New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Eric R Komitee
Case #: 1:24-cv-08105
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause08:1329 Writ of Mandamus to Adjudicate Visa Petiti
Case Filed:Nov 21, 2024
Terminated:Dec 04, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jan 05, 2025 4:14 AM EST
Defendant
Michael Borgen
Represented By
Vincent Lipari
United States Attorneys Office
contact info
Defendant
Joseph Cardinale
Represented By
Vincent Lipari
United States Attorneys Office
contact info
Defendant
US Attorney General Merrick Garland
US Department of Justice 950 Pennslvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530
Represented By
Vincent Lipari
United States Attorneys Office
contact info
Defendant
USCIS Director Ur M. Jaddou
Represented By
Vincent Lipari
United States Attorneys Office
contact info
Defendant
Secretary Alejandro Mayorkas
Represented By
Vincent Lipari
United States Attorneys Office
contact info
Defendant
Connie Nolan
Represented By
Vincent Lipari
United States Attorneys Office
contact info
Defendant
Christopher A. Wray
Director - F.B.I. 935 Pennsylvania Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20535
Represented By
Vincent Lipari
United States Attorneys Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Wengan Wu
Represented By
Henry Zhang
Zhang And Associates, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Wed 12/04 5:45 PM
Pursuant to the parties. Stipulation of Dismissal6 filed on December 3, 2024, this action is dismissed without prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs, expenses, and fees. The civil case is terminated. (APJ)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
6 6 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 12/03 11:50 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal without prejudice by Alejandro Mayorkas, Ur M. Jaddou, Connie Nolan, Michael Borgen, Joseph Cardinale, Merrick Garland, Christopher A. Wray (Lipari, Vincent)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed as to USA Mon 12/02 3:38 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wengan Wu. Michael Borgen served on 11/29/2024, answer due 1/28/2025; Joseph Cardinale served on 11/29/2024, answer due 1/28/2025; Merrick Garland served on 11/29/2024, answer due 1/28/2025; Ur M. Jaddou served on 11/29/2024, answer due 1/28/2025; Alejandro Mayorkas served on 11/29/2024, answer due 1/28/2025; Connie Nolan served on 11/29/2024, answer due 1/28/2025; Christopher A. Wray served on 11/29/2024, answer due 1/28/2025. (Zhang, Henry)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Proof of delivery,
Att: 2 Supplement Certified mail reciepts
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 11/27 2:26 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent Lipari on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Lipari, Vincent)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
order Order to Show Cause Electronic Service upon the US Attorneys Office Mon 11/25 4:25 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Upon the complaint for writ of mandamus filed November 21, 2024, it is ORDERED that: The United States Attorney, as attorney for Defendants/Respondents, is directed to show cause on or before January 21, 2025 in writing, why a writ of mandamus should not issue, and shall serve a copy of the response on Plaintiff, with proof of service to the Clerk of Court; On or before April 21, 2025, Plaintiff shall file the reply, if any, with proof of service to the Clerk of Court. Service of a copy of this Order, together with a copy of the complaint, shall be made by the Clerk of Court via electronic case filing, to the United States Attorney and by mailing a copy of this Order to the plaintiff. Electronic Service upon the US Attorneys Office1 Complaint filed by Wengan Wu. Ordered by Judge Eric R. Komitee on 11/25/2024. (APJ)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued as to USA Thu 11/21 5:00 PM
Summons Issued as to Michael Borgen, Joseph Cardinale, Merrick Garland, Ur M. Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, Connie Nolan, Christopher A. Wray, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (KD)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Thu 11/21 4:58 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (KD)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 11/21 3:48 PM
COMPLAINT against Michael Borgen, Joseph Cardinale, Merrick Garland, Ur M. Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, Connie Nolan, Christopher A. Wray filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-18519430 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Wengan WU. (Zhang, Henry)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A-H,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil cover sheet,
Att: 3 Proposed Summons proposed summons
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 11/21 4:58 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Eric R. Komitee. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (KD)
Related: [-]