Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Joseph F Leeson, Jr
Case #: 5:24-cv-06240
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Nov 21, 2024
Terminated:Jan 24, 2025
Case in other court:Court of Common Pleas of Northampton County, C-48-CV-24-10293
Last checked: Tuesday May 20, 2025 4:43 AM EDT
Defendant
PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By
ERIC JASON APPELBAUM
Forry Ullman
contact info
KATHLEEN PATRICIA DAPPER
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani
contact info
Kylee M Clark
Gordon Rees Scully & Mansukhani
contact info
Plaintiff
CARMIN TEJADA
Represented By
JOEL J. KOFSKY
Law Office Of Joel J. Kofsky
contact info
Plaintiff
MARIEL TEJADA
Represented By
JOEL J. KOFSKY
Law Office Of Joel J. Kofsky
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY
Terminated: 01/24/2025
Represented By
ERIC JASON APPELBAUM
Forry Ullman
contact info
KATHLEEN PATRICIA DAPPER
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani
contact info
Kylee M Clark
Gordon Rees Scully & Mansukhani
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/21/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, January 24, 2025
10 10 2 pgs order Order Fri 01/24 1:05 PM
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS CARMIN TEJADA AND MARIEL TEJADA FILED A COMPLAINT IN THE COURT OF COMMON PLEAS OF NORTHAMPTON COUNTY, ASSERTING CLAIMS FOR UNDERINSURED MOTORIST BENEFITS, BREACH OF CONTRACT, AND BAD FAITH AGAINST PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY; PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY ISSUED THE INSURANCE POLICY TO CARMIN M. TEJADA; PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY PROPERLY REMOVED THE LAWSUIT TO THIS COURT ON NOVEMBER 21, 2024; SUBSEQUENT TO THE REMOVAL, PLAINTIFFS HAVE CLARIFIED THAT THEY DO NOT SEEK DAMAGES IN EXCESS OF $75,000; PLAINTIFFS DAMAGES SHALL NOT EVER EXCEED $74,999.99, AND ANY VERDICT, JUDGMENT, OR AWARD WILL, IF NECESSARY, BE MOLDED, AMENDED, OR MODIFIED SO THAT THE TOTAL MAXIMUM AMOUNT OF COMPENSATORY AND UNLIQUIDATED DAMAGES AWARDED TO PLAINTIFFS CARMIN TEJADA AND MARIEL TEJADA CAN AND SHALL BE $74,999.99; PLAINTIFFS HAVE AGREED TO DISMISS THE BAD FAITH CLAIM, WITHOUT PREJUDICE; COUNT III FO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT IS HEREBY DISMISSED, WITHOUR PREJUDICE; THE CAPTION SHALL BE AMENDED TO READ CARMIN TEJADA AND MARIEL TEJADA V. PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY; AND THIS CASE SHALL BE REMANDED TO THE COURT OF COMMON PLEAS OF NORTHAMPTON COUNTY. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 1/24/25. 1/24/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas)
Related: [-]
misc Remark Thu 02/06 10:04 AM
Copy of Doc. 10 sent to and case remanded to CCP Northampton County. (mas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
9 9 misc Stipulation Wed 01/22 5:21 PM
STIPULATION to Cap Damages, Dismiss Bad Faith, Correct Caption, and Remand by PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY. (DAPPER, KATHLEEN)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2024
8 8 notice Notice of Hearing Fri 12/27 4:07 PM
NOTICE OF SCHEDULING OF INITIAL FED.R.CIV.P. 16 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: AN INITIAL FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 16 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE HAS BEEN SCHEDULED FOR TUESDAY, JANUARY 28, 2025, AT 4:00 PM BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR. VIA TELEPHONE. PLAINTIFF COUNSEL IS ORDERED TO PROVIDE THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL WITH A TELEPHONE CONFERENCE CALL-IN NUMBER AND ACCESS CODE FOR THE CONFERENCE.(dja)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 12/18 2:36 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by ERIC JASON APPELBAUM on behalf of PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY with Jury Demand and Certification of Service(APPELBAUM, ERIC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 11/27 11:56 AM
ANSWER to Complaint by PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY.(Clark, Kylee)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service
Friday, November 22, 2024
5 5 3 pgs order Order Fri 11/22 9:58 AM
INITIAL PROCEDURAL ORDER. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 11/22/24. 11/22/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Thu 11/21 4:22 PM
Summons Issued as to PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY. Forwarded To: Counsel on November 21, 2024. (dt)
Related: [-]
3 3 discov Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 Thu 11/21 3:01 PM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Progressive Advanced Insurance Company, Progressive Direct Holdings, Inc., The Progressive Corporation by PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY.(DAPPER, KATHLEEN)
Related: [-]
2 2 discov Disclosure of Citizenship Thu 11/21 3:00 PM
Disclosure of Citizenship in Diversity Cases by PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY . (DAPPER, KATHLEEN)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal (Attorney) Thu 11/21 2:57 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17897282), filed by PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY.(DAPPER, KATHLEEN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 7 Designation Form,
Att: 8 Certificate of Service