mon 05/19 10:23 AM
NOTICE OF MEDIATION re Scheduling on May 28, 2025, beginning at the hour of 10:00 a.m. ET by JOPHIA WATTS (MATTOX, MARIE) Modified on 5/19/2025 to edit title (kdm)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 16, 2025
25 25 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Fri 05/16 10:20 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by JOPHIA WATTS. (DICKENS, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
24 24 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney Fri 05/16 10:34 AM
ORDER GRANTING 23 MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL. Attorney FABIAN A RUIZ terminated. Signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 5/16/2025. The clerk will remove him from the CM/ECF distribution list. Substitute counsel has appeared. (kdm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 15, 2025
23 23 motion Withdraw as Attorney Substitute Attorney Thu 05/15 3:24 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Withdraw and Substitute Counsel , MOTION to Substitute Attorney by FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS. (EDWARDS, ASHLEA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
22 22 order Pretrial Order Wed 05/07 4:06 PM
ORDER FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 5/7/25. Pretrial Stipulation due by 8/26/2025 . Pretrial Conference set for 9/2/2025 at 11:00 AM and Jury Trial set for 9/16/2025 at 08:30 AM , both in in the Joseph Woodrow Hatchett United States Courthouse and Federal Building, Courtroom 5 South, 111 North Adams Street, Tallahassee, Florida before JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR. (tss)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
4 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (RUIZ, FABIAN)
Related: [-]
3 3 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Counsel Is Advised By This Entry, That A Civil Cover Sheet Should Be Filed As A Separate Entry Using The Event Selection "Civil Cover Sheet" Which Is Found Under "Other Filings" Under "Other Documents". Please Re-File The Civil Cover Sheet. (tss)
Related: [-]
2 2 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: The parties in the above-referenced case were added to the docket incorrectly and will be corrected by the clerk. Party names are to be entered in all caps and without punctuation. For future reference, please review the procedure for adding/creating new parties in the "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing" and/or chapter 10 of the "CM/ECF Attorney User's Guide," available at www.flnd.uscourts.gov. (tss)
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, RICKY DIXON from Second Judicial Circuit in and for Leon County, FL, case number 2024-CA-001179. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AFLNDC-9146871.), filed by FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, RICKY DIXON. (RUIZ, FABIAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - State Court File,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet