Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Victoria M Calvert
Referred: Justin S Anand
Case #: 1:24-cv-05340
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Nov 20, 2024
Terminated:Feb 27, 2025
Last checked: Monday May 19, 2025 4:44 AM EDT
Defendant
TransUnion, LLC
Plaintiff
Dorothy Dancy
Represented By
Esther Nneka Oise
Oise Law Group PC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Equifax Information Services, LLC
Terminated: 02/21/2025
Defendant
Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Terminated: 01/28/2025
Defendant
Mission Lane LLC
Terminated: 01/13/2025


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Thursday, February 27, 2025
misc Clerks Entry of Dismissal Thu 02/27 2:45 PM
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING18 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i) (jbu)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Thu 02/27 2:46 PM
Civil Case Terminated. Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand terminated from case. (jbu)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
18 18 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 02/25 9:42 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendant TransUnion, LLC filed by Dorothy Dancy (Oise, Esther)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Notice of Settlement Tue 02/25 9:41 AM
NOTICE of Settlement as to Defendant TransUnion, LLC by Dorothy Dancy (Oise, Esther)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
16 16 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 02/21 9:29 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC filed by Dorothy Dancy (Oise, Esther)
Related: [-]
misc Clerks Entry of Dismissal Fri 02/21 11:52 AM
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING16 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i) as to Equifax Information Services, LLC (jbu)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
15 15 notice Notice of Settlement Tue 02/11 5:08 PM
NOTICE of Settlement as to Defendant TransUnion, LLC by Dorothy Dancy (Oise, Esther)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
14 14 notice Notice of Settlement Tue 02/04 5:21 PM
NOTICE of Settlement as to Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC by Dorothy Dancy (Oise, Esther)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
misc Clerks Entry of Dismissal Tue 01/28 8:18 PM
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING13 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal with prejudice pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i) as to as to Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. ONLY, with the parties to bear their own fees and costs. (bgt)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
13 13 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 01/24 5:53 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. filed by Dorothy Dancy (Oise, Esther)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
misc Clerks Entry of Dismissal Mon 01/13 1:56 PM
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING12 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i) as to Mission Lane LLC (jbu)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
12 12 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 01/10 5:38 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendant Mission Lane LLC filed by Dorothy Dancy (Oise, Esther)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Settlement Fri 01/10 5:37 PM
NOTICE of Settlement as to Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. by Dorothy Dancy (Oise, Esther)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
10 10 notice Notice of Settlement Tue 01/07 1:58 PM
NOTICE of Settlement as to Defendant Mission Lane LLC by Dorothy Dancy (Oise, Esther)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
9 9 service Return of Service Executed Fri 12/20 5:49 PM
Return of Service Executed by Dorothy Dancy. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 12/4/2024, answer due 12/26/2024.(Oise, Esther)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Returned Executed
Friday, December 06, 2024
8 8 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 12/06 5:28 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Dorothy Dancy. Equifax Information Services, LLC waiver mailed on 12/2/2024, answer due 1/31/2025. (Oise, Esther)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
7 7 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 12/04 5:33 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Dorothy Dancy. Mission Lane LLC waiver mailed on 12/2/2024, answer due 1/31/2025; TransUnion, LLC waiver mailed on 12/2/2024, answer due 1/31/2025.(Oise, Esther)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Executed Waiver of Service
6 6 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 12/04 5:27 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons by Dorothy Dancy. (Oise, Esther)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
5 5 service Electronic Summons Issued Thu 11/21 10:40 AM
Electronic Summons Issued as to TransUnion, LLC. (tcc)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Electronic Summons Issued Thu 11/21 10:39 AM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (tcc)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Electronic Summons Issued Thu 11/21 10:38 AM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services, LLC. (tcc)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Electronic Summons Issued Thu 11/21 10:38 AM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Mission Lane LLC. (tcc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 11/21 10:37 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Dorothy Dancy. (Filing fee $405, receipt number AGANDC-13880312)(tcc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet