New Jersey District Court
Judge:Edward S Kiel
Referred: Elizabeth A Pascal
Case #: 1:24-cv-10642
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Nov 21, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday May 20, 2025 5:06 AM EDT
Cross Claimant
HARRAH'S ATLANTIC CITY OPERATING COMPANY, LLC
Represented By
DAMIAN S. JACKSON
Reilly, Mcdevitt & Henrich, P.C.
contact info
Cross Defendant
ABC CORP. 1-10
Cross Defendant
JOHN DOES 1-10
Defendant
JOHN DOES 1-10
Defendant
ABC CORP. 1-10
Defendant
HARRAH'S ATLANTIC CITY OPERATING COMPANY, LLC
Represented By
DAMIAN S. JACKSON
Reilly, Mcdevitt & Henrich, P.C.
contact info
Notice Only
arbtre
Plaintiff
JONITA BEISGEN
10840 E. Reginald Avenue
Mesa, AZ 85212
Represented By
R. SCOTT FAHRNEY, JR
Semeraro & Fahrney, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
WILLIAM BEISGEN
10840 E. Reginald Avenue
Mesa, AZ 85212
Represented By
R. SCOTT FAHRNEY, JR
Semeraro & Fahrney, LLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
CAESARS ENTERTAINMENT, INC.
Terminated: 01/08/2025
Defendant
VICI PROPERTIES, INC.
Terminated: 01/08/2025


Docket last updated: 69 minutes ago
Monday, March 17, 2025
22 22 order Protective Order Mon 03/17 3:10 PM
VIDEO PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal on 3/17/2025. (sms2)
Related: [-]
21 21 misc Proposed Order Mon 03/17 10:07 AM
Proposed Order Video Protective Order by HARRAH'S ATLANTIC CITY OPERATING COMPANY, LLC. (JACKSON, DAMIAN)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
20 20 misc Letter Fri 03/14 10:02 AM
Letter from R Scott Fahrney. (FAHRNEY, R.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
19 19 order Scheduling Order Thu 03/06 4:10 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER IN ARBITRATION CASE: Telephone Status Conference set for 6/2/2025 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal. Counsel shall dial 1-856-210-8988, access code 270032053# to connect to the call. Amended Pleadings due by 5/19/2025. Pretrial Factual Discovery due by 8/18/2025. Dispositive Motions due by 1/16/2026. The Clerk shall schedule arbitration for a date in January 2026. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal on 3/5/2025. (kes, )
Related: [-]
minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Wed 03/05 1:49 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 3/5/2025. (bda)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
18 18 order Order Wed 02/26 11:41 AM
TEXT ORDER: The Court RESCHEDULES the initial conference on February 26, 2025 to March 5, 2025, at 11:00 a.m. in Camden- Room 2040 . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal on 2/26/2025. (bda)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
17 17 misc Letter Tue 02/25 6:54 PM
Letter from R. Scott Fahrney. (FAHRNEY, R.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
16 16 discov Joint Discovery Plan Tue 02/18 11:47 AM
Joint Discovery Plan by HARRAH'S ATLANTIC CITY OPERATING COMPANY, LLC.(JACKSON, DAMIAN)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
15 15 order Order Thu 02/06 2:50 PM
TEXT ORDER: The Court has reviewed the parties' Joint Discovery Plans ("JDP") filed on the docket, ECF Nos. 13, 14. The Court notes that the JDPs contain different discovery deadlines and descriptions. The Court is unable to determine what the parties' proposed discovery deadlines are based on these submissions. No later than February 21, 2025 , the parties shall submit their final Joint Discovery Plan to the Court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal on 2/6/2025. (bda)
Related: [-]
14 14 discov Joint Discovery Plan Thu 02/06 11:46 AM
Joint Discovery Plan by HARRAH'S ATLANTIC CITY OPERATING COMPANY, LLC.(JACKSON, DAMIAN)
Related: [-]
13 13 discov Joint Discovery Plan Thu 02/06 11:34 AM
Joint Discovery Plan by HARRAH'S ATLANTIC CITY OPERATING COMPANY, LLC.(JACKSON, DAMIAN)
Related: [-]
qc QC - Document Not Signed by Attorney Thu 02/06 11:27 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Joint Proposed Discovery Plan12 submitted by DAMIAN JACKSON on 2/5/2025 did not contain a proper electronic signature for Plaintiff's counsel. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENT WITH THE PROPER ELECTRONIC SIGNATURE (s/ Attorney's Name.) This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (mag)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
12 12 discov Joint Discovery Plan Wed 02/05 1:02 PM
Joint Discovery Plan by HARRAH'S ATLANTIC CITY OPERATING COMPANY, LLC.(JACKSON, DAMIAN)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
11 11 6 pgs order Order Initial Scheduling Conference (Camden) Mon 01/27 9:21 AM
Order Initial Conference set for 2/26/2025 at 10:00 AM in Camden - Room 2040 before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal on 01/27/2025. (aji, )
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
10 10 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Crossclaim Fri 01/24 4:12 PM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against ABC CORP. 1-10, JOHN DOES 1-10 by HARRAH'S ATLANTIC CITY OPERATING COMPANY, LLC.(JACKSON, DAMIAN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
