Washington Eastern District Court
Judge:Thomas O Rice
Case #: 2:24-cv-00397
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983pr Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Nov 21, 2024
Terminated:Dec 13, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, January 24, 2025
11 11 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Fri 01/24 10:50 AM
ORDER DENYING9 MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT. File remains CLOSED. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice. (TNC, Case Administrator) (Service of Notice on parties not registered as users of the Court CM/ECF system accomplished via USPS mail.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
10 10 misc Letter Thu 01/09 9:39 AM
Letter from Bradly M. Cunningham to United States District Court dated 1/7/2025. (TNC, Case Administrator)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Transmittal Envelope
Monday, January 06, 2025
9 9 motion Amend/Correct Thu 01/09 9:34 AM
MOTION to Amend1 Complaint by Bradly Morris Cunningham, Sr. Motion Hearing set for 2/10/2025 Without Oral Argument before Judge Thomas O. Rice.(TNC, Case Administrator)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed First Amended Complaint,
Att: 2 Transmittal Envelope
8 8 misc Letter Wed 01/08 10:46 AM
Letter from Bradly M. Cunningham to United States District Court dated 12/26/2024 and 1/2/2025. (TNC, Case Administrator) (TNC, Case Administrator)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Letter dated 1-2-25
Att: 2 (1/8/2025) Transmittal Envelope
Tuesday, December 31, 2024
7 7 misc Letter Fri 01/03 9:50 AM
Letter from Bradly M. Cunningham to United States District Court dated 12/26/2024. Pursuant to ECF No.5 letter forwarded to District of Oregon. (TNC, Case Administrator)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
6 6 misc Letter Wed 12/18 8:27 AM
Letter from Brad Cunningham to United States District Court dated 12/11/2024. Pursuant to ECF No.5 letter forwarded to District of Oregon. (TNC, Case Administrator)
Related: [-]
utility Remark Mon 12/16 11:25 AM
Remark - Case transferred from Eastern Washington has been opened in District of Oregon as case 3:24-cv-02073, filed 12/16/2024. (CLP, Case Administrator Team Lead)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
5 5 2 pgs order Order Transferring Case Out - District Transfer Fri 12/13 10:48 AM
ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO THE DISTRICT OF OREGON. File is CLOSED. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice. (SG, Case Administrator) (Service of Notice on parties not registered as users of the Court CM/ECF system accomplished via USPS mail.)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
4 4 misc Letter Mon 12/09 3:49 PM
Letter from Brad Cunningham to US Marshall Service, Portland, OR dated 12/4/2024. (TNC, Case Administrator)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
misc Payment or Deposit Received Mon 11/25 2:25 PM
Filing Fee Received. Receipt #43110 in the amount of $405 from Bradly Morris Cunningham, Sr. (BM, Case Administrator) (Service of Notice on parties not registered as users of the Court CM/ECF system accomplished via USPS mail.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
3 3 misc Letter to Prisoner from Clerk - Case Opening Thu 11/21 4:15 PM
Letter from Clerk - Advising prisoner of case number and deficiency. (TNC, Case Administrator) (Service of Notice on parties not registered as users of the Court CM/ECF system accomplished via USPS mail.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 IFP Application Form
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 11/21 3:52 PM
Summons Issued as to Corey Fhuere. (TNC, Case Administrator)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 11/21 3:28 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee not paid and no IFP submitted) Filed by Bradly Morris Cunningham, Sr.(TNC, Case Administrator)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit re 1983 Complaint,
Att: 2 Cover Letter,
Att: 3 Transmittlal Envelope