Tennessee Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Charles M Walker
Case #: 3:24-bk-04533
Case Filed:Nov 21, 2024
Creditor Meeting:Dec 23, 2024

Debtor
Allegiant Property Solutions Co.
106 Public Sq Ste 112
Gallatin, TN 37066-3288
Represented By
JENNIFER L. JOHNSON
Long, Burnett & Johnson, PLLC
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
DAVID G. ROGERS
David G. Rogers, Chapter 7 Trustee 4636 Lebanon Pike #123
Hermitage, TN 37076
U.S. Trustee
US TRUSTEE
OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES TRUSTEE 701 BROADWAY STE 318
NASHVILLE, TN 37203


Docket last updated: 11/22/2024 12:38 AM CST
Thursday, November 21, 2024
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Thu 11/21 2:23 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals. Fee Amount is $338.00. (JOHNSON, JENNIFER)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset) Thu 11/21 2:24 PM
Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee DAVID ROGERS with 341(a) meeting to be held on 12/23/2024 at 01:00 PM via Zoom - Rogers: Meeting ID 577 665 0314, Passcode 4029776484, Phone 1 (615) 570-2019. (JOHNSON, JENNIFER)
Related: [-]
3 3 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Payment Thu 11/21 2:25 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK:3:24-bk-04533] ) [misc,volp7] ( 338.00). Receipt number A18952329. Fee amount $ 338.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1