Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:24-bk-33176

Oregon Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Teresa H Pearson
Case #: 3:24-ap-03065
Nature of Suit63 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(8), student loan
Case Filed:Nov 20, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
US Department of Education
Office of General Counsel 400 Maryland Ave SW
Washington, DC 20202
Represented By
US Department of Education
contact info
Plaintiff
Gregory Keaton Twiss
3340 SE Morrison St., #426
Portland, OR 97214
Represented By
BRADLEY LAUGHLIN
Olsendaines
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 1:06 PM PDT
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
12 12 court CHAP ME Pretrial Hearing Continued/Held - CHAP Tue 05/06 1:42 PM
Record of Proceeding Re Pretrial Hearing Held. Continued Pretrial Hearing Set for 06/03/2025 at 10:30 AM by Telephone - THP Dial (855) 244-8681, Enter Meeting ID 2303 266 1826#. (dsg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
11 11 court CHAP ME Pretrial Hearing Continued/Held - CHAP Fri 04/11 9:41 AM
Record of Proceeding Re Pretrial Hearing Held. Continued Pretrial Hearing Set for 05/06/2025 at 10:30 AM by Telephone - THP Dial (855) 244-8681, Enter Meeting ID 2303 266 1826#. (dsg)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
10 10 notice Notice Mon 03/24 9:34 AM
Notice Compensation Filed By Plaintiff Gregory Keaton Twiss (LAUGHLIN, BRADLEY)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
9 9 court CHAP ME Pretrial Hearing Continued/Held - CHAP Tue 03/11 4:16 PM
Record of Proceeding Re Pretrial Hearing Held. Continued Pretrial Hearing Set for 04/10/2025 at 01:30 PM by Telephone - THP Dial (855) 244-8681, Enter Meeting ID 2303 266 1826#. (dsg)
Related: [-]
Sunday, February 02, 2025
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Generic Sun 02/02 9:10 PM
Certificate of Notice Re:7 Correction Notice Re:6 Continued Pretrial Hearing Set for 03/11/2025 at 10:30 AM by Telephone. (dsg). (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
7 7 court Correction Notice - New Fri 01/31 8:38 AM
Correction Notice Re:6 Continued Pretrial Hearing Set for 03/11/2025 at 10:30 AM by Telephone. (dsg)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
6 6 court CHAP ME Pretrial Hearing Continued/Held - CHAP Mon 12/30 2:28 PM
Record of Proceeding Re Pretrial Hearing Held. Continued Pretrial Hearing Set for 03/11/2025 at 10:30 AM by Telephone - THP Dial (855) 244-8681, Enter Meeting ID 2305 356 8654#. (bls)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
5 5 misc Statement re Party's Address (Requires LBF ADV-A - 12/1/24) Thu 12/12 9:38 AM
Statement re Party's Address Filed By Defendant US Department of Education (DELORENZO-LAWLEY, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 12/12 9:36 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by US Department of Education (DELORENZO-LAWLEY, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed [May use LBF 305 12/1/19] Fri 11/22 10:40 AM
Summons Served on US Department of Education 11/22/2024. (LAUGHLIN, BRADLEY)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
2 2 court Summons Issued Wed 11/20 2:09 PM
Summons Issued for service on US Department of Education1 Complaint Pretrial Hearing Set for 12/30/2024 at 01:30 PM in/by Telephone Hearing - THP Dial (855) 244-8681, Enter Meeting ID 2305 356 8654#. (krw)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 11/20 1:36 PM
Adversary case 24-03065 Complaint by Gregory Keaton Twiss against US Department of Education. Filing Fee Exempt. Nature of Suit:(63 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(8), student loan))(LAUGHLIN, BRADLEY)
Related: [-]