Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Anthony J Trenga
Referred: Lindsey R Vaala
Case #: 1:24-cv-02094
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause18:2331 Antiterrorism Act of 1990
Case Filed:Nov 21, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday May 20, 2025 5:30 AM EDT
Defendant
Farhad Neimatullah
Defendant
Hezbollah
Defendant
Laith Al-Khazali
Defendant
Faiq Zidan
Defendant
Ahmed Abbas Sandal
Defendant
Nahro Mahmoud Qadir
Defendant
Asa'ib Ahl Al-Haq
Defendant
Ramiz Nasri
Defendant
Nizar Hanna Nasri
Defendant
Nameer Abdo Nasri
Defendant
Abdul Karim Abd Fadel
Defendant
Nouri Al-Maliki
Defendant
Ahmed Al-Maliki
Defendant
Qais Al-Khazali
Plaintiff
Sara Saleem
Represented By
Katherine Maddox Davis
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher
contact info
Akiva Shapiro
Akiva Shapiro Law, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Thursday, February 13, 2025
10 10 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 02/13 6:29 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Asa'ib Ahl Al-Haq, Laith Al-Khazali, Qais Al-Khazali, Ahmed Al-Maliki, Nouri Al-Maliki, Abdul Karim Abd Fadel, Hezbollah, Nameer Abdo Nasri, Nizar Hanna Nasri, Ramiz Nasri, Farhad Neimatullah, Nahro Mahmoud Qadir, Ahmed Abbas Sandal, Faiq Zidan, filed by Sara Saleem.(Davis, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
misc Notice of Correction Fri 01/10 1:03 PM
Notice of Correction re9 Proposed Summons. The filing user has been notified that proper service information is still missing. (dvanm)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
9 9 misc Proposed Summons Mon 12/16 8:11 PM
Proposed Summons by Sara Saleem. (Davis, Katherine)
Related: [-]
misc Notice of Correction Mon 12/16 10:59 AM
Notice of Correction re8 Proposed Summons. The filing user has been notified that the proposed summons cannot be issued because they do not proper service address information. (dvanm)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
8 8 misc Proposed Summons Fri 12/13 5:18 PM
Proposed Summons SUMMONS IN A CIVIL ACTION by Sara Saleem. (Davis, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
7 7 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro hac vice Tue 12/10 12:02 PM
ORDER granting4 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Akiva Shapiro for Sara Saleem. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 12/10/2024. (swil)
Related: [-]
6 6 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro hac vice Tue 12/10 11:49 AM
ORDER denying3 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 12/10/2024. (swil)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
misc Notice of Correction Fri 11/22 2:54 PM
Notice of Correction re5 Proposed Summons. The filing user has been notified that the summons cannot be issued because they lack service addresses. (dvanm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
5 5 misc Proposed Summons Thu 11/21 10:03 PM
Proposed Summons re1 Complaint by Sara Saleem (Davis, Katherine)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Pro Hac Vice Thu 11/21 9:58 PM
Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Akiva Shapiro and Certification of Local Counsel Katerine Maddox Davis Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-9863672. by Sara Saleem. (Davis, Katherine)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Pro Hac Vice Thu 11/21 9:56 PM
Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael David McQueeney and Certification of Local Counsel Katherine Maddox Davis Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-9863671. by Sara Saleem. (Davis, Katherine)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 11/21 9:53 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Maddox Davis on behalf of Sara Saleem (Davis, Katherine)
Related: [-]
1 1 56 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 11/21 9:52 PM
Complaint ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number BVAEDC-9863667.), filed by Sara Saleem.(Davis, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet
utility Initial Case Assignment Fri 11/22 2:21 PM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Anthony J Trenga and Magistrate Judge Lindsey R. Vaala. (dvanm)
Related: [-]