WARNER v. O'MALLEY
North Carolina Middle District Court | |
Judge: | L Patrick Auld |
Referred: | L Patrick Auld |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00980 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:416 Denial of Social Security Benefits |
Case Filed: | Nov 21, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Tuesday, April 08, 2025 | ||
utility
Motions Referred
Tue 04/08 10:22 AM
Motions Referred: RE:8 Plaintiff's Dispositive Brief - Social Security Case by Plaintiff THOMAS WARNER, JR ,10 Defendant's Dispositive Brief - Social Security Case by Defendant MARTIN O'MALLEY ,11 Reply to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD (kg) |
||
Monday, April 07, 2025 | ||
11 | 11
![]() REPLY, filed by Plaintiff THOMAS WARNER, JR, to Response to8 Plaintiff's Dispositive Brief - Social Security Case by Plaintiff THOMAS WARNER, JR filed by THOMAS WARNER, JR. (CLAUSON, VAUGHN) |
|
Monday, March 24, 2025 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Defendant's Dispositive Brief - Social Security Case by Defendant MARTIN O'MALLEY Plaintiffs Reply Brief - SSA due by 4/7/2025. (LEACH, DAVID) |
|
notice
Notice of Appearance - Commissioner
Mon 03/24 4:27 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by DAVID LEACH on behalf of Defendant MARTIN O'MALLEY (LEACH, DAVID) |
||
Wednesday, February 26, 2025 | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Wed 02/26 1:15 PM
MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD no longer assigned to case as referral judge. (ww) |
||
utility
Case Reassigned
Wed 02/26 1:20 PM
Case Reassigned to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD as presider. UNASSIGNED no longer assigned to the case. See9 Order of Reference (ww) |
||
Tuesday, February 25, 2025 | ||
9 | 9
![]() ORDER of Reference to a United States Magistrate Judge signed by Chief/Senior District Judge CATHERINE C. EAGLES on 2/25/2025; that this case is referred to the presiding United States Magistrate Judge, the Honorable L. Patrick Auld or such other Magistrate Judge as may be assigned, to conduct all proceedings including a jury or nonjury trial, to order the entry of the judgment, and to conduct all post-judgment proceedings therein. It is further ORDERED that the Clerk shall file the written consents on the docket. (sh) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, February 24, 2025 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Plaintiff's Dispositive Brief - Social Security Case by Plaintiff THOMAS WARNER, JR Defendants Dispositive Brief - SSA due by 3/26/2025. (CLAUSON, VAUGHN) |
|
Friday, February 21, 2025 | ||
utility
Case Referred to Judge
Fri 02/21 4:23 PM
CASE REFERRED RE: Order of Reference to USMJ, to Chief/Senior District Judge CATHERINE C. EAGLES (ww) |
||
Thursday, January 23, 2025 | ||
7 | 7
![]() ORDER REQUIRING RESPONSE REGARDING REFERENCE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Because resolution of social security cases by a magistrate Judge on consent maintains the just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of these cases and results in a quicker resolution of the appeal than the report and recommendation process, the parties are encouraged to consider the consent option, and its time savings for litigants. IT IS ORDERED that counsel for each Party consult with their clients concerning the foregoing and complete and return the attached MDNC Form 85 within 30 days informing the Clerk's Office as to whether or not they consent to disposition by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Unrepresented parties must also return the form. Entered at the direction of the Chief Judge. (sh) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
6 | 6
![]() NOTICE to Parties in Social Security Case. Plaintiff's Dispositive Brief - SSA due by 2/24/2025. Defendant's Dispositive Brief - SSA due by 3/24/2025. Plaintiff's Reply Brief - SSA due by 4/7/2025. (sh) |
|
5 | 5
![]() SEALED Answer/Certified Administrative Record - Social Security Case filed by Defendant MARTIN O'MALLEY. The record is available in paper format at the Clerk's Office.(FELDMAN, WILLIAM) Modified on 1/23/2025 to remove incorrect filer. (sh) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Att: 8
![]() |
||
Att: 9
![]() |
||
Att: 10
![]() |
||
4 | 4
![]() NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney WILLIAM FELDMAN on behalf of Defendant MARTIN O'MALLEY (FELDMAN, WILLIAM) |
|
Monday, November 25, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
![]() ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS signed by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 11/25/2024; that Plaintiff in the above-entitled proceeding be, and is hereby, permitted to commence said proceeding in this Court without prepayment of fees or costs, or giving security therefor. See 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a). The Court will apply the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions under 42 U.S.C. § 405(g), effective December 1, 2022. The Clerk's office is directed to issue a Notice of Service pursuant to Rule 3 of the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions under 42 U.S.C. § 405(g). (sh) |
|
misc
Text Notice of Service in the Social Security Case
Mon 11/25 4:49 PM
Text Notice of Service in the Social Security Case Pursuant to the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions under 42 U.S.C. 405(g), Rule 3. The Clerk has issued a Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) using the Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system, notifying the appropriate Regional Social Security Administration Office of the General Counsel and the United States Attorney's Office of the case. No summonses shall issue. Answer due 60 days from filing on this notice. Answer/Certified Administrative Record due by 1/24/2025. (sh) |
||
Thursday, November 21, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
![]() MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by THOMAS WARNER, JR. (CLAUSON, VAUGHN) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against MARTIN O'MALLEY, filed by THOMAS WARNER, JR.(CLAUSON, VAUGHN) |
|
utility
Case Assigned
Thu 11/21 4:47 PM
Case ASSIGNED to UNASSIGNED and MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (sh) |
||
utility
Motions Referred
Thu 11/21 4:54 PM
Motion Referred: RE:2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (sh) |