Kentucky Western District Court
Judge:David J Hale
Case #: 3:24-cv-00684
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:501 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Nov 21, 2024
Terminated:Mar 26, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday May 20, 2025 4:59 AM EDT
Defendant
KCC, LLC
Represented By
Donovan Dwayne Gibbs, II
Stites & Harbison, Pllc - Louisville
contact info
Joel T. Beres
Stites & Harbison, Pllc - Louisville
contact info
Plaintiff
Global Weather Productions, LLC
Represented By
Craig B. Sanders
Sanders Law Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
16 16 1 pgs misc Copyright Report Wed 03/26 12:38 PM
Report on Determination of an Action Regarding a Copyright (DLW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Order of Dismissal
15 15 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Wed 03/26 12:27 PM
ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 3/26/2025: This action stands DISMISSED with prejudice and is CLOSED and STRICKEN from the Court's active docket. cc: Counsel (DLW)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
14 14 1 pgs notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 03/25 3:42 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Global Weather Productions, LLC (Sanders, Craig)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
13 13 2 pgs order Order on Proposed Agreed Order Wed 03/12 4:46 PM
AGREED ORDER EXTENDING RESPONSE DEADLINE Signed by Judge David J. Hale on 3/12/2025 granting12 Proposed Agreed Order. The parties shall have an extension of time until 4/17/2025 to complete settlement documents and file a Notice of Dismissal or for Defendant to respond to the Complaint. cc: Counsel (DLW)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
12 12 2 pgs motion Proposed Agreed Order Tue 03/11 10:18 AM
Proposed Agreed Order Extending Time to Respond or To Dismiss by KCC, LLC. (Beres, Joel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
11 11 2 pgs order Order on Proposed Agreed Order Thu 02/20 4:35 PM
AGREED ORDER EXTENDING RESPONSE DEADLINE Signed by Judge David J. Hale on 2/20/2025 granting10 Proposed Agreed Order. Defendant shall have an extension of time until 3/17/2025 to respond to the Complaint. cc: Counsel (DLW)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
10 10 motion Proposed Agreed Order Wed 02/12 11:54 AM
Proposed Agreed Order Extending Time to Respond by KCC, LLC. (Beres, Joel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
9 9 misc Corporate and/or Diversity Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) Wed 01/15 3:50 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)); filed by KCC, LLC. (Beres, Joel)
Related: [-]
8 8 2 pgs order Order on Proposed Agreed Order Wed 01/15 3:14 PM
AGREED ORDER EXTENDING RESPONSE DEADLINE Signed by Judge David J. Hale on 1/15/2025 granting7 Proposed Agreed Order. Defendant shall have an extension of time until 2/13/2025, to respond to the Complaint. cc: Counsel (DLW)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
7 7 motion Proposed Agreed Order Mon 01/13 3:35 PM
Proposed Agreed Order Extending Time to Respond by KCC, LLC. (Beres, Joel)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 01/13 8:30 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Global Weather Productions, LLC. KCC, LLC served on 12/20/2024, answer due 1/10/2025. (Sanders, Craig)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
5 5 misc Copyright Report Thu 11/21 4:12 PM
Report on the filing of an Action Regarding a Copyright(s) by Global Weather Productions, LLC. (DJT)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Thu 11/21 4:11 PM
Summons Issued as to KCC, LLC. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (DJT)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Corporate and/or Diversity Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) Thu 11/21 4:11 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)); filed by Global Weather Productions, LLC. (DJT)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Case Assignment Thu 11/21 4:10 PM
Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. (DJT)
Related: [-]
1 1 7 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 11/21 4:09 PM
COMPLAINT against KCC, LLC Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AKYWDC-4147569., filed by Global Weather Productions, LLC. (DJT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit Original Video,
Att: 3 1 pgs Exhibit Infringing Use of the Video