Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Steven D Grimberg
Case #: 1:24-cv-05331
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Nov 20, 2024
Last checked: Monday May 19, 2025 4:43 AM EDT
Defendant
Christopher Carr
Represented By
Roger A. Chalmers
Georgia Department Of Law
contact info
Maigan Jenkins
contact info
Defendant
Daniel A. Hiatt
Represented By
Roger A. Chalmers
Georgia Department Of Law
contact info
Maigan Jenkins
contact info
Defendant
Brian Kemp
Represented By
Roger A. Chalmers
Georgia Department Of Law
contact info
Maigan Jenkins
contact info
Defendant
Adam Pendleton
Represented By
Matthew Herbert Bennett
Bennett Law Office, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Sheila Studdard
Defendant
Barry Babb
Defendant
Marie G. Browder
Represented By
Roger A. Chalmers
Georgia Department Of Law
contact info
Defendant
Ronda Bender Kreuziger
Represented By
Roger A. Chalmers
Georgia Department Of Law
contact info
Defendant
State of Georgia
Represented By
Roger A. Chalmers
Georgia Department Of Law
contact info
Maigan Jenkins
contact info
Plaintiff
Charles Douglas Jackson
731 Tullamore Way
Hampton, GA 30228
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Marie G. Broder
Terminated: 02/20/2025
Represented By
Maigan Jenkins
contact info
Defendant
Rhonda Bender Kreuziger
Terminated: 02/20/2025
Represented By
Maigan Jenkins
contact info
Defendant
State of Georgia Fayette Co.
Terminated: 02/20/2025


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Monday, May 19, 2025
utility Submission to District Judge Mon 05/19 10:46 AM
Submission of31 MOTION to Stay Discovery , to District Judge Steven D. Grimberg. (dnb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
32 32 notice Notice of Filing Wed 05/14 11:05 AM
NOTICE of Filing Declaration of Article III Court of Record and IPSO Jure Authority by Charles Douglas Jackson. (tas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
utility Submission to District Judge Wed 05/07 1:19 PM
Submission of13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION , to District Judge Steven D. Grimberg. (dnb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
31 31 motion Stay Thu 05/01 4:28 PM
MOTION to Stay Discovery with Brief In Support by Marie G. Broder, Christopher Carr, Daniel A. Hiatt, Brian Kemp, Rhonda Bender Kreuziger, State of Georgia.(Jenkins, Maigan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief in Support of Motion to Stay Discovery
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
30 30 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/30 2:30 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Maigan Jenkins on behalf of Marie G. Broder, Christopher Carr, Daniel A. Hiatt, Brian Kemp, Rhonda Bender Kreuziger, State of Georgia (Jenkins, Maigan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
29 29 service Return of Service Unexecuted Wed 04/30 1:39 PM
Return of Service Unexecuted by Charles Douglas Jackson as to Barry Babb. (tas)
Related: [-]
28 28 service Return of Service Executed Wed 04/30 1:38 PM
Return of Service Executed by Charles Douglas Jackson. Brian Kemp served on 4/2/2025, answer due 4/23/2025. (tas)
Related: [-]
27 27 service Return of Service Executed Wed 04/30 1:37 PM
Return of Service Executed by Charles Douglas Jackson. Christopher Carr served on 4/11/2025, answer due 5/2/2025. (tas)
Related: [-]
26 26 service Return of Service Executed Wed 04/30 1:36 PM
Return of Service Executed by Charles Douglas Jackson. Adam Pendleton served on 4/7/2025, answer due 4/28/2025. (tas)
Related: [-]
25 25 service Return of Service Executed Wed 04/30 1:35 PM
Return of Service Executed by Charles Douglas Jackson. Marie G. Broder served on 3/28/2025, answer due 4/18/2025. (tas)
Related: [-]
24 24 service Return of Service Executed Wed 04/30 1:33 PM
Return of Service Executed by Charles Douglas Jackson. Daniel A. Hiatt served on 3/28/2025, answer due 4/18/2025. (tas)
Related: [-]
23 23 service Return of Service Executed Wed 04/30 1:32 PM
Return of Service Executed by Charles Douglas Jackson. Barry Babb served on 4/9/2025, answer due 4/30/2025. (tas)
Related: [-]
22 22 service Return of Service Unexecuted Wed 04/30 1:30 PM
Return of Service Unexecuted by Charles Douglas Jackson as to Rhonda Bender Kreuziger. (tas)
Related: [-]
21 21 service Return of Service Unexecuted Wed 04/30 1:29 PM
Return of Service Unexecuted by Charles Douglas Jackson as to State of Georgia. (tas)
Related: [-]
20 20 service Return of Service Unexecuted Wed 04/30 1:27 PM
Return of Service Unexecuted by Charles Douglas Jackson as to Sheila Studdard. (tas)
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Notice of Filing Wed 04/30 1:26 PM
NOTICE of Filing Divine Notice and Demand for Lawful Court Procedures and First-Hand Testimony by Charles Douglas Jackson. (tas)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Notice of Filing Wed 04/30 1:24 PM
NOTICE of Filing Divine Writ of Mandamus in Honor and Duty by Charles Douglas Jackson. (tas)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Notice of Filing Wed 04/30 1:23 PM
NOTICE of Filing Divine Writ of Estoppel by Silence and Final Default by Charles Douglas Jackson. (tas)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