9 9 order Stipulation and Order Fri 01/10 11:09 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time to Answer: Time to respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint is hereby extended to January 8, 2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal on 1/8/2025. (sms2)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Stipulation and Order Fri 01/10 11:05 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER AMENDING CAPTION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal on 1/8/2025. (sms2)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Stipulation Wed 01/08 2:01 PM
STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer by HARRAHS RESORT ATLANTIC CITY, VICI PROPERTIES, INC., CAESARS ENTERTAINMENT, INC.. (JACKSON, DAMIAN)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Stipulation Wed 01/08 2:00 PM
STIPULATION to Amend Caption by HARRAHS RESORT ATLANTIC CITY, VICI PROPERTIES, INC., CAESARS ENTERTAINMENT, INC.. (JACKSON, DAMIAN)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
5 5 misc Affidavit Mon 12/30 1:46 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service on Defendants Harrahs, Caesar's, & Vici Properties by JONITA BEISGEN, WILLIAM BEISGEN.(FAHRNEY, R.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Service,
Att: 2 Affidavit of Service,
Att: 3 Affidavit of Service,
Att: 4 Affidavit of Service,
Att: 5 Affidavit of Service,
Att: 6 Affidavit of Service
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
4 4 13 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Tue 11/26 4:33 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against ABC CORP. 1-10, CAESARS ENTERTAINMENT, INC., HARRAHS RESORT ATLANTIC CITY, JOHN DOES 1-10, VICI PROPERTIES, INC., filed by WILLIAM BEISGEN, JONITA BEISGEN.(FAHRNEY, R.)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
3 3 misc Diversity Disclosure Statement Fri 11/22 1:53 PM
Diversity Disclosure Statement by JONITA BEISGEN, WILLIAM BEISGEN. (FAHRNEY, R.) (Main Document 3 replaced on 11/22/2024) (mag)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 11/22 1:03 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to CAESARS ENTERTAINMENT, INC., HARRAHS RESORT ATLANTIC CITY, VICI PROPERTIES, INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mag)
Related: [-]
qc QC - Attorney Case Opening Fri 11/22 12:57 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Cause of Action, Party Information: Enter party names exactly how they appear on the Complaint; Addresses of Defendants should NOT appear on the docket . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (mag)
Related: [-]
misc QC - Generic Message Fri 11/22 1:00 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - When the Complaint1 was filed by JONITA BEISGEN and WILLIAM BEISGEN, the against "All Plaintiffs" button was selected causing the Plaintiffs to file the Complaint against itself. The Clerk has made the appropriate changes, however, in the future please select each party individually while holding the Control (Ctrl) button. This message is for informational purposes only. (mag)
Related: [-]
qc QC - Blank Diversity Disclosure Statement Fri 11/22 1:01 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2), unless the Court orders otherwise, in any action filed or removed to this Court, in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity under 28 U.S.C. 1332(a), a party or intervenor must file a disclosure statement naming and identifying the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. A party, intervenor or proposed intervenor must file the disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court.[LINK:Click here] to complete the Diversity Disclosure Statement, once complete, file it using the event Diversity Disclosure Statement. (mag)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Judicial Preferences Fri 11/22 1:04 PM
Notice of Judicial Preferences.[LINK:Click here] for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (mag)
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred to Arbitration Fri 11/22 1:05 PM
CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (mag)
Related: [-]
qc QC - Fillable PDF Fri 11/22 3:34 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Diversity Disclosure Statement3 filed by JONITA BEISGEN and WILLIAM BEISGEN on 11/22/2024 was uploaded prior to being flattened. Before uploading fillable forms to ECF you must flatten the file to prevent other users from manipulating or editing the information. The easiest way to flatten a PDF form is by selecting Print to PDF and saving the flattened form, other PDF software may differ. Please visit our[LINK:website] under Flattening PDF Forms for guidance. Your document has been corrected. This message is for informational purposes only. (mag)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
1 1 11 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 11/21 11:03 AM
COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15823302) with JURY DEMAND, filed by JONITA BEISGEN, WILLIAM BEISGEN.(FAHRNEY, R.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 11/21 9:28 PM
Judge Edward S. Kiel and Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal added. (dmw)
Related: [-]