16 16 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Mon 04/28 12:21 PM
ANSWER to6 Amended Complaint by Adam Pendleton. Discovery ends on 9/25/2025.(Bennett, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
15 15 discov Certificate of Service Tue 04/22 5:11 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Response to Divine Writ of Quo Warranto by Adam Pendleton.(Bennett, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Response to Divine Writ of Quo Warranto
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/22 4:57 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Herbert Bennett on behalf of Adam Pendleton (Bennett, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
13 13 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Thu 04/17 3:05 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION with Brief In Support by Marie G. Browder, Christopher Carr, Daniel A. Hiatt, Brian Kemp, Ronda Bender Kreuziger, State of Georgia.(Chalmers, Roger)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief
Friday, April 04, 2025
utility Submission to District Judge Fri 04/04 10:57 AM
Submission of12 MOTION for Service, to District Judge Steven D. Grimberg. (dnb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
utility Submission to District Judge Tue 03/18 9:47 AM
Submission of10 MOTION for Reconsideration re5 Order on Motion for TRO, to District Judge Steven D. Grimberg. (dnb)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
12 12 motion Service Tue 03/18 2:12 PM
MOTION for U.S. Marshal Service by Charles Douglas Jackson.(tas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
utility Submission to District Judge Tue 03/11 2:57 PM
Submission of8 MOTION to Supplement,7 MOTION for Reconsideration re5 Order on Motion for TRO, to District Judge Steven D. Grimberg. (dnb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
11 11 service Summons Issued Fri 03/07 11:44 AM
Summons Issued as to Brian Kemp. (tas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
10 10 motion Reconsideration Fri 02/28 9:46 AM
MOTION for Reconsideration re5 Order on Motion for TRO by Charles Douglas Jackson. (tas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
9 9 service Summons Issued Sat 02/22 2:17 PM
Summons Issued as to Barry Babb, Marie G. Browder, Christopher Carr, Daniel A. Hiatt, Ronda Bender Kreuziger, Adam Pendleton, State of Georgia, Sheila Studdard.(bgt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons - Carr,
Att: 2 Summons - Babb,
Att: 3 Summons - Broder,
Att: 4 Summons - Kreuzinger,
Att: 5 Summons - Hiatt,
Att: 6 Summons - State of Georgia,
Att: 7 Summons - Pendleton
8 8 motion Supplement Fri 02/21 11:20 AM
MOTION to Supplement the Record by Charles Douglas Jackson.(bgt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Verification and Jurat
7 7 motion Reconsideration Fri 02/21 11:18 AM
MOTION for Reconsideration re5 Order Denying Motion for TRO by Charles Douglas Jackson. (bgt)
Related: [-]
6 6 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 02/21 11:09 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Marie G. Browder, Christopher Carr, Daniel A. Hiatt, Brian Kemp, Ronda Bender Kreuziger, Adam Pendleton, Sheila Studdard, State of Georgia filed by Charles Douglas Jackson. (bgt) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified docket text on 2/21/2025 (bgt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
5 5 2 pgs order Order on Motion for TRO Wed 02/05 3:47 PM
ORDER DENYING3 Motion for TRO. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 2/5/2025. (tas)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Wed 02/05 3:49 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Charles Douglas Jackson re5 Order on Motion for TRO. (tas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
utility Submission to District Judge Tue 02/04 8:45 AM
Submission of3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, to District Judge Steven D. Grimberg. (tas)
Related: [-]
utility Docket Correction Tue 02/04 2:35 PM
Notification of Docket Correction re4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Document filed in error. Duplicate of Doc. No.3 . (tcc)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
4 4 motion Temporary Restraining Order Tue 02/04 2:31 PM
(DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. DUPLICATE OF DOC. NO. 3 ) Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Charles Douglas Jackson. (tcc) Modified on 2/4/2025 (tcc)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Temporary Restraining Order Tue 02/04 8:44 AM
Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Charles Douglas Jackson. (tas)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
2 2 30+ pgs order Order Fri 11/22 1:49 PM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 11/22/2024. (tas)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Fri 11/22 1:53 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Charles Douglas Jackson re2 Order. (tas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 11/21 12:22 PM
COMPLAINT filed by Charles Douglas Jackson. (Filing fee $405, receipt number 100015605)(ane)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet